Dekany v. City of Akron, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Alexis Dekany
Defendant: City of Akron, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, Akron Police Department, Stow Police Department, Drew Kelly, Does 1-5, Jacob Corfman, James Prusha, Eric Paull and Does 6-10
Case Number: 5:2016cv01829
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: John R. Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Order denying Defendant Eric Paull's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 28, 2019 Opinion (Doc. 356). Judge John R. Adams on 7/9/19. (K,C)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Order denying Defendants' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 249 ); granting Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc # 259 , 260 , 261 , and 264 ); granting 262 and 263 Defendants' Motions to Extend Deadlines. The dispositive motion deadline is now 1/19/18. Judge John R. Adams on 1/10/18.(L,J)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for a protective order (Related Doc # 220 ) regarding the deposition of her mother. Judge John R. Adams on 11/8/17.(L,J)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for a protective order (Related Doc # 146 ). Plaintiff shall provide Defendants with the unredacted mental health records by no later than June 16, 2017. Judge John R. Adams on 6/14/17.(L,J)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendant Paull's Motion for protective order (Related Doc # 30 ); resolving the objections to the R&R prepared by the Magistrate Judge. Please see order for specific details. Judge John R. Adams on 1/9/17.(L,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dekany v. City of Akron, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Dekany
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Natasha Wells Niklas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Akron, Ohio
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stow, Ohio
Represented By: Stacy V. Pollock
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akron Police Department
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stow Police Department
Represented By: Stacy V. Pollock
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Corfman
Represented By: Stacy V. Pollock
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Prusha
Represented By: Stacy V. Pollock
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Paull
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?