O'Horo v. Katzbeck
Plaintiff: Daniel P. O'Horo
Defendant: William J. Katzbeck
Case Number: 4:2019cv01081
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting the parties' #7 Joint Motion to Convert Telephonic CMC to In-Person Settlement Conference. The Court agrees to hold the 7/29/2019 Case Management Conference at 11:00 a.m. in person, and it agrees to assist the parties in their settlement discussions at that time. But the parties are not relieved of their obligation to meet and confer and prepare a discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and the Court's Order at ECF No. #4 . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/12/2019. (JLG)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kalynne N. Proctor for Plaintiff Daniel P. O'Horo. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Document(s) #5 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/12/2019. (JLG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Motion to Convert Telephonic CMC to In-Person Settlement Conference filed by Defendant William J. Katzbeck. (Dorman, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE OF #5 Motion for attorney proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9331883, filed by Plaintiff Daniel P. O'Horo. Related document(s) #5 . (Berliner, Stacy) Modified to mark filing error on 5/29/2019 (O,K).
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Kalynne N. Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9331883 filed by Plaintiff Daniel P. O'Horo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Berliner, Stacy - s/ by Kalynne N. Proctor)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 7/29/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
May 14, 2019 Notice to Attorney Kalynne N. Proctor. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,Br)
May 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,Br)
May 14, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (Y,Br)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by William J. Katzbeck. (Dorman, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 00690 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9308703. Filed by William Katzbeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Mahoning Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dorman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Horo v. Katzbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. O'Horo
Represented By: Kalynne N. Proctor
Represented By: Stacy R.C. Berliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Katzbeck
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?