Lloyd v. Cannon et al
Plaintiff: Susan Lloyd
Defendant: Timothy Cannon, Mary Jane Trapp, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Rebecca Doherty, Committee to Elect Becky Doherty, Judge Rice for Justice, Jason Whitacre, Lisa Whitacre, Brouse McDowell, Tracey Blair and Akron Legal News, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01476
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 FILING ERROR, DUPLICATE, SEE DOC #21 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Akron Legal News, Inc. (Callahan, Michael) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (S,SR).
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Tracey Blair, Akron Legal News, Inc. (Callahan, Michael) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (S,SR).
September 20, 2021 Filing 20 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by Timothy Cannon, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Mary Jane Trapp. Related document(s) #1 . (Walton, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 19 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Jason Whitacre. Service attempted by certified mail on 8/3/2021, 8/9/2021, 8/19/2021 (envelope marked return to sending, unclaimed) filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document #2 . (O,K)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant Committee to Elect Becky Doherty's #18 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/27/2021 to Answer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/2/2021. (JLG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 Motion for extension of time until 9/27/2021 to answer filed by Defendant Committee to Elect Becky Doherty. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Corrigan, Mary Catherine)
September 1, 2021 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Mary Catherine Corrigan filed by on behalf of Committee to Elect Becky Doherty. (Corrigan, Mary Catherine)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant Rebecca Doherty's #16 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/27/2021 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/31/2021. (JLG)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 Motion for extension of time until 09/27/2021 to answer , move, or otherwise plead filed by Defendant Rebecca Doherty. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hon. Rebecca Doherty)(Riley, Kimberly)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for extension of 28 days until September 21, 2021 to answer Complaint filed by Defendants Tracey Blair and Akron Legal News, Inc. (Callahan, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Michael T. Callahan filed by on behalf of Tracey Blair. (Callahan, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Copy of NEF for 8/23/2021 Order [non-document] mailed to Plaintiff Susan Lloyd, 929 E. Main St., Mt. Joy, PA 17552 on 8/23/2021. (JLG)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants Tracy Blair and Akron Legal News, Inc.'s #15 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/21/2021 to Answer Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/23/2021. (JLG) Modified text and regenerated NEF's on 8/23/2021 (JLG).
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Susan Lloyd. Brouse McDowell waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Jason Whitacre waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Lisa Whitacre waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 filed on behalf of Susan Lloyd. (M,TL)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants Timothy Cannon, Cynthia Westcott Rice and Mary Jane Trapp's #12 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/20/2021 to Answer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/18/2021. (JLG)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for extension of 28 days until September 20, 2021 to answer filed by Timothy Cannon, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Mary Jane Trapp. Related document(s) #1 . (Walton, Michael) Modified filers on 8/18/2021 (JLG).
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 Objection to Assignment of Magistrate filed by Susan Lloyd. (M,TL)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Iris Jin filed by on behalf of Timothy Cannon, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Mary Jane Trapp. (Jin, Iris)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Walton filed by on behalf of Timothy Cannon, Judge Rice for Justice, Mary Jane Trapp. (Walton, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Akron Legal News, Inc. on 8/3/2021 (marked C-19); Tracey Blair on 8/3/2021 (marked C-19); Brouse McDowell on 8/3/2021 (marked C-19); Committee to Elect Becky Doherty on 8/3/2021; Rebecca Doherty on 8/3/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Susan Lloyd. Related document(s) #2 . (M,TL)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Timothy Cannon on 8/2/2021 (marked c-19); Judge Rice for Justice on 8/2/2021 (marked c- 19); Cynthia Westcott Rice on 8/2/2021 (marked c-19); Mary Jane Trapp on 8/2/2021 (marked c-19), filed on behalf of Susan Lloyd. Related document(s) #2 . (R,AP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR, wrong event used. Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Mary Jane Trapp and delivered on 8/2/2021 (covid-19). (Related document(s) #2 ) (L,Ja). Modified on 8/9/2021 for filing error (H,SP).
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR, wrong event used. Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Timothy Cannon and delivered on 8/2/2021 (covid-19). (Related document(s) #2 (L,Ja). Modified on 8/9/2021 for filing error (H,SP).
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR, wrong event used. Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Judge Rice for Justice and delivered on 8/2/2021 (covid-19). (Related document(s) #2 ) (L,Ja). Modified on 8/9/2021 for filing error (H,SP).
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR, wrong event used. Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Cynthia Westcott Rice and delivered on 8/2/2021 (covid-19). (Related document(s) #2 ) (L,Ja). Modified on 8/9/2021 for filing error (H,SP).
July 30, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Akron Legal News, Inc. (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 9746), Tracey Blair (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4252), Brouse McDowell (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4269), Timothy Cannon (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4641), Committee to Elect Becky Doherty (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4313), Rebecca Doherty (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4658), Judge Rice for Justice (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4283), Cynthia Westcott Rice (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4306), Mary Jane Trapp (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4627), Jason Whitacre (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4276), Lisa Whitacre (Receipt #7021 0350 0001 5014 4290) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (M,TL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued (mailed to plaintiff) for service upon Akron Legal News, Inc., Tracey Blair, Brouse McDowell, Timothy Cannon, Committee to Elect Becky Doherty, Rebecca Doherty, Judge Rice for Justice, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Mary Jane Trapp, Jason Whitacre, Lisa Whitacre. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Akron Legal News, Inc., Tracey Blair, Brouse McDowell, Timothy Cannon, Committee to Elect Becky Doherty, Rebecca Doherty, Judge Rice for Justice, Cynthia Westcott Rice, Mary Jane Trapp, Jason Whitacre. Filing fee paid. $402.00, receipt # 54660008092, filed by Susan Lloyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,TL)
July 29, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL)
July 29, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Cannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Cannon
Represented By: Iris Jin
Represented By: Michael A. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Trapp
Represented By: Iris Jin
Represented By: Michael A. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Westcott Rice
Represented By: Iris Jin
Represented By: Michael A. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Doherty
Represented By: Kimberly Vanover Riley
Represented By: Lisa M. Zaring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Committee to Elect Becky Doherty
Represented By: Mary Catherine Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Rice for Justice
Represented By: Michael A. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Whitacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Whitacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brouse McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Blair
Represented By: Michael T. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akron Legal News, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?