Spotsylvania Mall Company v. GP Mobile 2 LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Spotsylvania Mall Company
Defendant: GP Mobile 2 LLC doing business as T-Mobile, Solutions Center LLC, Express Management Holdings FL, LLC, Executive Cellular Phones Inc. and Express Management Virginia LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00840
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 29 Motion for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Defendant GP Mobile 2 LLC. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply)(Rossiter, B.)
June 13, 2023 Filing 28 Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. Related document #17 (Madgar, Lindsey)
June 9, 2023 Filing 27 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Express Management Holdings FL, LLC, Express Management Virginia LLC. (L,Br)
June 9, 2023 Filing 26 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. (Madgar, Lindsey)
June 9, 2023 Filing 25 Proposed Order Substituting Parties (Stipulated) filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. Related document(s) #18 . (Rossiter, B.)
June 9, 2023 Filing 24 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons on Express Management Holdings FL, LLC filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint for Money Only)(Madgar, Lindsey)
June 9, 2023 Filing 23 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons on Express Management Virginia, LLC filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint for Money Only)(Madgar, Lindsey)
June 7, 2023 Filing 22 Amended Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Solutions Center LLC. Solutions Center LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023 filed on behalf of Solutions Center LLC. Related document #21 (Snyder, Cary) Modified on 6/7/2023 to add dates to text (L,Br).
June 2, 2023 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Solutions Center LLC. Solutions Center LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023 filed on behalf of Solutions Center LLC (Snyder, Cary)
June 2, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Solutions Center LLC. (Snyder, Cary)
June 2, 2023 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance by Cary M. Snyder filed by on behalf of Solutions Center LLC. (Snyder, Cary)
June 1, 2023 Filing 18 Motion to substitute party or, Alternatively, Motion for leave to intervene filed by Defendant GP Mobile 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Pleading)(Rossiter, B.). Added Motion for leave on 6/5/2023 (L,Br).
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 Opposition to #13 Motion to remand to State Court filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unit 445 Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - 5th Am to Unit 445 Lease, #3 Exhibit Consent and 6th Am to Unit 445 Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent and 7th Am to Unit 445 Lease, #5 Exhibit 5 - APA Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - Press release, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rent check sample, #8 Exhibit 8 - Unit 460 Lease, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2d Am to Unit 460 Lease, #10 Exhibit 10 - Rent check sample, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Traci Kopf, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Byron Henry)(Rossiter, B.)
May 18, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. (Madgar, Lindsey)
May 18, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Order to Remand filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. Related document(s) #13 . (Madgar, Lindsey)
May 18, 2023 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Spotsylvania Mall Company. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Michael Sarris, #2 Exhibit B-Clause 24 of 445 Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Letter from GP Mobile 2, LLC's counsel to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D-Clause 24 of 460 Lease) (Madgar, Lindsey)
May 18, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Spotsylvania Mall Company. (Madgar, Lindsey)
May 17, 2023 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint filed by Executive Cellular Phones Inc.. (Lewallen, Meghan)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 6/22/2023 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/10/23. (D,Ma)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: Plaintiff and Defendant Executive Cellular Phones, Inc.s Stipulated Leave for Defendant Executive Cellular Phones, Inc. to Plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint until May 17, 2023 is So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/8/23. (LC,S) re #7
May 4, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Executive Cellular Phones Inc.. (Lewallen, Meghan)
May 4, 2023 Notice by Clerk that Executive Cellular Phones Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Br)
May 3, 2023 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Christopher C. Koehler filed by on behalf of Executive Cellular Phones Inc.. (Koehler, Christopher)
May 3, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation Leave to Plead filed by Executive Cellular Phones Inc.. (Lewallen, Meghan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Meghan C. Lewallen filed by on behalf of Executive Cellular Phones Inc.. (Lewallen, Meghan)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ju)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. (Rossiter, B.)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet page 2, filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Rossiter, B.)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet (incomplete), filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Rossiter, B.)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas Trumbull County, Ohio, case number 2023-cv-00451 Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11958138. Filed by GP Mobile 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons, #3 Exhibit C- Proof of Service (GP2), #4 Exhibit D- Proof of Service (ECP), #5 Exhibit E- Answer, #6 Exhibit F- Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit G- Declaration of Britt Jason Rossiter, #8 Exhibit H- Declaration of Jennifer Levanchy, #9 Exhibit I- Declaration of Rob Scudiero) (Rossiter, B.)
April 21, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (D,Ju)
April 21, 2023 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (D,Ju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spotsylvania Mall Company v. GP Mobile 2 LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spotsylvania Mall Company
Represented By: Lindsey M. Harrison Madgar
Represented By: Michael J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Mobile 2 LLC doing business as T-Mobile
Represented By: B. Jason Rossiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutions Center LLC
Represented By: Cary M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Management Holdings FL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Cellular Phones Inc.
Represented By: Meghan C. Lewallen
Represented By: Christopher C. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Management Virginia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?