Friends of the Mahoning River v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Friends of the Mahoning River
Defendant: Colonel Andrew J. Short and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Intervenor Defendant: North Eastwood, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02771
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Karen A. Winters filed by on behalf of North Eastwood, LLC. (Winters, Karen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by North Eastwood, LLC. (Etter, Andrew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Andrew O. Etter filed by on behalf of North Eastwood, LLC. (Etter, Andrew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion to intervene as a party filed by Defendant/Intervenor North Eastwood, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Answer, #3 Proposed Order)(Etter, Andrew)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 2/19/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Andrew J. Short, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (W,K)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Friends of the Mahoning River. (Attachments: #1Summons for U.S. Army Corps - Pittsburgh, #2 Summons for U.S. Army Corps - USAO NDOH)(Karas, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Daniel R. Dertke filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Dertke, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order For the reasons set forth herein, if Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendants by 12/20/2019, it shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendants should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/18/2019. (JLG)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Megan M. Hunter and adding attorney Andrew J. Karas filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Karas, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (W,K)
November 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (W,K)
November 26, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (W,K)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Friends of the Mahoning River. Related document #1 (Hunter, Megan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Friends of the Mahoning River. (Hunter, Megan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9646340. Filed by Friends of the Mahoning River. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 404 Permit, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Record) (Hunter, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the Mahoning River v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Andrew J. Short
Represented By: Daniel R. Dertke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Daniel R. Dertke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Mahoning River
Represented By: Megan M. Hunter
Represented By: Andrew J. Karas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: North Eastwood, LLC
Represented By: Andrew O. Etter
Represented By: Karen A. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?