C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC v. BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC and Beelman River Terminals, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02797
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: John R. Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The motions for partial summary judgment filed by counterclaim defendants Christopher Norris, Robert Rogers, and International Barge & Steel, LLC and C. Norris Manufacturing are granted in part and denied in part; summary judgment is granted in favor of counterclaim defendants Christopher Norris, Robert Rogers, and International Barge & Steel, LLC and C. Norris Manufacturing; the amended counterclaims of counterclaim plaintiffs BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC, dba B eelman Heavy Equipment, LLC, and Beelman River Terminals, Inc., for fraud and fraudulent inducement (Count III), negligent misrepresentation (Count IV), conversion (Count V), unjust enrichment against C. Norris Manufacturing only (Count VI), and coun terclaim plaintiffs' theories of piercing the corporate veils of C. Norris Manufacturing and International Barge & Steel, LLC in order to hold Christopher Norris and Robert Rogers personally liable (Count VII) are dismissed with prejudice; furth er, the motions for partial summary judgment of counterclaim defendants Christopher Norris, Robert Rogers, and International Barge & Steel, LLC and C. Norris Manufacturing on counterclaim plaintiffs BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC, dba Beelman Heavy Equipme nt, LLC, and Beelman River Terminals, Inc.'s amended counterclaims for unjust enrichment against Christopher Norris, Robert Rogers, and International Barge & Steel, LLC (Count VI) are denied (Related documents 82 and 83 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 3/30/17. (S,AA)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons herein, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment. ECF Dkt. # 84 . The Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff' ;s claim for promissory estoppel and dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff's promissory estoppel claim. Id. However, the Court denies all other aspects of Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Id. Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 3/17/2017. (S,L)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Counterclaim-defendants C. Norris Manufacturing LLC, International Barge & Steel LLC, Christopher Norris, and Robert Rogers' motion to dismiss counterclaim-plaintiffs' amended counterclaim is denied (Related document 65 ); Counts III, IV, V, VI, and VII of counterclaim-plaintiffs' amended counterclaim will remain (Related document 59 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 8/1/16. (S,AA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC v. BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Owen J. Rarric
Represented By: Eugene Roytberg
Represented By: Sam O. Simmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRT Heavy Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Gust Callas
Represented By: Whitney L. Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beelman River Terminals, Inc.
Represented By: Gust Callas
Represented By: Whitney L. Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?