Hoerig v. Smith
Petitioner: Claudia C. Hoerig
Respondent: Warden Shelbie Smith
Case Number: 4:2022cv00300
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 13 Second Notice of Incomplete Habeas Corpus Records and Urgent Request for a Ruling on Pending Motions before Respondent is Ordered to File Its Answer filed by Claudia C. Hoerig. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Related document(s) #4 , #9 , #10 , #11 .(G,M)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #9 Motion for Leave to Replace Draft of Memorandum in Support to Clarify the Records. Petitioner is granted leave to make the clerical corrections noted in her motion. Any additional arguments raised in her new pleading will be stricken. Petitioners corrected document must be filed within 30 days of this Order. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 3/18/2022. (W,K)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an Answer (Return of Writ) to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's Return of Writ to file a Reply (Traverse). Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond thereto. Any request for an extension of any deadline must be made at least three (3) business days before the deadline date, but such requests will not be routinely granted. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 3/15/2022. (W,K)
March 15, 2022 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost at 30 E. Broad St., 14th Floor, Columbus, OH 43215; Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #8 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and #12 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Warden Shelbie Smith at Dayton Correctional Institution, 4104 Germantown Street, Dayton, OH., 45417 ; and copy of #12 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Petitioner Claudia C. Hoerig #W-102849 at Dayton Correctional Institution,P.O. Box 17399, 4104 Germantown Street, Dayton, OH., 45418 on 3/15/2022. (W,K)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Clerical Error regarding Filing of Habeas Corpus Memorandum in Support of Exhibits filed by Claudia C. Hoerig. (Attachments: #1 Documents regarding Mishandling of Exhibits, #2 Letter addressed to Sandy Opacich regarding Exhibits, #3 envelope)Related document(s) #4 .(G,M)
March 10, 2022 Remark: The Office of the Clerk located in Youngstown, Ohio received a box of exhibits (A-Z) from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Voluminous exhibits manually filed and maintained in the Clerk's Office. Related document(s) #4 , #11 , #13 . (R,Li)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support and Exhibits (Doc #4 ) filed by Claudia C. Hoerig. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(G,M)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Replace Draft of Memorandum in Support to Clarify the Records filed by Petitioner Claudia C. Hoerig. Related document(s) #1 . (R,Li)
March 4, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/4/2022. (P,K)
March 2, 2022 Financial Transaction in the amount of $5.00 received from Dayton Correctional Inst. fbo Claudia Hoerig. Receipt # 44660006061. Related document(s) #1 . (D,Ju)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/23/2022. (O,K)
February 23, 2022 Notice to Attorney General of 2254 case transferred to Northern District of Ohio from Southern District of Ohio. (O,K)
February 23, 2022 Copy of Docket Sheet and #8 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Claudia C. Hoerig W-102849 at Dayton Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 17399, 4104 Germantown Street, Dayton, OH 45418 on 2/23/2022. Mailed copy of docket sheet and #8 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order to Shelbie Smith, Warden, Dayton Correctional Institution, 4104 Germantown Street, Dayton, OH 45417 on 2/23/2022. (O,K)
February 22, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K)
February 22, 2022 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (O,K)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 3:22-cv-00052. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL to USDC Northern District of Ohio at Youngstown. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Given the nature of Petitioners claims, this case would be more appropriately pursued in the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, at Youngstown, and it is therefore TRANSFERRED to that Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 2/22/22. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 22, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING REQUESTED by Petitioner Claudia C Hoerig. (Attachments: #1 Pages 17-40, #2 Pages 41-70, #3 Pages 71-99, #4 Pages 100-130, #5 Pages 131-160, #6 Pages 161-190, #7 Pages 191-215, #8 Pages 216-237, #9 Pages 238-256, #10 Pages 257-276, #11 Pages 277-296, #12 Pages 297-313, #13 Pages 314-339, #14 Pages 340-370) (srb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION FOR EXPERT ASSISTANCE by Petitioner Claudia C Hoerig. (srb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Petitioner Claudia C. Hoerig. (srb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Claudia C. Hoerig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoerig v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Claudia C. Hoerig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Shelbie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?