Chork, Inc. v. Berk Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Chork, Inc. and Chork, Inc.
Defendant: Teriyaki Madness, Berk Enterprises, Inc. and Sysco Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv02631
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Copy of #15 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Robert J. Herberger, Esq., Roth, Blair, Roberts, Strasfeld & Lodge, 100 East Federal Street, Suite #600, Youngstown, Ohio 44503-1893, counsel for Defendant Berk Enterprises, Inc.; and Peter J. Chassman, Esq., Reed Smith LLP, 811 Main Street, Suite 1700, Houston, Texas 77002-6110, counsel for Defendant Sysco Corp., on 1/19/2021. Attorney Chassman is reminded of Local Rule 5.1(c), which requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. See ECF No. #13 . Related document(s) #15 . (JLG)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Management Conference to be held on 2/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sysco Corporation. (Chassman, Peter)
December 28, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Sysco Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (O,K)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting #12 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Peter J. Chassman for Sysco Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/23/2020.(S,Ke)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Peter J. Chassman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 44660005651, filed by Defendant Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(S,Ke)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chork, Inc.. Sysco Corporation waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021 filed on behalf of Chork, Inc. (Chudakoff, Robert)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Angilee K. Dakic for Chork, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ) Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/9/2020.(S,Ke)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Summerhill filed by on behalf of Teriyaki Madness. (Summerhill, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Angilee K. Dakic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10479671, filed by Plaintiff Chork, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Angilee K. Dakic in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Chudakoff, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chork, Inc.. Teriyaki Madness waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021 filed on behalf of Chork, Inc. (Chudakoff, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chork, Inc.. Berk Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021 filed on behalf of Chork, Inc. (Chudakoff, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this action was filed on 11/23/2020. The file in this case shows no summons has been provided or issued. If Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendants by 12/23/2020, they shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendants should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/4/2020. (JLG)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued, no summons provided. (S,Ke)
November 24, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (S,Ke)
November 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,Ke)
November 24, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Chork, Inc.. (Chudakoff, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by The Chork, Inc.. (Chudakoff, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Berk Enterprises, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Teriyaki Madness. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10443945.. Filed by The Chork, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Design Patent D601,389, #2 Exhibit B - TMAD Social Media and Internet Posts, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing TMAD Utensil, #4 Exhibit D - 2nd Berk Cease and Desist Letter 08.28.2020, #5 Exhibit E - TMAD Cease and Desist Letter 09.30.2020, #6 Exhibit F - Sysco Cease and Desist Letter 09.30.2020, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chudakoff, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chork, Inc. v. Berk Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teriyaki Madness
Represented By: Michael J. Summerhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berk Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Chassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chork, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chork, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Represented By: Angilee K. Dakic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?