Zuod v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Sulayman Zuod
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio C. Rodriguez, Stephen S. Burns, Rich Schmidt and Michael Fabian
Case Number: 4:2021cv00720
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR, SEE CASE 21CV616 Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (S,SR).
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821956, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821942, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order of Consolidation: There are currently four pending class action securities fraud cases filed against Lordstown Motors Corp. and certain individual defendants. The Court has reviewed the complaints and finds that consolidation is appropriate because the complaints allege similar instances of wrongdoing against the defendants. Consolidation will also preserve judicial resources and promote efficiency in resolving the pending matters. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the four above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Any subsequent case filed before the undersigned or transferred as a related action will be subject to this Order. All filings must be made solely in Case No. 21 CV 616, i.e., the first-filed case, and need only contain the case caption for that case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 12, 2021 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,He)
April 11, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10771768, filed by Stephen S. Burns, Michael Fabian, Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio C. Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice)(Shively, Douglas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Shively, Douglas)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan for all further proceedings as related to Case No. 4:21CV0616. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/7/2021. (JLG)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel H. Rudman is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/7/21. (Related Doc #6 )(LC,S)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary K. Blasy is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/7/21. (Related Doc #5 )(LC,S)
April 7, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. (D,Ju)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10762485, filed by Plaintiff Sulayman Zuod. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel H. Rudman)(Murray, Joseph)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Mary K. Blasy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10762449, filed by Plaintiff Sulayman Zuod. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary K. Blasy)(Murray, Joseph)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Related Cases filed by Sulayman Zuod. (Murray, Joseph)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Stephen S. Burns, Michael Fabian, Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio C. Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10758056. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:21-cv-00616, 4:21-cv-00633. Filed by Sulayman Zuod. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Murray, Joseph)
April 2, 2021 Notice to Attorney Mary K. Blasy. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
April 2, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
April 2, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju)
April 2, 2021 Notice to Attorney Samuel H. Rudman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuod v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp.
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Schmidt
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fabian
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sulayman Zuod
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?