Bing v. Dixon, et al
Plaintiff: Carol Bing
Defendant: Sharday L. Bing Dixson, Derek L. Carter, Jr., John Doe and Mahoning County Children Services Board
Case Number: 4:2020cv02492
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures filed by Carol Bing. (Engler, David)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] terminating as moot Defendant Mahoning County Children Services Board's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/12/2020. (E,CK)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Mahoning County Children Services Board. (Ambrose-Rubright, Patricia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until December 2, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Mahoning County Children Services Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patricia C. Ambrose Rubright)(Ambrose-Rubright, Patricia)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ke)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B) (S,Ke)
November 4, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,Ke)
November 4, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,Ke)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20 CV 1612 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10396187.. Filed by Mahoning County Children Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, #3 Summons) (Raskin, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bing v. Dixon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharday L. Bing Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek L. Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Children Services Board
Represented By: Patricia C. Ambrose-Rubright
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bing
Represented By: David L. Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?