CODA Development s.r.o. et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: CODA Development s.r.o., CODA Innovations s.r.o. and Frantisek Hrabal
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Robert Benedict and Robert Allen Losey
Case Number: 5:2015cv01572
Filed: August 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth, 221 , 229 defendants' motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs' remaining claims is denied; further, 222 , 225 defendants' motion for summary judgment as to trade secrets damages is also denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/30/2021. (E,CK)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Memorandum Opinion and Order re 168 and 169 , 195 and 196 Objections filed by defendants in so far as they relate to defendants' discovery requests in Doc. 103 and 110 , as supplemented by Doc. 144 , are overruled in part and sustained in part; in particular, all objections are overruled except as to the Alliacense Chart II (for which privilege was waived) and the Jackson Excel Notes and FH Claim Chart (for which production is warranted under the "substantial need" doctrine). Counsel and parties are cautioned to read the entire order and not rely only on this docket text. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/4/2021. (D,S)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Memorandum Opinion and Order that the Court will require that plaintiffs supply a "closed" response to defendants' Interrogatory No. 1, supplying sufficient specificity and description to permit defendants to know what discovery will be relevant and what specific claims of trade secret misappropriation they must defend against. Although general supplementation will not be permitted, should it be determined that plaintiffs inadvertently failed to include something in their a nswer to Interrogatory No. 1, the Court will remain open to entertaining limited supplementation upon a showing of an exceptional reason for doing so. The parties are advised to read the full Memorandum Opinion and Order for the Court's entire ruling and not merely rely upon this docket text. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/21/2019. (D,S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth herein and in defendants' opposition (Doc. No. 36 ), plaintiffs' motion to amend, or for relief from, the Court's judgment dismissing the case (Doc. No. 32 ) is denied, e xcept for the single correction in note 5, supra, regarding substitution of inventors under 35 U.S.C. Section 256. Further, plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a first amended complaint (Doc. No. 33 ) is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/26/2017. (P,J)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum Opinion: For the reasons set forth herein, as well as those set forth in defendants' supporting memoranda, plaintiffs' motion to strike (Doc. No. 26 ) is denied, and defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 16 ) is granted. This case is dismissed. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/29/2016. (P,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CODA Development s.r.o. et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: John Charles Evans
Represented By: Thomas R. Goots
Represented By: Calvin P. Griffith
Represented By: David M. Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Benedict
Represented By: John Charles Evans
Represented By: Thomas R. Goots
Represented By: Calvin P. Griffith
Represented By: David M. Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen Losey
Represented By: John Charles Evans
Represented By: Thomas R. Goots
Represented By: Calvin P. Griffith
Represented By: David M. Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODA Development s.r.o.
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Steven C. Carlson
Represented By: Tracy Scott Johnson
Represented By: Kevin M. Pasquinelli
Represented By: Alexander B. Reich
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: J. Michael Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODA Innovations s.r.o.
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Steven C. Carlson
Represented By: Tracy Scott Johnson
Represented By: Kevin M. Pasquinelli
Represented By: Alexander B. Reich
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: J. Michael Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frantisek Hrabal
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Steven C. Carlson
Represented By: Tracy Scott Johnson
Represented By: Kevin M. Pasquinelli
Represented By: Alexander B. Reich
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: J. Michael Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?