Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Board of Trustees v. Courtad, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Board of Trustees
Defendant: Courtad, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv02738
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion to dismiss the amended complaint is denied. (Doc. No. 44 .) This case management plan in this case was previously set aside pending the Court's ruling on defendant's motion for judgment on plaintiff's original complaint. (Non-document Order April 23, 2014.) The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with counsel only on October 1, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. to establish a revised case management plan. Counsel shall confer in advance of the status conference and jointly file a proposed case management plan by September 28, 2015, that includes deadlines for any remaining discovery and for summary judgment motions. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/21/2015. (P,J)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Opinion and Order: Federal alter ego doctrine does not apply to this case. Yet, the Court cannot determine as a matter of law that plaintiff could not state a valid claim for relief on these facts under other theories of corporate liability. A ccordingly, the Court grants plaintiff 14 days in which to amend its complaint to state a valid and timely claim for relief for breach of the settlement agreement; otherwise, plaintiff's complaint shall be dismissed. (Related Doc # 27 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/18/2014. (P,J)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying defendant's motion to dismiss. (Related Doc # 5 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/26/2013. (P,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Board of Trustees v. Courtad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Board of Trustees
Represented By: Diana M. Robinson
Represented By: William H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtad, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?