United States of America et al v. Muskinghum Watershed Conservancy District
Plaintiff: United States of America, Leatra Harper, Steven Jansto and Leslie Harper
Defendant: Muskinghum Watershed Conservancy District
Case Number: 5:2013cv02145
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Tuscarawas
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Memorandum Opinion: Respondent's motion for reasonable fees and expenses (Doc. No. 41 ) is denied in its entirety. See order for details. (Related Doc Nos. 42 , 43 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 9/15/2017. (S,He)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum Opinion: If defendant MWCD prevails on appeal, it will be permitted 14 days after the issuance of the mandate to file a request for attorney's fees and expenses. Accordingly, MWCD's motion for attorney's fees and expenses (Doc. No. 27 ) is denied without prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/5/2016. (P,J)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum Opinion: Because relators Leatra Harper, Steven Jansto, and Leslie Harper's claims are barred by the public disclosure doctrine, and because relators have failed to plead fraud with particularity under Rules 8 and 9 of the Fede ral Rules of Civil Procedure, Muskinghum Watershed Conservancy District's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 12 ) is granted. Moreover, because it would be futile to permit any further amendment of the pleadings, relators' motion to amend (Doc. No. 15 ) is denied. This case is dismissed. (Related Doc. Nos. 17 , 18 , and 19 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 11/25/2015. (S,He)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Muskinghum Watershed Conservancy District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas W. Connors
Represented By: Steven J. Paffilas
Represented By: Kent W. Penhallurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatra Harper
Represented By: Thomas W. Connors
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jansto
Represented By: Thomas W. Connors
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Harper
Represented By: Thomas W. Connors
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muskinghum Watershed Conservancy District
Represented By: J. Kevin Lundholm
Represented By: James J. Pringle, Jr.
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: Peter D. Welin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?