Miller et al v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miller, Jasmine Wilder, Matthew Downing, Jerome McDaniel and Edward Miller
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc. d/b/a Purell and Gojo Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00562
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, without prejudice. Related document #6 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 4/16/2020. (R,Sh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by Matthew Downing, Jerome McDaniel, Edward Miller, Jasmine Wilder. (Collins, Tim)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Gojo Industries, Inc. on 4/8/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document #4 . (W,K)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Ian J. McLoughlin, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 05508G, filed by Matthew Downing, Jerome McDaniel, Edward Miller, Jasmine Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - /s by Ian McLoughlin)(Collins, Tim)
April 2, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Gojo Industries, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1830 0000 9787 0515. (R,Li)
March 31, 2020 Notice to Attorney Kathryn Y. McCauley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 31, 2020 Notice to Attorney Noah M. Schubert. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 31, 2020 Notice to Attorney Dustin L. Schubert. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 31, 2020 Notice to Attorney Ian J. McLoughlin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Gojo Industries, Inc. d/b/a Purell. (W,CM)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of summons upon Gojo Industries, Inc. d/b/a Purell. filed by Jasmine Wilder, Edward Miller, Matthew Downing, Jerome McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendants)(Collins, Tim) Wrong event used, modified on 3/25/2020 (W,CM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,R)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Gojo Industries, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9858643. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:20-cv-00279-BYP. Filed by Jasmine Wilder, Edward Miller, Matthew Downing, Jerome McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CLRA Affidavit) (Collins, Tim)
March 13, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,R)
March 13, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Wilder
Represented By: Ezio A. Listati
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Represented By: Dustin L. Schubert
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Kathryn Y. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Downing
Represented By: Ezio A. Listati
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Represented By: Dustin L. Schubert
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Kathryn Y. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome McDaniel
Represented By: Ezio A. Listati
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Represented By: Dustin L. Schubert
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Kathryn Y. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Miller
Represented By: Ezio A. Listati
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Represented By: Dustin L. Schubert
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Kathryn Y. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc. d/b/a Purell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?