McCarty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle M. McCarty
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2024cv00451
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Darrell A Clay
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Blower, David)
March 19, 2024 Filing 8 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/19/2024. (R,Sh)
March 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s) #8 . (F,AW)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Ke)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 calendar days after notice of the complaint is served on it to file the certified transcript of the administrative record. Plaintiff must file its Brief on the Merits within 45 calendar days of the filing of the Administrative Transcript. If Plaintiff's Brief on the Merits is not filed within 45 calendar days after the Administrative Transcript, the case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution without further notice. Defendant's Brief on the Merits must be filed within 45 calendar days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/8/2024. (R,Ke)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/8/2024.(R,Ke)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2024. (G,M)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 Status Report filed by Michelle M. McCarty. (Wicklund, Edward)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michelle M. McCarty. (Wicklund, Edward)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michelle M. McCarty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wicklund, Edward)
March 8, 2024 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (G,M)
March 8, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (G,M)
March 8, 2024 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (G,M)
March 8, 2024 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 3/8/2024. (G,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M. McCarty
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Represented By: David I. Blower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?