United States of America v. Miller
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Andrew Miller
Case Number: 4:2019cv01542
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Copy of #6 Order on Motion for Default Judgment and #7 Default Judgment mailed to Defendant Andrew Miller, dba A.M. Carpentry, 9285 North Park Ave., North Bloomfield, Ohio 44450 on 8/30/2019. Related document(s) #6 , #7 . (JLG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Default Judgment For the reasons set forth in the Order filed contemporaneously with this Default Judgment, judgment is hereby rendered in favor of Plaintiff the United States of America against Defendant Andrew Miller, dba A.M. Carpentry in the amount of $11,364.81 (principal of $6,400.00, interest of $280.49 accrued through 6/14/2019, administrative and penalty charges of $1,670.93, and DMS and DOJ fees of $3,013.39), plus interest from the date of judgment computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full and costs of suit. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/30/2019. (JLG)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. Judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff the United States of America against Defendant Andrew Miller, dba A.M. Carpentry in the amount of $11,364.81. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/30/2019. (JLG)
August 28, 2019 Copy of #5 Default Entered mailed to Defendant Andrew Miller, dba A.M. Carpentry, 9285 North Park Ave., North Bloomfield, Ohio 44450 on 8/28/2019. Related document(s) #5 . (JLG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Default Entered on 8/28/2019 against Defendant Andrew Miller, dba A.M. Carpentry. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Judy L. Guyer, Deputy Clerk. (JLG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for default judgment against Andrew Miller with attached. Application for entry of default, declaration in support of service, declaration of amount due and proposed default judgment. filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rokakis, Alex)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by FedEx executed upon Andrew Miller on 7/18/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery)(Rokakis, Alex)
July 10, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Andrew Miller placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: FedEx mail. Receipt # 775657706949. (Y,A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Andrew Miller. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke)
July 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
July 8, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Andrew Miller, Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rokakis, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alex Rokakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?