Beiersdorfer et al v. LaRose et al
Plaintiff: Katharine Jones, Sally Jo Wiley, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Dario HunterDario, Susan Beiersdorfer, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damen Rae, Dario Hunter, Greg Howard, Saraquoia Bryant, Gwen Fischer, Gerald T Dolcini, Gerald Dolcini, Bryan Twitchell, Gregory Pace and Katharine S. Jones
Defendant: Member Paula J Wood, Sharon A Ray, Member Richard F Schoen, Member Aundrea Carpenter-Colvin, Member Ken Ryan, Member David Karmol, Member David Betras, Member Robert Wasko, Member James V Stewart, Member Kate McGuckin, Member John V Welker, Jr., Member Doria Daniels, Member David W Fox, Member Joshua Hughes, Secretary of State Frank LaRose, Member Helen Walker, Member Elayne J Cross, Member Pamela B Miller, Member Brenda Hill, Member Tracey S Winbush, Member Larry G Cray, Member Douglas J Priesse, Member Kimberly E Marinello, Member Mark E Munroe, Member Charles E Williams, Member Brad K Sinnott, Member Denise L Smith, Member Michael E Sexton, Member Patricia Nelson, Ken Ryan, Doria Daniels, John V Welker, Jr., Mark E Munroe, Charles E Williams, Brenda Hill, Pamela B Miller, David Betras, Richard F Schoen, Robert Wasko, Frank LaRose, Joshua Hughes, David W Fox, Tracey S Winbush, James V Stewart, Michael E Sexton, Kimberly E Marinello, Patricia Nelson, Larry G Cray, Aundrea Carpenter-Colvin, Elayne J Cross, Douglas J Priesse, Kate McGuckin, Denise L Smith, David Karmol, Brad K Sinnott, Paula J Wood and Helen Walker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00260
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for rescheduling of Case Management Conference filed by Susan Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald Dolcini, Gwen Fischer, Greg Howard, Dario Hunter, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Pace, Damen Rae, Bryan Twitchell, Sally Jo Wiley. Related document(s) #12 . (Lodge, Terry)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. David W Fox waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; James V Stewart waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Charles E Williams waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Paula J Wood waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lodge, Terry)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon David W Fox, James V Stewart, Charles E Williams, Paula J Wood. (T,Je)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons for David W. Fox, #2 Summons for James V. Stewart, #3 Summons for Charles E. Williams, #4 Summons for Paula J. Wood)(Lodge, Terry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance as Co-Counsel of Record by Mark P. D'Apolito filed by on behalf of David Betras, Mark E Munroe, Robert Wasko, Tracey S Winbush. (D'Apolito, Mark)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance as Counsel of Record by Sharon K. Hackett filed by on behalf of David Betras, Mark E Munroe, Robert Wasko, Tracey S Winbush. (Hackett, Sharon)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond in Opposition to #5 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings until 4/22/2019. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/12/2019. (JLG)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for enlargement of time to respond in opposition to #5 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings until 04/22/2019 filed by Susan Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald Dolcini, Gwen Fischer, Greg Howard, Dario Hunter, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Pace, Damen Rae, Bryan Twitchell, Sally Jo Wiley. Related document(s) #5 . (Lodge, Terry)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Case Management Conference to be held on 4/24/2019 at 1:30 p.m. at Courtroom 351 before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Timothy A. Lecklider filed by on behalf of Kimberly E Marinello, Douglas J Priesse, Michael E Sexton, Brad K Sinnott. (Lecklider, Timothy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Frank LaRose waiver sent on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lodge, Terry)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Sarah E. Pierce as Co-Counsel filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose. (Pierce, Sarah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Renata Y. Staff as Lead and Trial Counsel filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose. (Staff, Renata)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. David Betras waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Mark E Munroe waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Robert Wasko waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Tracey S Winbush waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lodge, Terry)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Summons for Franklin BOE, #2 Summons Waiver of Summons Lucas BOE member Hill, #3 Summons Waiver of Summons Lucas BOE member Karmol, #4 Summons Waiver of Summons Lucas BOE member Hughes, #5 Summons Waiver of Summons for Lucas BOE member Schoen, #6 Summons Waiver of Summons for Medina BOE, #7 Summons Waiver of Summons for Portage BOE)(Lodge, Terry)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Brenda Hill, Joshua Hughes, David Karmol, Richard F Schoen. (Pituch, Kevin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Brenda Hill, Joshua Hughes, David Karmol, Richard F Schoen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Petition for Submission of Proposed Amendment to Charter)(Pituch, Kevin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons provided. No Summons issued. (S,Ke)
February 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
February 5, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet) filed by Susan Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T Dolcini, Gwen Fischer, Greg Howard, Dario Hunter, Dario HunterDario, Katharine Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damen Rae, Sally Jo Wiley. Related document(s) #1 . (Lodge, Terry) Modified to term motion on 2/5/2019 (S,Ke).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9127532.. Filed by Damen Rae, Saraquoia Bryant, Susan Beiersdorfer, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gwen Fischer, Sally Jo Wiley, Dario Hunter, Gregory Thomas Pace, Greg Howard, Katharine Jones, Gerald T Dolcini. (Lodge, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beiersdorfer et al v. LaRose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Paula J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Richard F Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Aundrea Carpenter-Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Ken Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member David Karmol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member David Betras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Robert Wasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member James V Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Kate McGuckin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member John V Welker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Doria Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member David W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Joshua Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Frank LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Helen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Elayne J Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Pamela B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Brenda Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Tracey S Winbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Larry G Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Douglas J Priesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Kimberly E Marinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Mark E Munroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Charles E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Brad K Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Denise L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Michael E Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Patricia Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doria Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V Welker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E Munroe
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hill
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Betras
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F Schoen
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wasko
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank LaRose
Represented By: Sarah E. Pierce
Represented By: Renata Y. Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Hughes
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey S Winbush
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James V Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Sexton
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly E Marinello
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry G Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aundrea Carpenter-Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elayne J Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Priesse
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate McGuckin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Karmol
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad K Sinnott
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Jones
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Jo Wiley
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lyons
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markie Miller
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario HunterDario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Beiersdorfer
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Thomas Pace
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damen Rae
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Hunter
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Howard
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saraquoia Bryant
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Fischer
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald T Dolcini
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Dolcini
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Twitchell
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Pace
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine S. Jones
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?