Ahmedaljamal v. Immigration Customs Enforcement et al
Petitioner: Ashraf Ahmedaljamal
Respondent: Mirash Dedvukajis, Warden Christopher J LaRose, Kevin K. McAlleenan, William Barr, Mick, Immigration Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney General and Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv01060
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Respondent Christopher LaRose's Joinder in Federal Respondents' Answer and Return of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 3) filed by Christopher J LaRose. Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Bojanowski, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting in part and denying in part respondent's #4 Motion for Leave to Plead/Extension of Time. Respondent is granted a 14-day extension, until 7/5/2019, to answer/plead. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 6/21/2019. (S,S)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for leave to plead until July 17, 2019 to Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus and Notice of Appearance filed by Respondent Christopher J LaRose. Related document(s) #1 . (Bojanowski, Timothy) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (D,TM).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Answer and Return of Writ (2241) to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), and Motion to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by Immigration Customs Enforcement, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Deportation Officer Obaid)(Johnson, Lisa) Modified to add Motion on 06/13/2019.
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 30 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 7 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/21/2019. (Issued by ordinary mail to Respondents and U.S. Attorney, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus, on 5/21/2019. Issued via email to Lynne Buck, AUSA, on 5/21/2019.) (S,S)
May 15, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/15/2019. (S,AL)
May 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
May 10, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, (B,R)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in federal custody. Filing fee paid. $5.00. Receipt # 14660114175. Filed by Ashraf Ahmedaljamal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B- Recognizance Case 18crB0834, #3 Exhibit C- 18crB0834 Case Details, #4 Exhibit D- Decision to Continue Detention, #5 Exhibit E- Decision to Continue Detention, #6 Exhibit F- Decision to Continue Detention, #7 Exhibit G- 11/15/2018 Email, #8 Exhibit H- 11/14/2018 Email, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmedaljamal v. Immigration Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mirash Dedvukajis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Christopher J LaRose
Represented By: Timothy J. Bojanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAlleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lisa Hammond Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashraf Ahmedaljamal
Represented By: Francis R. Krajenke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?