Raimey v. City of Niles et al
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Raimey
Defendant: Jay Holland, James Reppy, Christopher Mannella, Paul Hogan and City of Niles
Case Number: 4:2020cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 3/23/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/2/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/9/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 02/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by City of Niles, Paul Hogan, Jay Holland, Christopher Mannella, James Reppy. (Lute, Melvin)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by City of Niles, Paul Hogan, Jay Holland, Christopher Mannella, James Reppy. (Lute, Melvin)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (S,Ke)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,Ke)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,Ke)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9702528.. Filed by Timothy A. Raimey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Defendant City of Niles, #3 Summons to Defendant Christopher Mannella, #4 Summons to Defendant James Reppy, #5 Summons to Defendant Paul Hogan, #6 Summons to Defendant Jay Holland) (DiCello, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raimey v. City of Niles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Holland
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Reppy
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Mannella
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hogan
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Niles
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Raimey
Represented By: Nicholas A. DiCello
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?