Estate of Alfonso C. Askew v. Trumbull County et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Alfonso C. Askew
Defendant: Trumbull County, Dr. Phillip Malvasi D.O. LLC, D.O. Phillip Malvasi, Taylor Simmons, Bree Bright, Jess Johnson, Carla Ahart, Nurse and/or Medical Assistant JB and Doug Machingo
Case Number: 4:2021cv02133
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Taylor Simmons placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3520. (M,KS)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Phillip Malvasi placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3513. (R,AP)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Bree Bright placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3537. (M,KS)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jess Johnson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3476. (M,KS)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Nurse and/or Medical Assistant JB placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3490. (M,KS)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Carla Ahart placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3483. (M,KS)
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Dr. Phillip Malvasi D.O. LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7000 1530 0003 8869 3506. (R,AP)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (D,Ju)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Estate of Alfonso C. Askew. (Attachments: #1 Summons )(Greene, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this action was filed on 11/9/2021. The file in this case shows no summons has been provided or issued. If Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Defendants by 12/17/2021, they shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Defendants should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/14/2021. (JLG)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (D,Ju)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11125654.. Filed by Estate of Alfonso C. Askew. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Merit of Jeffrey E. Keller, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greene, Jacqueline)
November 9, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
November 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Alfonso C. Askew v. Trumbull County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Alfonso C. Askew
Represented By: Sarah J. Gelsomino
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Phillip Malvasi D.O. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Phillip Malvasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bree Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Ahart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse and/or Medical Assistant JB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Machingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?