Trimble v. Bobby
Petitioner: James Trimble
Respondent: David Bobby
Case Number: 5:2010cv00149
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/28/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants petitioner's motion for authorization for appointed federal counsel to represent him as co-counsel in an upcoming state-court evidentiary hearing. (Related Docs. 87 , 88 , and 89 ) (D,MA)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/20/13. The Court conditionally grants the petition for writ of habeas corpus on Petitioner Trimble's juror bias claim. Petitioner Trimble's death sentences from his state convict ion are vacated and set aside. Petitioner must be given a new capital sentencing hearing within 200 days of this Order or the Warden is not entitled to execute petitioner's death sentences. The Court denies the petition as to all other claims. The Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could be taken in good faith. The Court issues a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2253(c) and Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 22(b) on juror bias, admission of weapons and prosecutorial misconduct. (Related Doc. 10 ) (M,G)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/5/12 denying petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing. (Related Doc. 58 ) (M,G)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James s. Gwin on 5/20/10 denying petitioner's motion to certify for interlocutory appeal and to stay proceedings. (Related Doc. 39 ) (M,G)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/19/11 denying petitioner's motion for reconsideration. (Related Doc. 31 ) (M,G)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/14/11. Petitioner's motion to convey is denied as set forth in this entry. (Related Doc. 24 ) (M,G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimble v. Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Trimble
Represented By: Kathryn L. Sandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?