Tenney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathryn A Tenney
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv01569
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration c/o U.S. Attorney via personal on 8/4/2020, c/o Attorney General via Fed-Ex on 8/5/2020, and Regional Chief Counsel via Fed-Ex on 8/5/2020 (signed c-19) filed on behalf of Kathryn A Tenney. Related document(s) #8 . (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (W,K)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (W,K)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 07/17/2020. (W,K)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 07/17/2020. (W,K)
July 16, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,R)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kathryn A Tenney. (Balin, Paulette)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Notice filed by Kathryn A Tenney. (Balin, Paulette)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kathryn A Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Social Security Administration, #3 Summons Department of Justice, #4 Summons Office of United States Attorney, #5 USM-285 Social Security Administration, #6 USM-285 Department of Justice, #7 USM-285 Office of United States Attorney) (Balin, Paulette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn A Tenney
Represented By: Matthew J. Shupe
Represented By: Paulette F. Balin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?