Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc. v. Limeaid, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc.
Defendant: Shoshana Z. Fineman and Limeaid, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01204
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Dodoo, #2 Exhibit A-1 PACA Trust Chart, #3 Exhibit A-2 Attorneys Fees, #4 Proposed Order)(Dodoo, Samuel)
July 17, 2019 Copy of #9 Default Entered mailed to Defendants Limeaid, LLC, 16572 St. Clair Ave., East Liverpool, Ohio 43920; and Shoshana Z. Fineman, 2202 Richardson Ave., East Liverpool, Ohio 43920 on 7/17/2019. Related document(s) #9 . (JLG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Default Entered on 7/17/2019 against Defendants Limeaid, LLC, and Shoshana Z. Fineman. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Judy L. Guyer, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #8 . (JLG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendants Limeaid, LLC and Shoshana Z. Fineman filed by Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel N. Dodoo, #2 Proposed Entry of Default)(Dodoo, Samuel)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Plaintiff Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc., filed the Complaint in this action on 5/28/2019. ECF No. #1 . Plaintiff served Defendants Limeaid, LLC, and Shoshana Z. Fineman on 6/5/2019 and 6/10/2019, respectively. ECF Nos. #5 , #6 . Defendants have failed to file a responsive pleading or otherwise defend this action. Accordingly, no later than 10 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court an application for entry of default and an appropriate motion, affidavit, and proposed order for default judgment or, alternatively, show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/8/2019. (JLG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Shoshana Z. Fineman on 6/10/2019, filed on behalf of Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc. (Dodoo, Samuel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Limeaid, LLC on 6/5/2019, filed on behalf of Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc. (Dodoo, Samuel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint, - Exhibit A to Complaint, filed by Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Dodoo, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Shoshana Z. Fineman, Limeaid, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,Br)
May 28, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,Br)
May 28, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (Y,Br)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Economy Produce & Vegetable Co., Inc.. (Dodoo, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9329887. Filed by Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc. (Attachments: #1 FILING ERROR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Limeaid, LLC, #4 Summons - Shoshana Z. Fineman) (Dodoo, Samuel) Modified on 5/28/2019 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc. v. Limeaid, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoshana Z. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limeaid, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Economy Produce & Vegetable Co, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Gembala
Represented By: Samuel N.O. Dodoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?