Argryriou v. David A. Flynn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Argryiou
Defendant: David A. Flynn, Inc. and David A. Flynn
Case Number: 4:2019cv01878
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Updated Discovery Plan) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #9 .(Sallee, Jerry)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Discovery Plan) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Sallee, Jerry)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by David A. Flynn, Inc., David A. Flynn. (Sallee, Jerry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Discovery Protocols Order. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/30/2019. (JLG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David A. Flynn, Inc., David A. Flynn. (Sallee, Jerry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim (Related Doc #1 ) filed by David A. Flynn, Inc., David A. Flynn. (Sallee, Jerry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Amended Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Sallee, Jerry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
August 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
August 16, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (T,Je)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Columbiana Common Pleas, case number 2018-CV-000467 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9475417. Filed by David A. Flynn, David A. Flynn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sallee, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argryriou v. David A. Flynn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Argryiou
Represented By: F. Benjamin Riek, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Flynn, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Sallee
Represented By: Leslie G. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Flynn
Represented By: Jerry S. Sallee
Represented By: Leslie G. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?