Canterbury et al. v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al.
Plaintiff: Aysia Canterbury and Lisa Sodergen
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv00298
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 17 Transcript of Hearing held on 3/31/23 before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Mary L. Uphold at (330) 884-7424 or mary_uphold@ohnd.uscourts.gov. [87 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 4/13/2023. Redaction Request due 4/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2023. (U,ML)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 25 in Case No. 4:23CV0242; and appoints Interim Class Counsel as proposed by the Feezle Leadership Group and adopts the Feezle Leadership Group's proposed leadership structure with slight modification. The Court notes that both the Feezle Leadership Group and Team Ohio have demonstrated the qualifications, experience, and commitment to adequately represent the putative class. While both sets of counsel raise compelling arguments, the Court finds that the Feezle Leadership Group will best serve the interests of the putative class. Because the Court finds the Feezle Leadership Group clearly satisfies the requirements of Rule 23(g), it approves their proposed organizational structure consisting of Interim Class Counsel, Co-Lead Counsel, an Executive Committee (which includes Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel), Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (which includes Plaintiffs' Co-Liaison Counsel), Community Liaison Counsel, and several Subcommittees such as Discovery, Law and Briefing, Science, and Experts, and appoints the attorneys and responsibilities set forth herein. The Court has also considered the parties' Joint Status Report (ECF No. 26 in Case No. 4:23CV0242). Case Nos. in 4:23-cv-00242, 4:23-cv-00250, 4:23-cv-00257, 4:23-cv-00268, 4:23-cv-00292, 4:23-cv-00298, 4:23-cv-00303, 4:23-cv-00308, 4:23-cv-00315, 4:23-cv-00324, 4:23-cv-00344, 4:23-cv-00345, 4:23-cv-00350, 4:23-cv-00363, 4:23-cv-00380, 4:23-cv-00415, 4:23-cv-00429, 4:23-cv-00440, 4:23-cv-00479, 4:23-cv-00495, 4:23-cv-00509, 4:23-cv-00510, 4:23-cv-00529, 4:23-cv-00586, 4:23-cv-00600, 4:23-cv-00601, 4:23-cv-00602, 4:23-cv-00603, 4:23-cv-00604, 4:23-cv-00634, and 4:23-cv-00672 are hereby consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42. On or before 5/4/2023, Co-Lead Counsel shall serve and file a Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint in Case No. 4:23-cv-00242 (i.e. the first-filed case) joining the claims from the consolidated cases (including cases filed by individual plaintiffs that are not putative class actions) that reflects their joint representation of Plaintiffs. Therefore, Defendants need not respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in Case No. 4:23-cv-00242. The record, including the docket sheet for Case No. 4:23-cv-00242 shall be changed to reflect that "In re: East Palestine Train Derailment" is the name of this litigation, in lieu of "Feezle et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. et al. " Further proceedings in the following cases are stayed: Case Nos. 4:23-cv-00250, 4:23-cv-00257, 4:23-cv-00268, 4:23-cv-00292, 4:23-cv-00298, 4:23-cv-00303, 4:23-cv-00308, 4:23-cv-00315, 4:23-cv-00324, 4:23-cv-00344, 4:23-cv-00345, 4:23-cv-00350, 4:23-cv-00363, 4:23-cv-00380, 4:23-cv-00415, 4:23-cv-00429, 4:23-cv-00440, 4:23-cv-00479, 4:23-cv-00495, 4:23-cv-00509, 4:23-cv-00510, 4:23-cv-00529, 4:23-cv-00586, 4:23-cv-00600, 4:23-cv-00601, 4:23-cv-00602, 4:23-cv-00603, 4:23-cv-00604, 4:23-cv-00634, and 4:23-cv-00672. Defendants shall have until 30 days after service of the Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint to answer, plead or otherwise move in response to the affirmative pleading. If Defendants serve and file a motion in response to the Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Plaintiffs must serve and file a memorandum in opposition within 30 days after service of the motion. Defendants may serve and file a reply memorandum in support of any motion filed in response to the Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint within 14 days after service of the memorandum in opposition. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference shall be completed on or before 5/18/2023. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2) (JLG)
March 31, 2023 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and a Plaintiffs' Leadership Structure (ECF No. 25 in Case No. 4:23CV0242) and the Joint Status Report (ECF No. 26 in Case No. 4:23CV0242) held on 3/31/2023 via Zoomgov.com. The matters set forth in the 2 filings are heard and submitted. Present were Plaintiff Attorneys Seth A. Katz, M. Elizabeth Graham, Jayne Conroy, T. Michael Morgan, Steve W. Berman, Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, Ronald R. Parry, Kristen A. Johnson, Nils P. Johnson, Jr., Nils Peter Johnson, R. Andrew Jones, Katherine Rudzik, Christopher A. Seeger, Charles Schaffer, Mark P. Bryant, Daniel N. Abraham, James J. Bilsborrow, Eric H. Zagrans, D. Blayne Honeycutt, Mark P. Chalos, Michelle L. Kranz, Robert R. Sparks, Michael T. Rapier, Elizabeth A. Bernard, Ashlie Case Sletvold, Justin D. Newman, Calvin C. Fayard Jr., Gary A. Davis, Daniel Karon, Whitney K. Siehl, Vincent L. Greene, IV, Terence R. Coates, David I. Shroyer, and Dena Young; and Attorneys J. Lawson Johnston and Scott D. Clements as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Shanon J. Carson and K. Matthews also appeared. Attorney Jones withdrew Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #15 in Case No. 4:23CV0509). Attorney Goldenberg agreed to speak to Attorney Coates about Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Relief (ECF No. #10 in Case No. 4:23CV0315) and advise the Court. Attorney Clements advised the Court that Blackhawk School District v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al, No. 2:23-cv-00500-CB is pending in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. (Court Reporter: Mary Uphold); Time: 1 Hour 55 Minutes. (JLG)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: Pursuant to prior Orders, the parties in the cases related to the 2/3/2023 Norfolk Southern train derailment in East Palestine, Ohio then pending on the docket of the undersigned filed Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and a Plaintiffs' Leadership Structure (ECF No. 25 in Case No. 4:23CV0242 (i.e. the first-filed case)) and a Joint Status Report (ECF No. 26 in Case No. 4:23CV0242). Take notice that Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and a Plaintiffs' Leadership Structure (ECF No. 25 in Case No. 4:23CV0242) and the Joint Status Report (ECF No. 26 in Case No. 4:23CV0242) shall come on for hearing on Friday, 3/31/2023 at 9:00 a.m. EDT before the undersigned via Zoomgov.com. Counsel in the 29 cases now pending on the docket of the undersigned shall be prepared to voice their positions regarding the matters set forth in the 2 filings. The Court will email the Zoomgov.com meeting link to Seth A. Katz and M. Elizabeth Graham (Plaintiffs' counsel in Case No. 4:23CV0268), who shall be responsible for forwarding the link to all other counsel in the 29 cases now pending on the docket of the undersigned. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/24/2023. (G,M)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting #11 , #12 , #13 Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys T. Michael Morgan, Rene Rocha, and Frank Petosa for Plaintiffs. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/10/2023. (JLG)
March 9, 2023 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Frank Petosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11882262, filed by Aysia Canterbury, Lisa Sodergen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shore, Jesse) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Mc,K).
March 9, 2023 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Rene F. Rocha to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11882261, filed by Aysia Canterbury, Lisa Sodergen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shore, Jesse) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Mc,K).
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 Motion for attorney T. Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11882183, filed by Aysia Canterbury, Lisa Sodergen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shore, Jesse) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Mc,K).
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order On or before 3/15/2023, counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file in Case No. 4:23CV0242 (i.e. the first-filed case) a motion proposing a class counsel organizational structure, including, if necessary, a competing structure(s). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g). The motion shall include in a single document the views of all counsel for Plaintiffs in the 18 cases now pending on the docket of the undersigned. Attorneys Seth A. Katz and M. Elizabeth Graham are responsible for coordinating the final version of the motion and Attorney Jayne Conroy shall file the motion. The motion and any briefing regarding it shall not be filed in any of the other pending cases. Further, on or before 3/15/2023, counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file in Case No. 4:23CV0242 a Joint Status Report setting forth their views and the views of defense counsel regarding (1) the potential consolidation of the 18 cases, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), (2) the filing of a Master Consolidated Amended Complaint in Case No. 4:23CV0242, and (3) the timing of Defendants' responsive filing. Attorneys Seth A. Katz and M. Elizabeth Graham are responsible for coordinating the final version of the Joint Status Report and Attorney Jayne Conroy shall file it. The Joint Status Report and any briefing regarding it shall not be filed in any of the other pending cases. Benita Y. Pearson on 3/8/2023. (R,Li)
February 17, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation, Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Properties, inc., Other Affiliate General American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate NS Fiber Optics, Inc., Other Affiliate Thoroughbred Technology & Telecommunications, LLC for Norfolk Southern Railway Company filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clements, Scott)
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Properties, inc., Other Affiliate General American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate NS Fiber Optics, Inc., Other Affiliate Thoroughbred Technology & Telecommunications, LLC, Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Railway Company for Norfolk Southern Corporation filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Clements, Scott)
February 17, 2023 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston filed by on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Johnston, J.)
February 17, 2023 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Scott D. Clements filed by on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clements, Scott)
February 17, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (L,MI)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shore, Jesse)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Norfolk Southern Corporation waiver sent on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shore, Jesse)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Benita Y. Pearson for all further proceedings. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/16/2023. (Y,A)
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (D,Ju)
February 16, 2023 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (D,Ju)
February 16, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,Ju)
February 16, 2023 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. Judge J. Philip Calabrese terminated. (L,MI)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11843300. Filed by Aysia Canterbury, Lisa Sodergen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shore, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canterbury et al. v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aysia Canterbury
Represented By: Jesse A. Shore
Represented By: Frank M Petosa
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha, III
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sodergen
Represented By: Jesse A. Shore
Represented By: Frank M Petosa
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha, III
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?