Arnold v. Hauswirth et al.
Plaintiff: Ralph Arnold
Defendant: Kyle A. Hauswirth, Karrie Hupka, Unit Manager Joe Remish, Case Manager Scott Nowak, Charmaine Bracy and Reena Gordon
Case Number: 4:2024cv00312
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice filed by Ralph Arnold. (W,CM)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of #3 Magistrate Consent Form and Blank Summons mailed to Ralph Arnold, 388-487, 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 2/23/224. Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (R,AP)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. The summons provided were not in compliance of this Court and therefore not issued. (R,AP)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff Ralph Arnold. Related document(s) #1 . (R,AP) (#1 Envelope) Envelope added on 2/20/2024 (G,M)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $405.00. Receipt #150269. Filed by Ralph Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Refer Fact 29, #4 Exhibit B - Refer Fact 32, #5 Exhibit C - Refer Fact 49, #6 Exhibit D - Refer Fact 65, #7 Exhibit E - Refer Fact 67, #8 Exhibit F - Refer Fact 110, #9 Exhibit G - Refer Fact 115, #10 Exhibit I - Fact 134, #11 Exhibit J - Refer Fact 144, #12 Envelope). (R,AP)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (R,AP)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (R,AP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Hauswirth et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle A. Hauswirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie Hupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Joe Remish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Scott Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmaine Bracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reena Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?