United States of America v. $215,477.00 U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assorted Jewelry with an Approximate Value of $297,750.00 seized on June 27, 2019, by the Drug Enforcement Administration, pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant, $215,477.00 U.S. Currency seized on June 27, 2019, by the Drug Enforcement Administration, Pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant, $15,465.00 U.S. Currency seized on June 27, 2019 by the Drug Enforcement Administration, Pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant, Assorted Jewelry with an Approximate Value of $297,750.00, $15,465.00 in U.S. Currency and $215,477 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Rashie Garner
Case Number: 4:2019cv02439
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to stay filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Rashie Garner. (Attachments: #1 Pleading, #2 Affidavit)(Madison, Walter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Rashie Garner c/o Walter T. Madison, Attorney at Law Walter T. Madison, LLC on 10/24/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon $15,465.00 in U.S. Currency on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of $15,465.00 in U.S. Currency. USMS too custody of asset on 7/2/19. (Y,A)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon $215,477 in U.S. Currency on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of $215,477 in U.S. Currency. USMS took custody of asset on 7/2/19. (Y,A)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Assorted Jewelry with an Approximate Value of $297,750.00 on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America. USMS took custody of asset on 8/1/19. (Y,A)
October 21, 2019 Service by Clerk: Complaint and Notice addressed to Rashie Garner placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7014 0150 0001 5888 6354. (L,MI)
October 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
October 21, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Preacipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process & Return 285 cash, #5 USMS Process & Return 285 Jewelry, #6 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $215,477.00 U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Jewelry with an Approximate Value of $297,750.00 seized on June 27, 2019, by the Drug Enforcement Administration, pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $215,477.00 U.S. Currency seized on June 27, 2019, by the Drug Enforcement Administration, Pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,465.00 U.S. Currency seized on June 27, 2019 by the Drug Enforcement Administration, Pursuant to a Federal Search Warrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Jewelry with an Approximate Value of $297,750.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,465.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $215,477 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rashie Garner
Represented By: Walter T. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?