P.I. & I. Motor Express, Inc., et al v. RLI Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Kerola, Sr., P. I. & I. Motor Express, Inc., Pamela Kerola, JWK Bros., Inc. and Elite Leasing, Inc.
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company and TrueNorth Companies, L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01008
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George J Limbert
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JWK Bros., Inc.. (Vansuch, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Elite Leasing, Inc.. (Vansuch, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by P. I. & I. Motor Express, Inc.. (Vansuch, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. Related document(s) #9 . (S,Ke)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert for further proceedings. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 3:00 p.m. will be held before Magistrate Judge Limbert. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7460, with all participants on the line. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/6/2019. Related document(s) #7 , #8 . (JLG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 .(Vansuch, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 7/24/2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #4 Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leffler, Amanda)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by TrueNorth Companies, L.C. (Sullivan, Brian)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Answer and Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs. Filed by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RLI Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Decision, #3 Exhibit C- Opinion) (Garner, Richard) Modified to add Answer on 5/6/2019 (S,Ke).
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,Br)
May 6, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,Br)
May 6, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (Y,Br)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for RLI Insurance Company filed by RLI Insurance Company. (Garner, Richard)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull, case number 2019 CV 00593 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9293774.. Filed by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All process, pleadings, and orders served upon RLI and TrueNorth in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Copy of Docket in State Court Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and attachment) (Garner, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.I. & I. Motor Express, Inc., et al v. RLI Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kerola, Sr.
Represented By: Matthew G. Vansuch
Represented By: Amanda M. Leffler
Represented By: Jodi Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Jodi D. Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. I. & I. Motor Express, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Vansuch
Represented By: Amanda M. Leffler
Represented By: Jodi Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Jodi D. Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kerola
Represented By: Matthew G. Vansuch
Represented By: Amanda M. Leffler
Represented By: Jodi Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Jodi D. Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JWK Bros., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Vansuch
Represented By: Amanda M. Leffler
Represented By: Jodi Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Jodi D. Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Vansuch
Represented By: Amanda M. Leffler
Represented By: Jodi Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Jodi D. Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard M. Garner
Represented By: David L. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrueNorth Companies, L.C.
Represented By: Brian Douglas Sullivan
Represented By: Clifford C. Masch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?