Omran et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Ikremah Omran and Ami Jo Omran
Defendant: Director, U.S. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Special Agent-In-Charge, FBI Cleveland Office, U.S. Attorney General, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Justin E. Herdman and Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv02446
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until January 14, 2019 to answer filed by Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Justin E. Herdman, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Special Agent-In-Charge, FBI Cleveland Office, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Johnson, Lisa)
December 2, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Christopher A. Wray on 10/29/2018 filed on behalf of Ami Jo Omran, Ikremah Omran (Kay, Abraham)
November 24, 2018 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Stephen D. Anthony on 10/31/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay, Abraham)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Jefferson Beauregard Sessions on 10/29/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay, Abraham)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Karyn Zarlenga, Cleveland Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 10/23/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay, Abraham)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services - Cleveland Field Office on 10/23/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay, Abraham)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Justin E. Herdman on 10/23/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay, Abraham)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel over the counter for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
October 23, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR)
October 23, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application and Complaint for Mandamus and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $400. Receipt # 14660108788. Filed by Ikremah Omran, Ami Jo Omran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Naturalization interview results, #3 Exhibit 2-August 2017 letter) (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omran et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ikremah Omran
Represented By: Abraham F. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ami Jo Omran
Represented By: Abraham F. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Agent-In-Charge, FBI Cleveland Office
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin E. Herdman
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?