Walker v. Youngstown Metropolitan Housing Authority et al.
Plaintiff: Dorita Walker
Defendant: Youngstown Metropolitan Housing Authority, Judge Cunnings, Attorney Amy Fetchko and Amy Fetchko
Case Number: 4:2023cv02309
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 Supplement - Document (Complaint) filed with The Mahoning County Common Pleas Court, Case No. 2024cv45 to #1 Complaint filed by Dorita Walker. Related document(s) #1 . (D,Ju)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 Supplemental Documents to #1 Complaint filed by Dorita Walker. (G,M)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 Supplemental Documents in Support to #1 Complaint filed by Dorita Walker. Related document(s) #1 . (G,M)
December 14, 2023 Filing 3 Supplemental Exhibits in Support to #1 Complaint filed by Dorita Walker. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint - 4:23 CV 2309, #2 Documents filed in Campbell Municipal Court, #3 Document filed in Campbell Municipal Court, #4 Additional Documents in Support, #5 Copy of Checks and Account Statements)(G,M)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Dorita Walker. Related document(s) #1 . (G,M)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Judge Cunnings, Amy Fetchko, Youngstown Metropolitan Housing Authority. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Dorita Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (G,M)
December 1, 2023 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (G,M)
December 1, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (G,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Youngstown Metropolitan Housing Authority et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorita Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youngstown Metropolitan Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Cunnings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Amy Fetchko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Fetchko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?