Rover Pipeline LLC v. Bartter et al
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Bartter, Dominion Resources, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company, Gregory Shetler, Paul J. Kanney, Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Niese Brothers Farms, Jerry Moore, Inc., S & S Energy Corp., Bethel Resources, Inc., Lyndsey A. Stacklin, Diversified Resources, Inc., R.J. Corman Railroad Company/Cleveland Line, Unifund CCR, LLC, Patricia A. Foley, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Christ A. Miller, Solomon Klausner, Mandy Lynn Paramore, Joseph W. Smith, Verizon North, Inc., Stanley W. Wise, Richard T. Morrison, Svend Hansen, Jr., William D. Gartrell, Christine Pitts, Earl C. Sheehan, L. Vincent Goff, Jr., Ralph L. Graybill, III, Elizabeth Bucher, Ashland Railway, Inc., Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC, Quaker State Oil Refining, Mark Farnsworth, Paul Kanney, Melvin R. Grindstaff, Enterprise Energy Corporation, Cathy Jean Rennie, NiSource Energy Ventures, Larry J. Adam, Squaw Valley Lake, LLC, Hill Haven Farms, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-WI, LP, Janet L. Clabaugh, Dominion Natrium Holdings, Inc., Keith A. Alt, Carter M. Hanna, Belden & Blake, LLC, Capital C Energy Operations, LP, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Jack Cameron, North Central Electric Co-operative, Inc., AT&T Wireless PCS Inc., Jason F. Kalb, Sutton Bank, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Inc., East Ohio Gas Company, Blanche S. Haddock, Doris E. Studer, John S. Miller, Spartek, Inc., Kamenik Real Estate, LLC, Andrea I. Michelson, Jon C. Foley, Rosalyn Miller, Farmers National Banc Corp., Kevin C. Lee, Connie Jo Swogger, Frannie D. Wengerd, Barkheimer Realty LTD, Irene L. Kimmins, Kenoil, LLC, Craig W. Strasser, Niese Farms, Ruth P. Keim, Amish Helping Fund, L & M Associates, Inc., James S. Yoder, Ponderosa Consulting Services, Inc., James R. Smail, Inc., Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., LaVon I. Luidhardt, Ohio Oil Gathering Corporation IV, Mechanics Bank, Derby Operating Corporation, Danny S. Tomecko, Daniel L. Detwiler, Dawn M. Honigman Bernadine, Farmers Savings Bank, Letterman Brothers Energy Program 1980-3, Robert K. Waines, Jr., Harry D. Copeland, Teresa A. Young, Dianne L. Sautter, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Geneva Lutz, Sound Energy Company, Inc., Michael F. Leuthold, Martha M. Yoder, Stuart N. Swinehart, Mary Ann Kendle, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Roger J. Ackerman, Enervest Ltd., Mark Allen Gifford, Clark B. Scott, David E. Acker, Pelican Energy, LLC, JD Producing, Inc., Lesa L. Harper, NextEra Energy Honey Creek Wind, LLC, Kathryn S. Pontones, CGas Properties, LP, Noreen S. Leavers, Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC, Lauren W. Ferris, Clarence W. Burton, Sprint Communications Company LP, Michelle M. Sommers, Carla Elaine Geiser, Doral P. McCartney, Reuben A. Keim, Carl D. Miller, III, MKE Producing, Inc., Edward D. Von Stein, Tyler Levengood, Northwoods Corporation, James R. Wolfe, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Frieda Schmuki, NiSource Energy Ventures, LLC, Vance J. Leggett, Monty Morrison, Judith J. Morrison, William L. Jones, Amandea H. Hostetler, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Homer Stuck, John C. Kamenik, Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc., Patrick C. Goebel, David E. Phillips, Sharon R. McClaren, Jack K. Miller, Esther Mae Yoder, Kenneth L. Kark, W. Dexter Rossman, Cynthia Clark Brown, Keith R. Loy, Scott A. Numbers, Mattie Yoder, Carole M. Scheetz, Kenneth R. Orr, Clayton E. Over, David K. Kennedy, Tiptop Energy Production US, LLC, Richard M. McCarty, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Maude Mase, Kelly J. Smith, Rhine Oil Company, LLC, Huntington Trust Company, N.A., Jim Aslanides, Burton L. Jones, Ruth A. Kaplan, David E. Crum, George H. Farnsworth, Roger W. Spellman, Jr., Ray L. Pfahler, Green Energy, Inc., Huntington Bancshares, Inc., Earl F. Arnholt, Unknown Heirs and Assigns of Simon S. Hershberger and Mattie S. Hershberger, Rolling Ridge Angus Farms, LTD., MMJ Farms, LLC, Eli D. Mast, CSX Transportation, Inc., Shari A. Harlan, MFC Drilling, Inc., Charles Hoyt, Carolyn Farnsworth, C. Glen Jenkins Trust, Mutual Oil & Gas Co., M & R Investments Ohio, LLC, Duane Bodager, Kathy A. Wolfe, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Thomas L. Clabaugh, Gregory Tieche, Sharon L. Meyer, George E. Frey, RWM & M Development Corporation, Lisa C. Over, CGas Exploration, Inc., Jane Phenicie, Robert and Lillian Niese Farms, LTD., Jonas M. Yoder, Central Bank & Trust Co., Unknown heirs of Dorothy Somers Clarke, Marie R. Adam, Dover-Atwood 1994 Limited Partnership, Porter Family Trust -, AT & T Corp., Jamestown Resources, LLC, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Perry Sterner, Karen S. Miller, Robert F. Breneman, Edison J. Gartrell, MorMack Industries, Inc., Pennzoil Company, Gary L. Habrun, Donald A. Pontones, Wenner Petroleum, Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC, Scott T. Lutz, Christene L. Acker, Dominion Transmission, Inc., Max M. Acker, Jill Galbraith, Glenn A. Burky, Stephen R. Harrer, Larry W. Sommers, Melvin D. Wengerd, Devon Energy Production Company, LP, Ruth Mae Linder, Rudolph J. Berger, John F. Brainerd, J. L. Henning, Carl R. Gessell, AG Credit, Agricultural Credit Association, Tate Farms Company, Ltd., Artex Oil Company, E. Jane Phenicie, Tanya S. Gartrell, Allen Oil LLC, Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company, Richard S. Morrison, Roger Phillip Smailes, Interstate Escrow Corporation, Aden D. Yoder, Unknown Heirs of Margaret Weisgarber, Ohio Power Company, Martha L. Starr, Anschutz Exploration Corporation, John C. Foley Living Trust Agreement u/d/t March 10, 2015, Stag Petroleum, Inc., Anita Sue Jorney-Gifford, NextEra Energy Solutions, LLC, Helen M. Rossman, Dominion East Ohio, North East Natural Gas Company, Gerald Kendle, Jr., Stella Sheaffer, Farmers and Savings Bank, Division of the Park National Bank, Karen L. Dohner, Steven R. Smith, Linda L. Detwiler, Robert Ferris, Jerry J. Gartrell, Equitable Savings and Loan Company, Bucyrus Community Hospital, James A. Weisenauer, Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC, Christina S. Hughes, Pamela E. Loy, Catherine E. Habrun, Connie L. Leggett, Rebecca L. Burcaw, Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Patsy J. Schmuki, Anderson Group of Companies, Inc., Henry S. Belden, IV, CNX Gas Company, LLC, Frontier North, Inc., Ura Troyer, Jr., Kenoil, McBel Trust, Searl Dean Allen, Dorthy H. Copeland, Julius H. Clabaugh 'B' Trust FBO Bertha Clabaugh, Phillip R. Harlan, Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc., CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Jodi Kendle, Michael A. Bostic, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Wanda Maxwell, CHK Utica, LLC, Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC, Diversified Oil & Gas, LLC, Howard D. Miller, B. Nadine Leggett, Carol A. Stroh, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Ronald J. Spellman, Ashland Oil, Inc., Cavalry Spv. I, LLC, Buckeye Pipeline Company, LP, Marbel Trust B, PNC Bank, NA, David J. Yoder, Consumers National Bank, Cravat Coal Company, Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Alvin D. Yoder, Jim Pittenger, Energex Corporation, Edward L. Harer, Gerald T. Stacklin, Barbara J. Harer, Danny R. Thompson, Lloyd Wayne James, Christina Coblentz, Joyce A. Smith, Aden E. Mast, Rosemary Crandall, Larry L. Pfahler, Keith Dohner, Lawrence H. Biglin, Geraldine Falk, Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC, John D. Schimpf, Bryan Bodager, Angela M. Kamenik, Randy K. McCarthy, Raymond L. Troyer, Ruby M. Jenkins Trust, Patrick G. Weaver, Herman W. Seibert, Wayne Ralph Bartter, Enervest Operating, LLC, Eclipse Resources I, LP, Reserve Energy Exploration Company, Eli Y. Hostetler, MGH, Inc., Barbara E. Hostetler, The Peoples Savings and Loan Company, E.C.O Production, LLC, First National Bank, Farmers National Bank of Canfield, Gas Transport, Inc., Karen Spellman, FirstMerit Mortgage Corporation, Lori P. Troyer, Utica Royalty Partners II, LP, BoCor Holdings, LLC, Wayne Operating Company, Mohican Oil & Gas Company, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Roger Dush, Carol Johnson, Kismet Organic Farms, LTD, Lynn Morrison, Linda M. Kyser, Knox Energy Cooperative Association, Inc., Naomi A. Burky, Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC, B.P. Pipelines (North America) Inc., John R. Dutton, Francis L. Burton, Consumers Gas Cooperative, James C. Sheaffer, Florence M. Belden, Nevin D. Gerber, Kenneth E. Studer, Dover Atwood Corp., Apple Creek Banking Company, Wells Fargo Re Tax Serv, First-Knox National Bank, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of J. Franklin Sterner, Barbara A. Harvey, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Walter Sterner, A. & B. Metzger Family Farms, LLC, Blue Racer Midstream, LLC, Steven D. Gorrell, Dominion Natrium Holdings, Petrox, Inc., Endeavor Ohio, LLC, Melissa K. Heslep, Sierra Buckeye, LLC, Louis Wohlmuth, Joseph M. Kruso, AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., Phyllis Wohlmuth, Kathleen A. Kark, Unknown heirs of George E. Frey, Roger J. Maurer, James Donald Kleinhenz, Leesville Land, LLC, Atlantic Wind, LLC, John N. Foley, Ivan J. Yoder, SWEPI, LP, Mildred F. Brainerd, Steven M. Yoder, Total E&P USA, Inc., Lonnie D. Workman, Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation, H. S. Belden, IV, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-WI, LP, Glenn M. James, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Dale Cameron, Sandra Klausner, Iva C. Burky, Cordella R. Hutcheson, Unknown Heirs and Assigns of Frank L. Galley and Herteline Galley, Robert R. Lane, Ronnie Lee Shockley, Wayne Fennimore, Linda L. Orr, Scott E. Harvey, Herbert L. Gray, Buckeye Oil Producing Co., Samuel W. Cooper, Laura M. Dutton, Kenoil Producing, Inc., RH Hutcheson Trust, Marlene J. Ford, Ted E. Acker, Aspire Energy of Ohio, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association, O-Tex Pumping, LLC, Brownlee Land Ventures, LP, Cynthia H. Arnholt, Park National Bank, Wooster Aggregates, LLC, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of John J. Rose, Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc., Black Fork Wind Energy, LLC, Theresa Lee Swinehart, Dawson G. Alsdorf, David E. Harpster, Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC, William H. Gruse, II, Renee L. Weaver, Max D. Fulk, Myrtle O. Williams, Singer Oil Co., LLC, Gary Jones, Prairie Lane Corporation, Joseph E. Gerber, Angela J. Jones, Lovina Mast, Timothy M. Gartrell, Pioneer Resources, Inc., Pleasantree Acres, Ltd., Emanuel Rider, Shelly M. Ash, Western Reserve Land Conservancy, Wayne R. Gregory, Murphy Boys, LLC, Rimco Operating, Inc., Rebecca Sue Allen, C. Richard Stafford, Sohio Gas Pipeline Company, Linda K. Cline, Gerald H. Moore, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-A, LP, George C. Welch, III, Nancy A. Alt, Jacob R. Ash, Laufen International, Inc., Francis A. Yoder, Debra Dohner (First American RE Tax), Keith A. Speelman, Georgia M. Gregory, Gary P. Schimpf, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., Broad Street Energy Company, Joyce E. Schimpf, Allen F. Schimpf, Fred A. Ickert, Connie L. Lee, Thomas W. Kimmins, Enervest Acquisitions, LLC, Esther Miller, Noble Marcellus, LP, Joan A. Gerber, Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Ohio River Pipe Line, LLC, Bakerwell, Inc., Cynthia K. Soos, Margo J. Craft, Peggy Tieche, Roman E. Miller, Paul J. Miller, Sharon E. Thompson, Florence Marie Harer, Ohio Central Railroad, Inc., Gary R. Caldwell, SOPUS Products, Edison T. Gartrell, Wanda D. McCartney, Denny J. Smith, John S. McClaren, Jr., Cindy G. Bostic, Bank of America Corporation, American Oil and Gas, LLC, Columbia Gas Transmission Corporation, Mark Metzger, Keith E. Numbers, David Holbrook, Lonnie D. Workman (First American RE Tax), Red Coach Properties, LLC, Dixie A. Jones, Bruce J. Burcaw, Jeffrey A. Stacklin, Lynn E. Orr, Unknown successors and assigns of Vaught Oil Company, American Towers, Inc., Paul J. Kaufman, Gregory L. Sautter, John J. Rossi, Karla S. Fulk, James F. Allan, Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC, Directions Credit Union, Inc., Michael J. Sloan, Bert Williams, Ohio Department of Transportation, Mary E. Yoder, Bonnie Sue Shockley, Consol Energy, Inc., North East Natural Gas Corp., Patrick R. Soos, Ronnie Bodager, MCD-MB Drilling Progam - 1991, Limited Partnership, Gorden L. Hughes, Cliff Falk, Cynthia M. Harrer, Ervin Hochstetler, Gregory P. Shetler, Daniel E. Sheaffer, June P. Scott, Wilma Faye Kleinhenz, Nellie L. James, Beverly J. Gorrell, Allen F. Miller, Sherry L. Miller, Mary R. Lutz, Paul Tackett, Kenneth L. Richards, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, M. B. Belden, First America Re Tax, Chesapeake AEC Acquisition, LLC, Angie E. Pittenger, Phillip G. Studer, Deborah L. Acker, Wayne Savings Community Bank, Burrier Farm, LLC, Diana C. Bucher, The Julius H. Clabaugh and Bertha I. Clabaugh Revocable, Inter-Vivos Trust Agreement dated, Jerry D. Cline, Dercams, LLC, John M. Fiocca, Tracy D. Harper, Enterprise Gas and Oil Incorporated, Beverly Kruso, Keith Dohner (First American RE Tax), Janet B. Romer, Roman E. Hostetler, Bena M. Yoder, Caroline K. Fennimore, James R. Springer, Michael O. Schmuki, Kindred Acres, Ltd., Martha E. Lane, RRC Investment Group, LLC, Anita L. Harpster, Gaila J. Gartrell, Kenneth R. Burger, Jacquelyn M. Farnsworth, Stephanie Metzger, Bessie L. Schrock, Energex Corp., Dominion Field Services, Inc., Dorothy Somers Clarke, Otex, Inc., Farm Credit Services of America, PCA, Robert E. Farquhar, RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, AB Resources OH, LLC, Farm Credit Mid-America, Holmes-Wayne Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kendra G. Miller, Cathy M. Weisenauer, Nancy Kanney, Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Linda Diane Hall, Cynthia A. Farquhar, Dwight Charles Harer, Carol L. Grindstaff, Michael L. Numbers, Dave Shafer and Son, Donna M. Sloan, Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., HG Energy, LLC, Graig Exploration, Ltd., Tammy S. Smith, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Linda Shoup, Norman Miller, Roger W. Spellman, Niese Family Farms, LTD., John R. Bernadine, III, Keith S. Dohner, Artex Energy Group, LLC, Ohio Edison Company, Samuel J. Kraft, AT&T Ohio, Sandra K. Snyder, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX, LP, Wayne Bright, Bruce Levengood, Wayne County National Bank, United Telephone Company of Ohio, Gerald L. Kendle, Richard A. Romer, Marathon Pipe Line, LLC, Donald L. Phenicie, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Henry Stuck, United States Ceramic Tile Company, Joe A. Schimpf, Matthew P. Smith, Christopher L. Beebe, Charles C. Phillips, The Standard Oil Company, Andrew E. Coblentz, Jeannine M. Stucky, Glenn A. Burky, Sr., MB Oil & Gas, LLC, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Rutti Reiger, Equity Oil & Gas Funds, Inc., Adam Joseph Speelman, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Gail H. Haddock, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Daniel J. Wolf, Karen A. Goebel, CNB Bank, Maricia Phillips Parkinson, Richland Bank, Judith A. Ingram, Leona M. Berger, John Ryan Dutton, Jr., Eagle Realty, Ltd., John C. Meyer, Dean Chance LLC, Emery Brumit, John H. Plunkett, Don D. Crum, Nathan B. Levengood, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Charles J. Phillips, Steven P. Starr, Rebecca M. Stacklin, MB Private Investors - 1997, Limited Partnership, First Federal Community Bank, Rita Bauer Dush, Dorchester Master Limited Partnership, L & K Rentals of Ashland, LLC, Paul Leslie Rennie, Sr., Sue L. Donahue, Anita L. Ackerman, BoCor Producing, Tara Catherine Bucher, Nancy Garcia, Mary Elizabeth Wise, Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc., Wanda L. Schimpf, Unknown heirs of Bessie L. Schrock, DeAnna M. Tomecko, Esther A. Miller, Judy J. Alsdorf, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-A, LP, Brian J. Alt, Terrence O. Lahr, John A. Shoup, American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Wiltel Communications, LLC, First National Bank of Dennison, Michael Bucher, Elizabeth A. Bowers, Great Lakes Energy, Inc., Buckeye Supply Company, Richard H. Semple, Verba Yoder, Jeannette Numbers, EDC Acquisition Corporation, Patrick L. Bucher, Debra Dohner, Carl R. Gessell doing business as Green Energy Company and Park National Bank doing business as Richland Bank doing business as Farmers and Savings Bank doing business as First-Knox National Bank
Case Number: 5:2017cv00239
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Order of Dismissal and Closure of Case: This matter comes before the Court upon the joint motion of plaintiff and defendants Western Reserve Land Conservancy and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust dated February 6, 1996 to dismiss without prejudice all claims between them pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. (Doc. No. #779 .) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, the Court may, on a motion or on its own, dismiss any party at any time on just terms. The Court finds good cause and hereby GRANTS the parties' joint motion. Further, because all claims in this matter have been resolved, the Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/7/2019. (D,N)
October 3, 2019 Filing 779 Joint Motion to Dismiss all Claims and Counterclaims against One Another in the Underlying Matter filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC., Western Reserve Land Conservancy and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust (Brunton, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document]: The Court hereby sets this matter for an in-person status conference on October 4, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Lead counsel for plaintiff, Western Reserve Land Conservancy, and The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust, and all parties or party representatives with settlement authority, must be in attendance. Should the parties file the relevant stipulated dismissal entry prior to the conference, the Court will cancel the status conference. Counsel for Western Reserve Land Conservancy shall notify counsel for The Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust of the content of this non-document order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/30/2019. (D,N)
September 30, 2019 Filing 778 Joint Status Report of Rover Pipeline LLC and Western Reserve Land Conservancy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Counsel for plaintiff and Western Reserve Conservancy shall by 12:00 PM on September 30, 2019 file either the stipulated dismissal for the last remaining issue in this case or file a joint status report advising the Court as to why the settlement has not been finalized. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/2019. (D,N)
September 5, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On September 5, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Bruce Moore and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Counsel reported the parties have made significant strides toward settlement of this last unresolved property interest but had not reached a final resolution. After further discussions with counsel, a potential agreement was reached, subject to approval by clients. Counsel for Rover shall promptly advise the Court and all other interested parties as soon as Rover responds to the settlement.proposal. Should a settlement be reached, a final agreed dismissal entry, signed by all interested parties, shall be filed by September 20, 2019, after which the Court shall close this case. If a settlement is not reached, the Court will schedule the matter for a settlement conference. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 18 minutes. (D,N)
August 29, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 29, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Attorney Haren advised that she received the appraisal information, discussed it with her client, and submitted a settlement offer that is now under consideration. The Court will conduct a follow up telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on September 5, 2019 at 1:00 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call and contact the Court when all attorneys are on the line. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue settlement discussions. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 5 Minutes. (D,N)
August 29, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]. The Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 is rescheduled to 03:00 PM before Judge Sara Lioi. The Telephone Conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. (Change in time only) (D,N)
August 22, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 22, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Bruce Moore and Greg Brunton participated on behalf of Rover, Attorney Patrick Krebs participated on behalf of Western Reserve Conservancy, and Attorney Jamie Haren participated on behalf of property owner Vincent Goff. Attorney Haren advised that she had been in contact with her client, his family, and counsel for Western Reserve and that information had been exchanged in anticipation of a possible resolution of this one remaining claim in the case. Counsel further indicated that the parties were working well together and that a resolution was likely. The Court will conduct a follow up telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on August 29, 2019 at 2:30 pm. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call and contact the Court when all attorneys are on the line. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue settlement discussions and should contact chambers if the Court's assistance is required. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 10 minutes. (D,N)
August 16, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi: On August 16, 2019, the Court conducted a status conference. Attorneys Gregory Brunton and Patrick Krebs, Rover's representative, Trey Flournoy, and Western Reserve Land Conservancy's representative, Robert Owen, were in attendance. The Court discussed with counsel and the party representatives resolution of the remaining interest in this case. Counsel advised that Western Reserve's interest was tied to that of property owner Vincent Goff's, and that resolution would likely require the participation of Mr. Goff and, if he is still represented by her, his attorney, Jamie Haren. Accordingly, the Court set the matter for a telephonic conference with counsel, including Attorney Haren, on August 22, 2019 at 3:00 PM. Attorney Krebs is instructed to advise Attorney Haren of her obligation to participate in the phone conference. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 45 minutes. (D,N)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is the joint motion of Rover and Western Reserve to continue the 8/16/2019 status conference. (Doc. No. #777 .) In their motion, the parties represent it would be "extremely difficult" to produce individuals with settlement authority on the date set by the Court. On 1/14/2019, the Court instructed the parties to meet and confer and attempt to resolve the remaining claim in this action and report to the Court on 2/8/2017 as to the status of settlement. On 2/8/2019, counsel contacted the Court by email and requested 30 additional days "in which to attempt to settle this matter and finalize a settlement agreement." Nearly six months later, and at the Court's urging, counsel advised that the matter remains unresolved. This case is more than 2 and one-half years old, and the Court has both the right and the obligation to bring it to a conclusion. Accordingly, the Court will go forward with the in-person status conference on 8/16/2019 at 1:00 PM. The joint motion for a continuance is DENIED. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/14/2019. (O,K)
August 14, 2019 Filing 777 Joint Motion to continue August 16, 2019 Status Conference to August 30, 2019 or date amenable to Court's schedule filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court shall conduct an in-person status conference with Rover and Western Reserve Land Conservancy on August 16, 2019 at 1:00 PM. Counsel, parties, and any individual with settlement authority must attend. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/8/2019. (D,N)
August 7, 2019 Filing 776 Response to the August 6, 2019 Status Report of Plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC filed by Western Reserve Land Conservancy. Related document(s) #775 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conservation Easement) (Krebs, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 775 Status Report filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Plaintiff Rover is hereby directed to file a report by August 6, 2019 advising the Court as to the status of any outstanding claims and whether the case can be closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/31/19. (S,HR)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff Rover is hereby directed to file a report by August 6, 2019 advising the Court as to the status of any outstanding claims and whether the case can be closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/31/2019. (T,Je)
February 22, 2019 Filing 774 Amended Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Knox Energy Cooperative Association, Inc.. (Kilgard, Celia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 773 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Knox Energy Cooperative Association, Inc.. (Kilgard, Celia)
January 14, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On January 14, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic conference with attorney Greg Brunton, counsel for Rover, and attorney Cary Snyder, counsel for the Western Reserve Land Conservancy. Counsel advised the Court that there remains one potential claim involving an easement Western Reserve acquired from one of the homeowners affected by Rover's pipeline. The Court instructed counsel to meet and confer and attempt to resolve informally any issues relating to Western Reserve Land Conservancy. Counsel for Rover was further instructed to advise the Court by email on or before February 8, 2019--with copies to all involved parties--of the status of the settlement negotiations with Western Reserve. In the event that the parties cannot resolve this remaining issue informally, the Court will consider referring the matter to the magistrate judge for mediation. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 10 minutes) (P,J)
January 14, 2019 Filing 772 Marginal Entry Order granting joint motion of plaintiff and defendants Roger and Rita Dush, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, to dismiss all pending claims and counterclaims of the parties from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that Rover and Dush defendants have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims and counterclaims between them. (Related Doc #771 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 1/14/2019.(P,J)
January 11, 2019 Filing 771 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants Roger and Rita Dush filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 770 Amended Order: Counsel for plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC, and defendants Roger and Rita Dush, having advised the Court that the matter between them has settled, all claims involving these parties are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Any and all releases, agreements or judgment entries necessary to comply with this settlement shall be executed by the interested parties. A final Agreed Entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before January 11, 2019. This case as between these parties is closed. (Related Doc. No. #769 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 1/7/2019. (P,J)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Order: Counsel for plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC, and defendants Roger and Rita Dush, having advised the Court that the matter between them has settled, all claims involving these parties are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Any and all releases, agreements or judgment entries necessary to comply with this settlement shall be executed by the interested parties. A final Agreed Entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before January 11, 2019. This case as between these parties is closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/4/2019. (P,J)
January 4, 2019 Minute Order [non-document]: On January 4, 2019, the Court conducted a telephonic conference with attorney Greg Brunton, counsel for Rover Pipeline, and attorney J. Benjamin Fraifogl, counsel for defendants Roger and Rita Dush, during which counsel advised the Court that the parties had reached a settlement. Counsel further advised that the parties would be filing a stipulated dismissal entry by January 7, 2019. In light of the representations by counsel, the Court hereby cancels the January 7, 2019 final pretrial conference and the January 14, 2019 trial. Given that an agreement has now been reached with respect to each defendant property owner, counsel for Rover shall advise the Court by January 14, 2019 as to why this case as to all parties should not be closed. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 10 minutes) Judge Sara Lioi on 1/4/2019. (P,J)
December 28, 2018 Filing 768 Memorandum Opinion: The Court reverses its prior decision and grants the landowners' motion (Doc. No. #695 ) to exclude the testimony of Rover's arborist. For the foregoing reasons, Doc. Nos. #695 , #755 , and #756 are granted. This case shall proceed to trial on January 14, 2019, at which time the jury will hear relevant testimony on and be permitted to enter an award representing the value of the fair market value of the property taken and the damages to the residue, which, in this case, will be limited to any reduction in the fair market value to the fee and damages for the lost tree crop on the property at the time of the taking. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/28/2018. (T,Je)
November 30, 2018 Filing 767 Reply to Defendants' Memorandum Regarding the Inapplicability of Rover Pipeline LLC's Stated Monitoring Program to the Subject Property filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #761 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Implentation Plan) (Brunton, Gregory)
November 30, 2018 Filing 766 Opposition to Rover Pipeline LLC's Brief Concerning the Jurisdiction of FERC and the Federal Court as it Pertains to Crop Loss Damages filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #760 . (Moore, Randall)
November 18, 2018 Filing 765 Opposition to #755 Motion in limine to Exclude the Export Report and Opinion Testimony of Barry Cavanna filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Klonowski 10-10-18 Report)(Moore, Randall)
November 18, 2018 Filing 764 Opposition to #756 Motion in limine to Exclude Testimony of Rita Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
November 16, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On November 16, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic conference. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, and attorneys Randall Moore, David Wigham, and Leighann Fink participated on behalf of the Dush property owners. The Court continued its discussion with counsel regarding mediation, and counsel agreed that the matter will be mediated on January 4, 2019 by mediator Frank Ray. The mediation shall take place at the Columbus law offices of Rotezel & Andress, beginning at 10:00 am. Lead counsel and parties with settlement authority are required to attend. The final pretrial, previously scheduled for January 4, 2019, shall be rescheduled to January 7, 2019 at 11:30 am. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 15 minutes) (P,J)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For the reasons discussed at the September 17, 2018 hearing, plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. No. #733 ) is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/16/2018.(P,J)
November 16, 2018 Filing 763 Marginal Entry Order approving the withdrawal of motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. #750 ) filed by Dush defendants. (Related Doc. No. #762 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 11/16/2018.(P,J)
November 15, 2018 Filing 762 Withdrawal of Motion for Reconsideration filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #750 .(Moore, Randall)
November 15, 2018 Filing 761 Brief regarding the Inapplicability of Rover Pipeline's Stated Monitoring Program to the Subject Property filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
November 15, 2018 Filing 760 Brief Concerning the Jurisdiction of Federal Energy Regulatory Commission and the Federal Court as it Pertains to Crop Loss Damages filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Jurisdictional Brief) (Brunton, Gregory)
November 14, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On November 14, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic conference. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, and attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham participated on behalf of the Dush property owners. Counsel advised that they continue to discuss possible resolution. The Court instructed the parties to mediate the matter with Columbus mediator Frank Rey prior to December 1, 2018 and attempted to contact Attorney Rey to schedule the mediation. Counsel shall advise the Court of their client's availability for mediation this month by emailing the Court's courtroom deputy or law clerk. The Court also discussed with counsel the remaining pending motions. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 30 minutes) (P,J)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: In light of the settlement, plaintiff's motion in limine is denied as moot. (Related Doc #725 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 11/14/2018.(P,J)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion filed by Rita Bauer Dush and Roger Dush for leave to file a deposition certification of Mark Vedral. (Related Doc #721 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 11/14/2018.(P,J)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Order of dismissal of parties: The Court construes Doc. No. #758 as a joint motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 to dismiss Sloan defendants without prejudice and the same is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/13/2018. (P,J)
November 5, 2018 Filing 758 Joint Proposed Stipulation (motion) of Dismissal of Defendants Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
November 1, 2018 Filing 757 SEALED Document:Exhibit A. to Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Rita Dush (Deposition of Rita Dush) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #681 , #756 . (Brunton, Gregory)
November 1, 2018 Filing 756 Motion in limine to Exclude Testimony of Rita Dush and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. Deposition of Barry Cavanna, #2 Exhibit C. Real Estate Appraisal)(Brunton, Gregory)
November 1, 2018 Filing 755 Motion in limine to Exclude the Export Report and Opinion Testimony of Barry Cavanna and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Deposition Transcript of Barry Cavanna, #2 Exhibit B. 2016 Cavanna Report, #3 Exhibit C. 2018 Cavanna Report)(Brunton, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The telephone conference to discuss Dush deposition objections scheduled for 10/31/2018 is rescheduled to 11/14/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Sara Lioi. (Related Doc. No. #742 ). Counsel are to follow the same instructions for accessing the Courts bridge line that were emailed on 10/25/2018. (P,J)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #754 joint Motion of plaintiff and defendants Roger and Rita Dush to Extend Deadlines; fact and expert discovery deposition deadline extended to 10/28/2018. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/18/2018. (D,S)
October 17, 2018 Filing 754 Joint Motion for extension of Fact and Expert Discovery Deposition Deadlines until October 28, 2018 and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 11, 2018 Filing 753 Opposition to #750 Motion for reconsideration of the September 14, 2018 Order Excluding Eric Gardner from Testifying at Trial filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Order. Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC's claims against defendants Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan, having been settled by agreement of the parties, are hereby dismissed. A final agreed entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before 11/5/2018. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/5/2018. (O,K)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Order. Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC's claims against defendants Martha E. Lane and Robert R. Lane, having been settled by agreement of the parties, are hereby dismissed. A final agreed entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before 11/5/2018. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/5/2018. (O,K)
October 4, 2018 Filing 750 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #763 - Motion for reconsideration of the September 14, 2018 Order Excluding Eric Gardner from Testifying at Trial filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #693 , #737 . (Moore, Randall) Modified to note withdrawn on 11/20/2018 (M,TL).
September 28, 2018 Filing 749 Amended Witness List filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 27, 2018 Filing 748 Fact and Expert Discovery Disclosure filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 747 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Damon McCarthy filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Damon McCarthy, #2 Exhibit Photo, #3 Exhibit Photo, #4 Exhibit Photo, #5 Exhibit Photo, #6 Exhibit Photo, #7 Exhibit Photo, #8 Exhibit Photo)(White, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 746 Opposition to #725 Motion in limine to Exclude Landowner's Lay Witness Testimony Regarding Causation of Alleged Damages and Testimony Concerning Fair Market Value of the Subject Property filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 745 Amended Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Order (As to Michael and Donna Sloan): Expert discovery deadline 9/28/2018; Motions in limine due 9/7/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 9/21/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 10/5/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 10/5/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 10/5/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on motions in limine scheduled for 10/11/2018 at 1:00 p.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 10/15/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 10/15/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 10/22/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 10/24/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 10/26/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 8:00 AM. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J)
September 19, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 19, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Greg Bruton and Vadim Bourenin participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorneys Thomas White and Matthew Kearney participated on behalf of the Sloans. The Court discussed with counsel dates and deadlines that will appear in the revised trial order. Counsel indicated that the parties would be willing to continue settlement discussions. Toward that end, counsel agreed to a mediation session on October 1, 2018 with a mediator in Columbus, Ohio. Counsel should contact the Court immediately if the mediator is not available to meet with the parties on October 1, 2018. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 30 minutes) (P,J)
September 19, 2018 Filing 744 Amended Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Order (As to Robert and Martha Lane): Expert discovery deadline 9/28/2018; Motions in limine due 9/14/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 9/28/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 10/5/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 10/5/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 10/5/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on motions in limine scheduled for 10/10/2018 at 1:30 p.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 10/17/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 10/22/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 10/29/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 10/30/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 11/1/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 11/5/2018 at 8:00 AM. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J)
September 19, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 19, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorney Greg Bruton participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorney Robert Tscholl participated on behalf of the Lanes. The Court discussed with counsel dates and deadlines that will appear in the revised trial order. The Court also encouraged the parties to continue settlement discussions in an effort to resolve this case. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 20 minutes) (P,J)
September 19, 2018 Filing 743 Memorandum Opinion: The motion of defendants, Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, individually and as the trustee of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust, for leave to amend to file counterclaims is denied. (Related Doc. No. #654 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/19/2018. (P,J)
September 19, 2018 Filing 742 Second Amended Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Order (As to Roger and Rita Bauer Dush): Expert Klonowski Supplement 10/10/2018; Telephone Conference to Discuss Dush Deposition Objections 10/31/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; Fact and Expert Discovery Limited to Deposition of Rita Bauer Dush, Barry Cavanna, James Herbig and Alan Klonowski 10/21/2018; Motion for Reconsideration of Exclusion of Expert E. Gardner 10/4/2018; Response to Motion for Reconsideration 10/11/2018; Motions Limited to Remaining Daubert Issues 11/1/2018; Responses to Motions Limited to Remaining Daubert Issues 11/18/2018; Response to Court Email to Court's Draft Voir Dire and Juror Questionnaire 11/15/2018; Briefing on all Outstanding Legal Issues 11/15/2018; Responses to briefing on All Outstanding Legal Issues 11/30/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (completed); Joint Preliminary Statement (completed); Final Pre-trial Conference 1/4/2019 at 10:00 a.m.; Stipulations of Fact (completed); Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions (completed); Proposed Jury Instructions (completed); Counsel to exchange exhibits 1/10/2019; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) 1/10/2019; Jury Trial 1/14/2019 at 8:00 a.m. Parties and counsel note: Dates for briefing of motion for reconsideration have been changed. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J)
September 17, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 17, 2018, the Court conducted a mediation conference in chambers. Attorneys Greg Brunton, Tom Zabel, and Bruce Moore participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorneys Randall Moore and Leighanne Fink participated, representing the Dushs. Rover's representative, Trey Flourney, and Rita Bauer Dush, were also in attendance. The parties continued to discuss resolution, but no settlement was reached. The parties agreed that both expert and fact discovery is complete, with the exception of the following depositions: (1) Rita Bauer Dush; (2) Alan Klonowski; (3) Barry D. Cavanna; and (4) James A. Herbig. Additionally, Mr. Klonowski is permitted to perform soil testing on the Dushes' property and submit a supplemental expert report. The parties also proposed, and the Court adopted, dates and deadlines that will appear in the Second Amended Final Pretrial Order. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 5 hours; 15 minutes) (P,J)
September 17, 2018 Filing 741 Opposition to Plaintiff Rover Pipeline's Additional Objections to the Video Deposition of Roger Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document #740 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2016 Hawkhaven Report Produced to Rover, #2 Exhibit B - Vedral Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - FEIS Excerpts) (Moore, Randall)
September 16, 2018 Filing 740 Objection to the August 22, 2018, videotaped testimony of Roger Dush filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #727 , #723 , #722 , #724 , #726 . (Brunton, Gregory)
September 14, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 14, 2018, the Court conducted a telephonic conference. Attorneys Tom Zabel, Bruce Moore, and Greg Brunton participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorneys Randall Moore and Leighanne Fink participated on behalf of the Dushs. The Court discussed several pretrial issues and explored possible resolution, but no settlement was reached. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 1 hour; 35 minutes) (P,J)
September 14, 2018 Filing 739 Videotape Deposition of Mark Vedral filed by Rita Bauer Dush and Roger Dush.(1 CD manually filed and placed in file in Clerk's Office). (S,HR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 738 Certification of Videotape Record and Notice of Manual Filing (Videotape deposition of Mark Vedral, taken September 12, 2018) filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 14, 2018 Filing 737 Memorandum Opinion: For all of the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. No. #691 ) is granted in part; plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. No. #693 ) is granted in full; defendants Roger and Rita Dush's motions in limine (Doc. Nos. #694 and #696 ) are denied as moot; and defendants Roger and Rita Dush's motion in limine (Doc. No. #695 ) is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/14/2018. (P,J)
September 13, 2018 Filing 736 Amended Witness List filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 12, 2018 Filing 735 Opposition to #733 Motion in limine to Exclude Newly Disclosed Expert Reports and Opinions of Defendants Roger and Rita Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 11, 2018 Filing 734 Notice of Filing of Certifications Makenzie J. Koman, RPR (ECF No. #722 ) and Jon Jastromb (ECF No. #723 ) filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 11, 2018 Filing 733 Motion in limine to Exclude Newly Disclosed Expert Reports and Opinions of Defendants Roger and Rita Dush and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
September 10, 2018 Filing 732 Proposed Jury Interrogatories and Verdict Form filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 10, 2018 Filing 731 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 10, 2018 Filing 730 Proposed Jury Interrogatories and Verdict Form filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related documents #728 , #729 . (Brunton, Gregory)
September 10, 2018 Filing 729 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
September 10, 2018 Filing 728 Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, Rover Pipeline LLC . (Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 727 SEALED Document: Notice of filing protected transcript portions and exhibits of deposition transcript of Defendant Roger Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #681 , #726 . (Attachments: #1 Roger Dush Unredacted Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit Q - Yearly Revenue Loss Due to Taking, #3 Exhibit R - Yearly Profit Loss Due to Taking, #4 Exhibit S - Value of Existing Crop Destroyed by Construction, #5 Exhibit 2 - Profit & Loss Statements, #6 Exhibit 3 - 2017 Income Tax Return, #7 Exhibit 4 - 2016 Income Tax Return, #8 Exhibit 5 - 2015 Income Tax Return, #9 Exhibit 6 - 2014 Income Tax Return, #10 Exhibit 7 - 2013 Income Tax Return)(Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 726 Deposition of Defendant Roger Dush taken on August 22, 2018 filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #681 . (Attachments: #1 Redacted Deposition Transcript of Roger Dush, #2 Defendant's Ex A - Property Map, #3 Defendant's Ex B - Photograph, #4 Defendant's Ex C - Photograph, #5 Defendant's Ex D - Photograph, #6 Defendant's Ex E - Photograph, #7 Defendant's Ex F - Photograph, #8 Defedant's Ex G - Photograph, #9 Defendant's Ex H - Photograph, #10 Defendant's Ex I - Graph of Average Sales Price, #11 Defendant's Ex J - Proposed R/W & Easement, #12 Defendant's Ex K - Proposed R/W & Easement, #13 Defendant's Ex L - Photograph, #14 Defendant's Ex M - Photograph, #15 Defendant's Ex N - Planting Sites Eliminated by Permanent Easement, #16 Defendant's Ex O - Planting Sites Eliminated by Temporary Easement, #17 Defendant's Ex P - Total Planting Sites Eliminated by Taking, #18 Defendant's Ex Q - Yearly Revenue Loss Due to Taking - Filed Under Seal, #19 Defendant's Ex R - Yearly Profit Loss Due to Taking - Filed Under Seal, #20 Defendant's Ex S - Value of Existing Crop Destroyed by Construction - Filed Under Seal, #21 Defendant's Ex T - Christmas Tree Study, #22 Plaintiff's Ex 1 - Wayne County Property Record Card, #23 Plaintiff's Ex 2 - Profit & Loss Statements - Filed Under Seal, #24 Plaintiff's Ex 3 - 2017 Tax Returns - Filed Under Seal, #25 Plaintiff's Ex 4 - 2016 Tax Returns - Filed Under Seal, #26 Plaintiff's Ex 5 - 2015 Tax Returns - Filed Under Seal, #27 Plaintiff's Ex 6 - 2014 Tax Returns - Filed Under Seal, #28 Plaintiff's Ex 7 - 2013 Tax Returns - Filed Under Seal)(Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 725 Motion in limine to Exclude Landowner's Lay Witness Testimony Regarding Causation of Alleged Damages and Testimony Concerning Fair Market Value of the Subject Property with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sloan Transcript)(Brunton, Gregory)
September 7, 2018 Filing 724 Videotape Recordings of Deposition of Roger Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Two CD's placed on file in vault at Akron Clerk's Office. (Sealed Number: 5633) No original signature provided on document. Related document(s) #681 , #720 . (T,Je)
September 7, 2018 Filing 723 Certification of Notary Public regarding Video Recording of Deposition of Roger Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Related document #720 ). Unsigned (Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 722 Certification of Stenographer Concerning Video Deposition of Roger Dush Taken August 22, 2018 filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Related document #720 ). Unsigned (Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 721 Motion for leave to File a Deposition Certification of Mark Vedral filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 720 Certification of Videotape Record and Notice of Manual Filing filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 6, 2018 Filing 719 Notice of Service of Subpoena to Charles W. Vrotney filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Subpoena to Charles W. Vrotney)(Brunton, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 718 Transcript of Motions in Limine (Volume 2) held on 8/28/18 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Lori A. Callahan at 330-252-6022. [158 (143-300) pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 9/13/2018. Redaction Request due 9/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. Related document(s) #712 , #711 . (C,L)
September 6, 2018 Filing 717 Transcript of Motions in Limine (Volume 1) held on 8/27/18 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Lori A. Callahan at 330-252-6022. [142 (1-142) pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 9/13/2018. Redaction Request due 9/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. Related document(s) #712 , #711 . (C,L)
September 4, 2018 Filing 716 Stipulation of Fact filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
September 4, 2018 Filing 715 Stipulations of Fact filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
September 4, 2018 Filing 714 Exhibit and Witness List from hearing on motions in limine on 8/27/2018 and 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rover Pipeline, Panhandle Backhaul & Trunkline Backhaul Projects w/attachments July 2016, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rover Pipeline, Panhandle Backhaul & Trunkline Backhaul Projects July 2016, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pipeline Impact to Property Value and Property Insurability February 2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - Business Valuation Summary Report Fair Market Value Standard June 15, 2017, #5 Exhibit 5 - Business Valuation Summary Report Fair Market Value Standard August 7, 2018, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt 2017 Valuation Handbook-US Guide to Cost of Capital, #7 Exhibit 7 - Report of Rebekah A. Smith, #8 Exhibit 8 - Multiplier of EBITDA for Dush Property, #9 Exhibit A - Multipliers used in Market Approach, #10 Exhibit B - Business Description Report; Fruit Tree Nursery, #11 Exhibit C - Klonowski Report, #12 Exhibit 9 - Klonowski CV)(P,J)
September 4, 2018 Filing 713 Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Subpoena filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Wendell Schwartzentruber, Schwartz-Land Consulting)(Moore, Randall)
August 30, 2018 Filing 712 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 8/27/18-8/28/18 before Judge Lioi, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 9/6/2018 filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Fink, Leighann)
August 30, 2018 Filing 711 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 8/27/18-8/28/18 before Judge Lioi, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 9/6/2018 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 29, 2018 Filing 710 Answer to #689 Third Amended complaint for Condemnation filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
August 29, 2018 Filing 709 Amended Witness List for Compensation Trial of Defendants Roger Dush and Rita Bauer Dush filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 28, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. The Court conducted a hearing on motions in limine on 8/27/2018 and 8/28/2018. Attorneys Thomas Zabel, Greg Brunton, and Bruce Moore participated on behalf of plaintiff. Attorneys Randall Moore and Leighann Fink participated on behalf of defendants Roger and Rita Dush. Testimony taken. Exhibits admitted. At the conclusion of the hearing, the Court took the in limine motions under advisement and will issue a ruling at a later time. (Doc. Nos. #655 , #657 , #691 , #693 , #694 , #695 , #696 , #706 ). The Court also addressed with counsel outstanding trial related matters. (Time on 8/27/2018: 4 hours) (Time on 8/28/2018: 5 hours; 15 minutes) (Court Reporter: Lori Callahan)(P,J)
August 27, 2018 Notice [non-document] as to Roger and Rita Bauer Dush (Dush Property): The continuation of the final pretrial and motion in limine hearing will be held on 8/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 530, U.S. District Court, Akron, before Judge Sara Lioi. (P,J)
August 24, 2018 Filing 708 Attorney Appearance by Leighann K. Fink filed by on behalf of Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Fink, Leighann)
August 23, 2018 Filing 707 Response to #706 Motion to strike Plaintiff's #691 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendants Roger and Rita Dush's Business Valuation Expert Report and All Other Business Loss Testimony, or in the Alternative, Limiting the Court's Consideration to the Arguments Raised in the Pages Allowed Pursuant to N.D. Ohio Loc. R. CIV. P. 7.1 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 22, 2018 Filing 706 Motion to strike Plaintiff's #691 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendants Roger and Rita Dush's Business Valuation Expert Report and All Other Business Loss Testimony, or in the Alternative, Limiting the Court's Consideration to the Arguments Raised in the Pages Allowed Pursuant to N.D. Ohio Loc. R. CIV. P. 7.1 filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
August 22, 2018 Filing 705 Opposition to #691 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendants Roger and Rita Dush's Business Valuation Expert Report and All Other Business Loss Testimony filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FEIS excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Herbig appraisal, #3 Exhibit C - Vrotney Report)(Moore, Randall)
August 22, 2018 Filing 704 Trial Brief Regarding Limits on Just Compensation filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 22, 2018 Filing 703 Opposition to #693 Motion in limine to Exlude Testimony and Expert Reports Regarding the Alleged Diminution in Market Value of Property Outside of Rover Pipeline LLC's Easement Areas filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Motion in Limine)(Moore, Randall)
August 22, 2018 Filing 702 Response to #696 Motion in limine to exclude Expert Testimony Rebekah Smith filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 22, 2018 Filing 701 Response to #695 Motion in limine to exclude Expert Testimony of Alan D. Klonowski filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 22, 2018 Filing 700 Response to #694 Motion in limine to Exclude Experts Testimony Richard Huriaux and Mike Israni filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Filing 699 Amended Notice to take Deposition of Michael J. Sloan on August 30, 2018 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Filing 698 Minute Order of Mediation held on 8/20/2018. The case did not settle. Time: 3 hours. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/20/2018. (D,I)
August 20, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. At the request of counsel in the condemnation matter involving defendant Dushes, the Court held a brief conference with counsel to discuss the pending motions in limine and the final pretrial conference. After discussing the matter with counsel, the Court has determined that additional time will be needed to receive testimony and hear argument on the motions. Accordingly, the final pretrial conference will begin at 9:00 AM on August 27, 2018 and will be continued on August 28, 2018, beginning at 10:00 AM. All expert witnesses must be in attendance, and counsel shall provide a list of the order of witnesses for the hearing by Friday, August 24, 2018. Further, responses to the motions in limine shall be filed no later than 5:00 PM on August 22, 2018. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 20 minutes) (P,J)
August 20, 2018 Filing 697 Attorney Appearance by J. Benjamin Fraifogl filed by on behalf of Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Fraifogl, J.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 696 Motion in limine to exclude Expert Testimony Rebekah Smith with memorandum in support filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Smith Expert Report)(Moore, Randall)
August 17, 2018 Filing 695 Motion in limine to exclude Expert Testimony of Alan D. Klonowski with memorandum in support filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Klonowski Expert Report)(Moore, Randall)
August 17, 2018 Filing 694 Motion in limine to Exclude Experts Testimony Richard Huriaux and Mike Israni filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Huriaux & Israni Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Excerpt from FEIS)(Moore, Randall)
August 17, 2018 Filing 693 Motion in limine to Exlude Testimony and Expert Reports Regarding the Alleged Diminution in Market Value of Property Outside of Rover Pipeline LLC's Easement Areas filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Koeninger Report, #2 Exhibit B-Gardner Report)(Brunton, Gregory)
August 17, 2018 Filing 692 SEALED Document:Notice of Filing Exhibit E to Motion in Limine filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #681 , #691 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Financial Records)(Brunton, Gregory)
August 17, 2018 Filing 691 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendants Roger and Rita Dush's Business Valuation Expert Report and All Other Business Loss Testimony filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Roche Report, #2 Exhibit B-Roche Deposition, #3 Exhibit C-Smith Report, #4 Exhibit D-Pillar Appraisal)(Brunton, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 690 Notice of Filing Third Amended Complaint filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #689 .(Brunton, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 689 Third Amended complaint for Condemnation against Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Rule 71.1(d) Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action, #2 Exhibit FERC Order Issuing Certificates, #3 Exhibit Rover Counties Traversed, #4 Exhibit Rover Pipeline, Panhandle Backhaul, and Truckline Backhaul Projects - Final Environmental Impact Statement) (Brunton, Gregory)
August 14, 2018 Filing 688 Amended Notice to take Deposition of Rover Representative on August 30, 2018 filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 687 Amended Witness List filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 686 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action returned executed upon Cathy G. Roche, CPA filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, defendants' motion for leave to declare Roger Dush unavailable to testify at trial and permit his video deposition to be offered in lieu of live testimony (Doc. No. #684 ) is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/3/2018.(P,J)
August 2, 2018 Filing 685 Notice to take Deposition of Roger Dush on August 22, 2018 filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 684 Motion to declare Defendant Roger Dush an unavailable witness and for use of his video deposition testimony at trial and Memorandum in Support filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Order setting mediation conference for 8/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 480 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. NOTE: Conference will take place in the AKRON Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/24/2018. (D,I)
July 24, 2018 Filing 682 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2018. After discussion, the Court set the mediation conference for August 20, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. A Mediation Scheduling Order will issue separately. Time: 30 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/24/2018. (D,I)
July 24, 2018 Filing 681 Agreed Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound)(P,J)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For the reasons set forth in the unopposed motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline (Doc. No. #652 ), defendants Carl D. Miller and Sherry L. Miller are dismissed from this action and the trial scheduled for September 17, 2018 is hereby vacated. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/23/2018. (P,J)
July 20, 2018 Filing 680 Notice to take Deposition of Representative of Rover Pipeline on August 20, 2018 filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 679 Reply to Plaintiff's #674 Opposition to Plaintiff's #654 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
July 19, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant landowner Dush set for 7/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. The purpose of the call is to set the date for the mediation conference. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, Plaintiff's counsel is to call Chambers at 330-252-6170. (W,Su)
July 18, 2018 Filing 678 Amended Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Order as to Roger and Rita Bauer Dush (Dush Property): Motions in limine due 8/17/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 8/22/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 8/1/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 8/7/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 8/7/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine scheduled 8/27/2018 at 12:00 p.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 9/4/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 9/4/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 9/10/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 9/12/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 9/14/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 9/17/2018 at 8:00 AM. (Related Doc. No. #636 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (P,J)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Order as to defendants Roger and Rita Bauer Dush: Pursuant to LR 16.4, Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR), of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, the above-captioned case is hereby referred to Mediation pursuant to LR 16.6(a), et seq. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke for mediation/settlement. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/18/2018. (P,J)
July 18, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. At the request of counsel, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Thomas Zabel and Greg Brunton participated on behalf of plaintiff, and Attorneys David Wigham and Randall Moore participated, representing the Dushes. The Court accepted the request of counsel that the trial in this matter be continued until September 17, 2018. A final pretrial conference will be held on August 27, 2018 at 12:00 PM. Motions in limine shall be filed by August 17, 2018 and response are due by August 22, 2018. The Court shall issue a revised trial order with all dates relating to the trial in this matter. Additionally, counsel advised the Court that the parties would be interested in mediating this matter prior to completing expert discovery. The Court, therefore, refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Burke for mediation. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 15 minutes) (P,J)
July 18, 2018 Filing 676 Response to #652 Motion to dismiss Defendants Carl D. Miller and Sherry L. Miller Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 71 and 21 filed by Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III. (Braunstein, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 675 Notice to take Deposition of Defendant Michael J. Sloan on August 20, 2018 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 13, 2018 Filing 674 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' #654 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 12, 2018 Filing 673 Proposed Agreed Protective Order filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
July 11, 2018 Filing 672 Proposed Final Pretrial Order filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
July 11, 2018 Filing 671 Witness List filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Wigham, David)
July 11, 2018 Filing 670 Proposed Final Pretrial Order regarding Defendants Roger and Rita Dush filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 11, 2018 Filing 669 Witness List for Compensation Trial of Defendants Roger Dush and Rita Bauer Dush filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] (re: Lane Property) granting joint motion for continuance of trial date and extension of case schedule deadlines. (Related Doc #648 .) Motions in limine deadline extended to 9/14/2018, and response deadline extended to 9/28/2018. Motions in limine hearing and final pretrial rescheduled to 10/10/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Jury trial rescheduled to 11/5/2018 at 8:00 a.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2018.(P,J)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] (re: Sloan Property) granting #649 joint motion for continuance and extension of case schedule deadlines to later dates that correlate to the continuance of the motions in limine hearing and final pretrial currently scheduled for 10/11/2018 at 1:00 p.m.; and jury trial currently scheduled for 10/29/2018. Motions in limine deadline extended to 9/7/2018, and response deadline extended to 9/21/2018. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2018.(P,J)
July 10, 2018 Filing 668 Attorney Appearance by Samuel J. Ferruccio, Jr. filed on behalf of Martha E. Lane. (Ferruccio, Samuel)
July 10, 2018 Filing 667 Attorney Appearance by Samuel J. Ferruccio, Jr. filed on behalf of Robert R. Lane. (Ferruccio, Samuel)
July 6, 2018 Filing 666 Proposed Order for October 11, 2018 Final Pretrial regarding Defendants Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 6, 2018 Filing 665 Proposed Order for October 11, 2018 Final Pretrial Regarding Defendants Robert and Martha Lane filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 6, 2018 Filing 664 Witness List for Compensation Trial of Defendants Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 6, 2018 Filing 663 Witness List for Compensation Trial of Defendants Robert R. Lane and Martha E. Lane filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 6, 2018 Filing 662 Opposition to #657 Motion in limine to Exclude Landowner's Lay Witness Testimony Regarding Diminution in Property Value and Highest and Best Use and Exclusion of Unqualified Expert Report filed by Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REX, Document 978, #2 Exhibit Koeninger Resume, #3 Exhibit REX, Document 724, #4 Exhibit McKinley Commission, Document 915)(Arnold, Jennifer)
July 5, 2018 Filing 661 Motion for extension of Responses to Motions In Limine until 07/20/2018 filed by Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. Related document(s) #657 . (Arnold, Jennifer)
July 3, 2018 Filing 660 Proposed Voir Dire Questions for the Dush Compensation Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 3, 2018 Filing 659 Proposed Voir Dire Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Defendants Roger Dush and Rita Dush filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
June 29, 2018 Filing 658 Proposed Voir Dire Questions for Compensation Trial of Defendants Robert R. Lane and Martha E. Lane filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 29, 2018 Filing 657 Motion in limine to Exclude Landowner's Lay Witness Testimony Regarding Diminution in Property Value and Highest and Best Use and Exclusion of Unqualified Expert Report filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Koeninger Report, #2 Exhibit B - FEIS Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - Discovery Responses)(Brunton, Gregory)
June 29, 2018 Filing 656 Proposed Voir Dire Questions for Compensation Trial of Defendants Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 29, 2018 Filing 655 Motion in limine to Exclude Landowner's Lay Witness Testimony Regarding Causation of Alleged Damages and Testimony Concerning Fair Market Value of the Subject Property filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 29, 2018 Filing 654 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to file Counterclaims)(White, Thomas)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants shall have until 7/13/2018 to respond to #652 motion to dismiss. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/29/2018. (T,Je)
June 28, 2018 Filing 653 Notice of Filing of Exhibits A and B to the Motion to Dismiss Defendants Carl D. Miller and Sherry L. Miller Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 71 and 21 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Permanent Easement Agreement)Related document(s) #652 .(Brunton, Gregory)
June 28, 2018 Filing 652 Motion to dismiss Defendants Carl D. Miller and Sherry L. Miller Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 71 and 21 filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 25, 2018 Filing 651 Notice of Service of Defendant Roger Dush's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
June 22, 2018 Filing 650 Notice of Service of Defendants Roger and Rita Dush's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents upon Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
June 22, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. The Court conducted a telephone conference with attorneys Greg Brunton and Randy Moore on 6/22/2018 regarding the Dush matter scheduled for trial. Counsel requested an extension of the deadline for filing of motions in limine. Upon agreement of counsel, the following deadlines are extended: Motions in limine deadline extended to 7/23/2018; Response to motions in limine deadline extended to 7/30/2018; Final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine rescheduled to 8/9/2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 20 minutes) (P,J)
June 22, 2018 Filing 649 Joint Motion for extension of Case Schedule Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 22, 2018 Filing 648 Joint Motion to continue Trial Date and Extension of Case Schedule Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Stipulation and Order approving joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants Diversified Oil & Gas LLC, Diversified Resources, Inc. and M & R Investments Ohio LLC of dismissal of all claims currently pending against these defendants in this action without prejudice. Notwithstanding any dismissal of the defendants, or the action in general, the parties shall continue to remain subject to and bound by this stipulation. (Related Doc. No. #646 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/22/2018. (P,J)
June 21, 2018 Filing 646 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants Diversified Oil & Gas, LLC, Diversified Resources, Inc. and M&R Investments Ohio, LLC filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 14, 2018 Filing 645 Notice of Service of Discovery Responses filed by Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by defendants Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan for a continuance of the trial (Related Doc #644 ). The motion in limine hearing and final pretrial are rescheduled to 10/11/2018 at 1:00 p.m. The jury trial is rescheduled to 10/29/2018 at 8:00 a.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/14/2018.(P,J)
June 13, 2018 Filing 644 Motion to continue August 6, 2018 trial filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 643 Stipulation and Order approving joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc. ("COH") and NiSource Corporate Services Company (incorrectly identified in plaintiff's second amended verified complaint as "NiSource Corporate Services Company aka NiSource Energy Ventures, LLC" and hereinafter referred to as "NiSource Corporate Services") (COH and NiSource Corporate Services are jointly referred to herein as "NiSource") of dismissal of all claims currently pending against defendant NiSource in this action without prejudice. Notwithstanding any dismissal of the NiSource, or the action in general, the parties stipulate and agree that the parties shall continue to remain subject to and bound by their agreement and stipulation. The parties further stipulate and agree that this Court shall retain jurisdiction over the parties' agreement and stipulation and the parties' respective obligations thereunder. (Related Doc #642 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/4/2018.(P,J)
June 1, 2018 Filing 642 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc. and NiSource Corporate Services Company filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2018 Filing 641 Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. White and Matthew A. Kearney filed on behalf of Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (White, Thomas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 640 Notice of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall)
May 15, 2018 Filing 639 Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Order as to defendants Carl D. and Sherry L. Miller: Motions in limine due 7/18/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 7/25/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 7/18/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 7/25/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 7/25/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine scheduled 8/1/2018 at 10:00 a.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 9/4/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 9/4/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 9/10/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 9/12/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 9/14/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 9/17/2018 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J) Modified text on 5/15/2018 (P,J).
May 15, 2018 Set Deadlines: Motions in limine due 7/3/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 7/10/2018. (Related Doc. No. #636 ). (P,J)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Stipulation and Order approving joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, and Ohio Power Company of dismissal of all claims currently pending against defendants AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, and Ohio Power Company without prejudice. Notwithstanding any dismissal of the defendants or the action in general, the parties shall continue to remain subject to and bound by this Stipulation. (Related Doc. No. #637 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/15/2018. (P,J)
May 14, 2018 Filing 637 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company and Ohio Power Company filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 10, 2018 Set Deadlines and Hearings regarding Trial Order (Dush Property) (Doc. No. #636 ): Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/18/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 530 before Judge Sara Lioi; Jury Trial set for 8/27/2018 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 530 before Judge Sara Lioi. (P,J)
May 10, 2018 Filing 636 Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Order as to Roger and Rita Bauer Dush (Dush Property): Motions in limine due 7/3/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 7/10/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 7/3/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 7/11/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 7/11/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine scheduled 7/18/2018 at 2:30 p.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 8/13/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 8/13/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 8/20/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 8/22/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 8/24/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 8/27/2018 at 8:00 AM. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J) Modified text on 5/15/2018 (P,J).
May 10, 2018 Filing 635 Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Order as to defendants Michael and Donna Sloan (Sloan Property) and Robert and Martha Lane (Lane Property): Motions in limine due 6/29/2018; Responses to motions in limine due 7/6/2018; Proposed voir dire questions due 6/29/2018; Proposed Stipulation & Order (Appendix A), with witness list (Appendix C) due 7/6/2018; Joint Preliminary Statement (emailed) 7/6/2018; Final Pre-trial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine scheduled 7/13/2018 at 1:30 p.m.; Stipulations of Fact due 7/23/2018; Counsel to exchange proposed Jury Instructions by 7/23/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions due 7/30/2018; Counsel to exchange exhibits by 8/1/2018; Two courtesy copies of exhibits delivered to the court (with Index - Appendix B) by 8/3/2018; Jury Trial scheduled for 8/6/2018 at 8:00 AM. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List)(P,J)
May 9, 2018 Filing 634 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The motion (Doc. No. #608 ) of defendant Robert Lane to join in the two oppositions briefs is granted. Having considered all of the relevant factors, and given the particular facts and posture of this case, the Court concludes that the appointment of a commission is not warranted and therefore denies Rover's renewed motion to appoint a commission. (Doc. No. #599 .) The Court shall, by separate order, issue a jury trial schedule for the remaining issues of just compensation in this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/9/2018. (P,J)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 633 Order of Dismissal of Party: Before the Court is the parties' joint motion (Doc. No. #632 ) to dismiss without prejudice defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey from this lawsuit. Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure permits the Court to dismiss individual parties "at any time, on just terms...." Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. In their joint motion, the parties represent that they have "fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them." (Doc. No. #632 at 8888.) Finding "just terms" to support the dismissal of these defendants, the Court grants the parties' motion to dismiss. Further, the Clerk is directed to terminate the pending motions to enforce settlement (Doc. Nos. #612 and #616 ) as moot. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/30/2018. (P,J)
April 27, 2018 Filing 632 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 5, 2018 Filing 631 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 4/4/2018. Counsel updated the Court on the status of their settlement and advised that they could finalize their settlement documents and file their notice indicating they have done so on the docket by 5:00 p.m. on April 13, 2018. Time: 10 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 4/5/2018. (D,I)
April 4, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants Barbara and Scott Harvey set for 4/4/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Defendants' counsel is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, counsel for Defendants is to call Magistrate Judge Burke's Chambers at 330-252-6170. (W,Su)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The undersigned has been advised that the parties require more time to finalize their settlement documents. The parties' notice informing the Court that the settlement has been finalized (see Doc. #628 ) is due by 5:00 p.m. on April 3, 2018. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/23/2018. (W,Su)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Stipulation and Order approving joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp. and Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC of dismissal of all claims currently pending against defendants Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp. and Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC without prejudice. Notwithstanding any dismissal of the defendants or the action in general, the parties shall continue to remain subject to and bound by this Stipulation. (Related Doc. No. #629 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/21/2018. (P,J)
March 20, 2018 Filing 629 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp. and Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Order: A mediation was held on March 8, 2018, with respect to the dispute raised in the cross motions to enforce settlement agreement filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and property owners Scott and Barbara Harvey. See Docs. #612 , #616 , #627 . The mediator's number provided to the parties at the conclusion of the mediation has been accepted by both sides. On or before the close of business on March 23, 2018, the parties shall complete and sign the settlement documents and file a notice informing the Court that the settlement has been finalized. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/9/2018. (D,I)
March 8, 2018 Filing 627 Minute Order of Mediation. Following Court facilitated negotiations, the case did not settle. Magistrate Judge Burke gave the parties a mediator's number. By 5:00 p.m. on Friday, March 9, 2018, Counsel will email chambers without copying opposing counsel stating whether their clients accept the mediator's number. Thereafter, the undersigned will put a notice on the docket stating whether the case has settled. Time: 3.5 hours. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/8/2018. (D,I)
March 2, 2018 Filing 626 Joint Proposed Stipulation and Withdrawal of Motion for Status Conference filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. Related document(s) #622 .(Braunstein, Michael)
March 2, 2018 Filing 625 Attorney Appearance by J. Benjamin Fraifogl and Leighann K. Fink filed on behalf of Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey. (Fraifogl, J.) Modified text on 3/5/2018 (M,TL).
February 27, 2018 Filing 624 Reply in support of #622 Motion for status conference regarding Dewatering Settlement filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Braunstein, Michael)
February 26, 2018 Filing 623 Opposition to #622 Motion for status conference regarding Dewatering Settlement filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 22, 2018 Filing 622 WITHDRAWN - Refer to Document #626 - Motion for status conference regarding Dewatering Settlement and Memorandum in Support filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Status Conference)(Braunstein, Michael) Modified text on 2/27/2018 (M,TL). Modified to withdraw on 3/6/2018 (M,TL).
January 29, 2018 Filing 621 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 1/25/2018. By February 9, 2018, counsel will locate and exchange documents and information relevant to the issues raised in their cross motions. On March 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., the Court will hold a settlement conference. Party representatives with full settlement authority are required to attend. On or by March 5, 2018, counsel for each side will submit a confidential memorandum not to exceed five (5) pages to the Court's email address, Burke_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov, setting forth counsel's view of the case. By February 28, 2018, the parties shall exchange a demand and offer. By March 5, 2018, counsel for Defendant shall email the Court a copy of the demand and offer exchanged between the parties, cc-ing opposing counsel. Time: 1 hour. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 1/26/2018. (D,I)
January 22, 2018 Filing 620 Reply in support of #616 Motion and Memorandum to enforce the Settlement Agreement with Defendants Scott Harvey and Barbara Harvey filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants defendants Red Hill Development and RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC to dismiss all pending claims against these defendants from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that they have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them. (Related Doc #619 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 1/18/2018.(P,J)
January 16, 2018 Filing 619 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Red Hill Development and RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
January 16, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants Barbara and Scott Harvey set for 1/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Plaintiff's counsel is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff is to call Magistrate Judge Burke's Chambers at 330-252-6170. (W,Su)
January 15, 2018 Filing 618 Opposition to #616 Motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Woodland Stewardship Management Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Agricultural Impact Mitigation Plan)(Moore, Randall)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Order referring motion by defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey to enforce the settlement agreement between defendants and plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC (Doc. No. #612 ); and a motion by plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC for an order requiring defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey to comply with the terms of the settlement conference held on September 20, 2017 (Doc. No. #616 ) to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a), and Local Civil Rule 72.1. Magistrate Judge Burke shall consider and resolve the motions now pending before this Court. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/12/2018. (P,J)
January 9, 2018 Filing 616 Motion and Memorandum to enforce the Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #615 . (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 1/16/2018 (M,TL).
January 9, 2018 Filing 615 Opposition to #612 Motion to enforce Settlement filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #614 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time until 1/9/2018 to file response/reply to motion to enforce settlement of defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/29/2017.(P,J)
December 29, 2017 Filing 614 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 1/9/2018 to file response/reply to #612 Motion to enforce Settlement of Defendants Scott and Barbara Harvey filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #612 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brunton, Gregory)
December 19, 2017 Filing 613 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 9/20/17 before Judge Lioi, re #604 SEALED TRANSCRIPT. Court Reporter: Mahnke. Requested completion date: ASAP filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #604 . (Zabel, Thomas)
December 18, 2017 Filing 612 Motion to enforce Settlement and Memorandum in Support filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey. (Moore, Randall) Modified text on 12/22/2017 (M,TL).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants John S. McClaren, Jr. and Sharon R. McClaren to dismiss all claims against these defendants from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that they have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them. (Related Doc. No. #611 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 11/29/2017. (P,J)
November 28, 2017 Filing 611 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendants John S. McClaren, Jr. and Sharon R. McClaren filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
November 17, 2017 Filing 610 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2017. Counsel informed the Court that they have executed the Letter Agreement they informed the Court about on October 18, 2017, which provides a process for assessing individual landowners damage claims; that they are proceeding with implementing the process set forth in the Letter Agreement; and that they do not presently see a need for a further phone call with the Court. If the parties find themselves requiring Court assistance, counsel may jointly contact the Chambers of the undersigned to request a status conference. Time: 15 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 11/17/2017. (P,G)
November 15, 2017 Filing 609 Omnibus Reply to Defendants' #606 Memoranda in Opposition to Plaintiff's #599 Renewed Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
November 6, 2017 Filing 608 Motion to join in documents #606 and #607 Opposing #599 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Robert R. Lane. (Tscholl, Robert) Modified event to a motion on 11/15/2017 (M,TL).
November 6, 2017 Filing 607 Brief in Opposition with Memorandum to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related documents #599 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Roger Dush, #2 Exhibit B Proposed Easement) (Moore, Randall)
November 6, 2017 Filing 606 Opposition to #599 Motion to Appoint a Commission, Renewed filed by Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III. (Braunstein, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Copy of electronic notices of #604 SEALED TRANSCRIPT, #605 SEALED TRANSCRIPT mailed to Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan at 207 County Road 30 - A Jeromesville, OH 44840 on 10/27/2017. (S,SR)
October 27, 2017 Filing 605 SEALED Transcript of Telephone Settlement Conference held on September 20, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [6 pages] Related document(s) #603 . (M,Ca)
October 27, 2017 Filing 604 SEALED Transcript of Telephone Settlement Conference held on September 20, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [6 pages] Related document(s) #603 . (M,Ca)
October 26, 2017 Filing 603 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 9/20/17 before Judge Sara Lioi, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 10/27/17 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 20, 2017 Filing 602 Marginal Order granting joint motion by plaintiff and defendant Mutual Oil & Gas Co. for dismissal of all claims currently pending against defendant Mutual Oil & Gas Co. in this action without prejudice. (Related Doc. No. #601 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 10/20/2017. (P,J)
October 19, 2017 Filing 601 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Mutual Oil & Gas Co. filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Mutual Oil & Gas Co. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 18, 2017 Filing 600 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 10/18/2017. The Court will hold a telephone conference on November 17, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. so that counsel can update the Court on the parties' progress in implementing the Letter Agreement. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, Plaintiff's counsel is to call Chambers at 330-252-6170. Time: 15 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/18/2017. (D,I)
October 16, 2017 Filing 599 Motion to Appoint a Commission, Renewed filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Western District of PA Order)(Brunton, Gregory)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] regarding Harvey and Ickert defendants: Counsel for plaintiff, Rover Pipeline, and the Harvey and Ickert defendants have requested an additional 10 days to finalize the settlement and to file a dismissal entry. The Court grants the requested extension. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/16/2017. (P,J)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for Conference to discuss dewatering settlement (Doc #596 )filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe and Kathy A. Wolfe. A telephone conference with counsel is set for 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Plaintiff's counsel is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, Plaintiff's counsel is to call Chambers at 330-252-6170. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/12/2017.(W,Su)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Order: The motion by defendants Dr. James R. and Kathy A. Wolfe, and Joseph Klingel, Partner, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd. to discuss dewatering settlement (Doc. No. #596 ) is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke to consider and resolve. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/11/2017. (P,J)
October 6, 2017 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing regarding 10/6/2017 Non-Document Order mailed on 10/6/2017 to: Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, 207 County Road 30 - A, Jeromesville, OH 44840. (P,J)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The issue of compensation for several properties remains unresolved. Plaintiff Rover has previously indicated that it may wish to renew its motion to appoint a commission. Accordingly, Rover shall have leave until October 16, 2017 to renew its motion. Any remaining defendant whose compensation has not been resolved may file a response by November 6, 2017, and Rover may file a reply by no later than November 16, 2017. Further, defendant Millers' motion to set a trial date (Doc. No. #595 ) is denied without prejudice. Should Rover fail to renew its motion, or in the event the Court denies any such motion, the Court will promptly set trial dates to determine compensation for the remaining defendant tracts. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/6/2017.(P,J)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Central Bank & Trust Co. to dismiss all pending claims against defendant Central Bank & Trust Co. from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that they have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them. (Doc. No. #597 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 10/6/2017. (P,J)
October 5, 2017 Filing 597 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Central Bank & Trust Co. filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 4, 2017 Filing 596 Motion for status conference to Discuss Dewatering Settlement filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion for Status Conference)(Braunstein, Michael)
October 2, 2017 Filing 595 Motion to Set Jury Trial filed by Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Set Jury Trial)(Braunstein, Michael)
September 20, 2017 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing from 9/20/2017 Minutes Entry from Telephone Conference mailed on 9/20/2017 to: Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan, 207 County Road 30 - A, Jeromesville, Ohio 44840. (P,J)
September 20, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 20, 2017, the Court conducted a phone conference with counsel for plaintiff, Greg Brunton, and property owner Michael Sloan for the purpose of continuing settlement discussions. While no settlement was reached, the parties were encouraged to continue settlement discussions, and the Court shall continue to serve as mediator in an effort to reach a final resolution of this matter. (Time: 30 minutes.) (Court Reporter: None.) (P,J)
September 20, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 20, 2017, the Court conducted a phone conference with counsel for plaintiff, Greg Brunton, and counsel for defendant properties owned by Scott and Barbara Harvey and Fred Ickert, Randall Moore. During the conference, counsel placed the terms of the settlements reached between Rover and these landowners on the record and sealed the record. Counsel agreed that the parties would submit dismissal entries for these tracts by no later than October 11, 2017. (Time: 20 minutes.) (Court reporter: Caroline Mahnke.) (P,J)
September 19, 2017 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing from 9/18/2017 Minutes Entry from Mediation Conference mailed on 9/19/2017 to: Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan, 207 County Road 30 - A, Jeromesville, Ohio 44840. (P,J)
September 18, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 18, 2017, the Court conducted a mediation between plaintiff and certain affected landowners. Attorneys Greg Brunton, Tom Zabel, and Rover's in-house counsel, Tray Flournoy, attended on behalf of Rover. Attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham attended on behalf of property owners Roger and Rita Dush, Scott and Barbara Harvey, and Fred Ickert. Attorney Samuel Ferruccio also attended on behalf of property owner Bob Lane. Michael and Donna Sloan appeared pro se. Bob Lane, Roger and Rita Dush, Scott and Barbara Harvey, and Fred Ickert (various property owners) were also in attendance. Settlement was reached on the tract owned by Scott and Barbara Harvey, and on the tract owned by Fred Ickert. The Court discussed the terms of the settlements with counsel and the parties and shall have counsel place the terms on the record at a telephonic conference with counsel for plaintiff and Attorneys Moore and Wigham on Wednesday, September 20, 2017 at 9:30 am. Counsel for Rover shall initiate the call. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to continue discussions in an effort to reach agreement on the remaining tracts. (Time: 9 hours, 15 minutes) (Court Reporter: None) (P,J)
September 5, 2017 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing from 9/5/2017 Telephone Conference involving Michael J. and Donna Sloan mailed on 9/5/2017 to: Michael J. and Donna M. Sloan, 207 County Road 30 - A, Jeromesville, Ohio 44840. (P,J)
September 5, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 5, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference with counsel for Rover, Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel, and pro se property owner Michael J. Sloan. The Court explored with counsel and Mr. Sloan the outstanding issues relative to the Sloan property. It was agreed that the parties will participate in the previously noticed mediation session on September 18, 2017 in chambers. In the interim, counsel for Rover and Mr. and Mrs. Sloan are encouraged to continue to communicate in an effort to reach a resolution. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 15 minutes) (P,J)
September 5, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On September 5, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference with counsel for Rover, Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel, and Attorneys Randall Moore, David Wigham, and Robert Tscholl, representing various defendant tracts. Counsel updated the Court on the status of settlement discussions. Because resolution has not been reached with respect to all tracts, the Court shall go forward with the previously noticed mediation on September 18, 2017, as to all tracts where resolution has not been reached. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue settlement discussions and should contact the Court if a settlement is reached as to any remaining tracts. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 10 minutes) (P,J)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Critchfield Law Firm shall immediately supply their former clients, Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, Trustees of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust, with a copy of the notice scheduling this matter for mediation on September 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., along with this non-document order. Pro se defendants Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, Trustees of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust, shall provide the Court with valid contact information, including address, phone number, and, if available, email address, by no later than 9/8/2017. (Related Doc. No. #594 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/28/2017. (P,J)
August 28, 2017 Notice [non-document]: Mediation conference, with defendant properties represented by the law firm of Roetzel & Andress and Attorney Robert Tscholl, and with pro se defendants Michal J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, to be held on 9/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 526 before Judge Sara Lioi. (P,J) Modified text on 8/30/2017 (P,J).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by attorneys Andrew P. Lycans and Eric T. Michener to withdraw as counsel for defendants Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, Trustees of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust. (Related Doc #594 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/28/2017.(P,J)
August 28, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On August 28, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference with counsel for Rover, Attorney Gregory Brunton, and Attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham, representing various defendant tracts. Counsel advised the Court that the parties engaged in settlement discussions, but that the negotiations did not result in any resolutions owing, in part, to the fact that certain counsel and party representatives were unable to participate due to severe weather in Texas. The Court shall conduct a telephonic status conference with counsel September 5, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. and will issue a notice rescheduling the mediation to September 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 20 minutes.) (P,J)
August 28, 2017 Filing 594 Motion by Andrew P. Lycans and Eric T. Michener to withdraw as attorney filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (Lycans, Andrew)
August 25, 2017 Minute Order [non-document]: Having been advised by counsel that certain individuals scheduled to participate in a mediation on August 28, 2017 will be unable to attend due to inclement weather, the Court hereby postpones the mediation session. Counsel and the affected parties are instructed to engage in settlement discussions telephonically on August 28, 2017, since that day was reserved for the mediation. The Court will be available should counsel wish the Court's assistance. Additionally, the Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with counsel for Rover and Attorney Randall Moore, and Attorney Robert Tscholl (if available), on August 28, 2017 at 3:30 pm to discuss the status of settlement negotiations and to determine whether rescheduling of the mediation is necessary. Counsel for Rover shall arrange for the call. (Time: 10 minutes). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/25/2017. (P,J)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Order approving agreed stipulated motion for dismissal of defendant Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC without prejudice. (Related Doc #590 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/15/2017.(P,J)
August 15, 2017 Filing 592 Joint Agreed Order between plaintiff, Rover Pipeline LLC, and defendants, Dr. James and Kathy Wolfe, and Joseph Klingel, Partner, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., on behalf of themselves and similarly situated landowners represented by Goldman & Braunstein, LLP (collectively, the "G&B Landowners"), resolving defendants' motion to enforce settlement agreement. (Related Doc. No. #559 , #589 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/15/2017. (P,J)
August 14, 2017 Filing 591 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims against Cardinal Gas Services, L.L.C. filed by Cardinal Gas Services, LLC. (McQueen, Aaron) Modified text to match document on 8/22/2017 (M,TL).
August 14, 2017 Filing 590 Agreed Motion for stipulated dismissal of Defendant Ascent Resources - Utica, LLC filed by Defendant Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley) Modified text to match document on 8/22/2017 (M,TL).
August 11, 2017 Filing 589 Joint Proposed Agreed Order filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Strayer, Matthew) Modified text to match document on 8/22/2017 (M,TL).
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Attorneys Greg Brunton and Michael Braunstein contacted the Court on August 3, 2017, and requested a one week extension of time to file a Proposed Agreed Order, which is currently due on August 4, 2017. The parties' request is granted. Counsel shall file a Proposed Agreed Order on the docket no later than August 11, 2017. (Related document#586 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/3/2017. (P,G)
July 28, 2017 Filing 588 Marginal Order granting agreed motion for stipulated dismissal of defendant Range Resources - Appalachia, LLC without prejudice. (Doc. No. #587 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/28/2017. (P,J)
July 27, 2017 Filing 587 Agreed Motion for Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Range Resources - Appalachia, LLC filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document on 8/4/2017 (M,TL).
July 26, 2017 Filing 586 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2017. Regarding the Defendants' pending Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Motion to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff Rover (Doc. #559 ), Counsel reported that they have reached an agreement in principle subject to finalizing language and final approval by their clients. Counsel shall file a Proposed Agreed Order on the docket no later than August 4, 2017. The deadlines set by the undersigned on July 18, 2017 (see Doc. #584 ), are hereby cancelled. Time: 15 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/26/2017. (D,I)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of a commissioner (Doc. No. #3 ) is hereby administratively terminated without prejudice to refiling in the event that mediation, currently scheduled for August 28 and 29, 2017, does not resolve all issues as to compensation for the remaining defendant properties. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/21/2017. (P,J)
July 21, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On July 21, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic conference to discuss Rover's unopposed motion to continue a mediation involving certain defendant properties. (See Doc. No. #585 .) Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, Attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham participated on behalf of certain defendant properties represented by the law firm of Roetzel & Andress, and Attorney Robert Tscholl participated representing certain other defendant tracts. After discussing the matter with counsel, the Court shall grant Rover's motion to continue the mediation, which shall now take place on August 28, 2017, beginning at 10:00 AM, and continuing, if necessary, on August 29, 2017. The Court shall administratively terminate Rover's motion to appoint a commission (Doc. No. #3 ) without prejudice to refiling in the event that the mediation is not successful in resolving all claims relating to the remaining defendant properties. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 20 minutes.) (P,J) Modified text on 8/30/2017 (P,J).
July 20, 2017 Filing 585 Unopposed Motion to continue Mediation filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] Counsel are notified that when referring to the undersigned, the case caption should read "Magistrate Judge" Kathleen B. Burke. Approved by Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/20/2017. (D,I)
July 19, 2017 Filing 584 Minute Order of Conference held on 7/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Burke. The Court held a conference with counsel and parties/party representatives to discuss certain matters, including whether the issues could be resolved without the need for a hearing. See Order for details. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Time: 3 hours. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/19/2017. (D,I)
July 17, 2017 Filing 583 Joint Status Report filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Braunstein, Michael)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Order requiring the parties to file a Joint Status Report, signed by both parties, today, 7/17/2017, by 2:30 PM. Defendants are only permitted to present the witnesses identified in their witness list and shall be held to those witnesses on direct exam. The Court reminds counsel that each side will have one hour to present testimony. The Court reminds the parties that lead counsel and party representative(s) with full settlement authority and knowledge of the dispute are required to attend the hearing. See Doc. #568 . The failure to comply with these orders may result in sanctions. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/17/2017. (D,I)
July 17, 2017 Filing 581 Witness List for July 18, 2017 hearing filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 7/25/2017 (M,TL).
July 17, 2017 Filing 580 Reply to Unapproved Joint Status Report Submitted by Defendants Dr. James and Kathy Wolfe and Joseph Klingel, Partner, K-SLP Real Estate, LTD on July 17, 2017 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #578 . (Brunton, Gregory)
July 17, 2017 Filing 579 Witness List filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Braunstein, Michael)
July 17, 2017 Filing 578 Joint Status Report filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Braunstein, Michael)
July 12, 2017 Filing 577 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 7/11/2017. The Court and counsel discussed the upcoming hearing. The Court informed counsel that each side will have one hour to present testimony. In the witness lists the parties were previously ordered to file on or before noon on July 17, 2017, the parties shall include a brief description of each witnesss anticipated testimony. Counsel shall also file a Joint Status Report (by noon on July 17) informing the Court what, if any, progress has been made to resolve the issues. See order for details. Time: 20 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/12/2017. (D,I)
July 10, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff Rover Pipeline and Goldman & Braunstein, counsel for Defendants Wolfes and Klingel, set for 7/11/2017 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. The purpose of the call is to discuss the status of the parties' settlement discussions and preparation for the hearing. Plaintiff's counsel is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall call Magistrate Judge Burke's Chambers at 330-252-6170. (W,Su)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The telephonic status conference scheduled for 10:00 AM today between counsel for Rover and counsel for defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD has been cancelled as the Court has been advised by counsel that the dispute regarding the settlement agreement between these parties has been resolved. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2017. (S,He)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's #576 motion to continue mediation. Mediation will now take place on 7/24/17 at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers 526 before Judge Sara Lioi. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/17. (S,HR)
July 7, 2017 Filing 576 Unopposed Motion to continue Mediation filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 6, 2017 Filing 575 SEALED Document:Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC From Violating the AIMP and From Breaching its Agreements with Defendants filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. Related document(s) #574 , #571 , #559 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Johnson Affidavit with exhibits B,C,D and E (pictures) to affidavit)(Braunstein, Michael) Added link and modified attachment on 7/14/2017 (P,G).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Order granting Defendants' Motion for leave to File Under Seal Their Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff from Violating the AIMP and from Breaching its Agreements with Defendants (Related Doc #573 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/5/2017.(D,I)
July 5, 2017 Filing 573 Motion for leave to File Under Seal Their Reply in Support of Defendant's #559 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff from Violating the AIMP and from Breaching its Agreements with Defendants filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting D's Motion to File Reply Under Seal)(Strayer, Matthew) Modified text to add link on 7/12/2017 (M,TL).
June 30, 2017 Filing 572 Joint Status Report filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Strayer, Matthew)
June 28, 2017 Filing 571 SEALED Memorandum in Opposition to #559 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Restrain and Enjoin Rover Pipeline LLC from Violating the Agricultural Impact Mitigation Plan and from Breaching its Agreements with Defendants filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 FERC Certificate, #2 Environmental Impact Survey, #3 Upland Erosion Control, #4 FERC Wetland procedures, #5 FERC AIMP, #6 Affidavit of Marl Vedral)(Brunton, Gregory) Modified text and removed double wording on 7/6/2017 (S,HR).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) granting Plaintiff's #569 Motion to Seal Document. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 6/28/2017.(W,Su) Modified text on 7/6/2017 (M,TL).
June 28, 2017 Filing 569 Motion to file a response to defendant's #559 Motion to Enforce Settlement under seal filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document and remove duplicate wording on 7/6/2017 (M,TL).
June 22, 2017 Filing 568 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2017. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants are to arrange a meeting, telephonic or in person, between their respective experts by no later than June 28, 2017. By 5:00 p.m. on June 30, 2017, counsel shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Court as to the outcome of this discussion. Motion hearing set for 7/18/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. On or before 12:00 Noon on 7/17/2017, counsel for each side shall file a list of the witnesses they intend to call. Lead counsel and party representative(s) with full settlement authority and knowledge of the dispute are required to attend the hearing. Time: 30 minutes. See order for details. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 6/22/2017. (D,I)
June 22, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The telephone status conference, to discuss an issue relating to the finalization of a settlement agreement between Rover and certain property owned by Barkheimer Realty LTD (Doc. No. #560 ), scheduled before Judge Lioi on 6/22/2017 at 11:00 a.m. is rescheduled to 7/10/2017 at 10:00 AM. The telephone conference will be initiated by defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD's counsel. After all counsel are on line, counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. (P,J)
June 20, 2017 Filing 567 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Matthew Grashoff filed by Mutual Oil & Gas Co.. (Grashoff, Matthew)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Stipulation and Order of agreement between plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Bank of America Corporation and dismissal of defendant without prejudice. (Related Doc #564 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/19/2017.(P,J)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Eagle Realty, Ltd. to dismiss all pending claims against defendant Eagle Realty Ltd. from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that they have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them. (Related Doc #563 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/19/2017.(P,J)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Kismet Organic Farms Ltd. to dismiss all pending claims against defendant Kismet Organic Farms Ltd. from the entirety of this action, without prejudice, for the reason that they have fully resolved their dispute and all associated claims between them. (Related Doc. No. #562 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/19/2017.(P,J)
June 16, 2017 Filing 565 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2017. Telephone Conference with counsel set for 6/22/2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke to discuss whether the parties have agreed to a resolution. In the event the parties do not reach a resolution on all or any issues raised in the Motion, the Court set the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's opposition brief is due June 28, 2017, and Defendants' reply brief is due July 6, 2017. A hearing date and time will be set during the telephone call on June 22, 2017. Time: 15 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 6/16/2017. (D,I)
June 16, 2017 Filing 564 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Bank of America, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 16, 2017 Filing 563 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Eagle Realty Ltd. filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 16, 2017 Filing 562 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Kismet Organic Farmd Ltd. filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
June 15, 2017 Set Telephone Status Conference for 6/22/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sara Lioi. (See minutes entry 6/14/2017)(Notice of telephone conference filed 6/14/2017 after minutes entry was filed canceled this from the calendar) (P,J)
June 14, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff Rover Pipeline and Goldman & Braunstein, counsel for Defendants Wolfes and Klingel (see Docs. 559, 561), set for 6/15/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Plaintiff's counsel is to set up the call. After all participants are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall call Magistrate Judge Burke's Chambers at 330-252-6170. (W,Su)
June 14, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. At the request of counsel, on June 14, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference to discuss an issue relating to the finalization of a settlement agreement between Rover and certain property owned by Barkheimer Realty LTD. (See Doc. No. #560 .) Attorney Bruce Moore participated on behalf of plaintiff, and James Wherley participated on behalf of the affected defendant. Counsel advised the Court that the parties may have resolved the issue but will need time to finalize the agreement. Accordingly, the Court will conduct a follow up telephonic conference on June 22, 2017 at 11:00 am unless the parties advise the Court, in advance, that the issue is completely resolved. The telephone conference will be initiated by defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD's counsel. After all counsel are on line, counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 5 minutes.) (P,J)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Order referring to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke for report and recommendation the motion to enforce settlement agreement and to restrain and enjoin plaintiff from violating the agricultural impact mitigation plan and from breaching its agreements (Doc. No. #559 ) filed by Defendants Dr. James and Kathy Wolfe, and Joseph Klingel, Partner, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/14/2017. (P,J)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD for telephone conference regarding status of settlement agreement. (Related Doc #560 .) Telephone conference, with counsel for plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD, set for 6/14/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD's counsel. After all counsel are on line, counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/13/2017.(P,J)
June 12, 2017 Filing 560 Motion (Request) for Conference Regarding Settlement Agreement with Plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC filed by Defendant Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Wherley, James) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 6/14/2017 (M,TL).
June 12, 2017 Filing 559 Sealed Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Motion to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff Rover Pipeline from Violating the Agricultural Impact Mitigation Plan and from Breaching Its Agreements with Defendants, filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. Related document(s) #558 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LOI, #2 Exhibit B - Easement, #3 Exhibit C - Addendum, #4 Exhibit D - AIMP, #5 Exhibit E - Wolfe Affidavit, #6 Exhibit F - Klingel Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G - G&B FERC Comment, #8 Exhibit H - G&B FERC Supp Comment, #9 Exhibit I - email correspondence)(Braunstein, Michael). Added motion and modified text on 6/14/2017 (S,HR).
June 12, 2017 Filing 558 Marginal Entry Order granting motion by defendants Dr. James R. and Kathy A. Wolfe and Joseph Klingel, Partner, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd. for leave to file under seal. (Related Doc #557 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/12/2017.(P,J)
June 8, 2017 Filing 557 Motion for leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Restrain and Enjoin Plaintiff from Violating the Agricultural Impact Mitigation Plan and from Breaching its Agreements with Defendants filed by K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File TRO Under Seal)(Strayer, Matthew) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 6/14/2017 (M,TL).
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot the motions (Doc. Nos. #248 , #286 ) to strike plaintiff's motion for immediate possession (Doc. No. #4 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/7/2017. (P,J)
June 7, 2017 Filing 556 Marginal Entry Order granting agreed motion for stipulated dismissal of defendant The Huntington Trust Company, NA, Trustee Under the Trust of Helen G. Puncheon Smith, Virginia Dreher, Florence E. Puncheon, Helen P. Puncheon Green and Elizabeth Bell, dated January 24, 2977 and Amended November 18, 1993. (Doc. No. #555 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 6/7/2017. (P,J) Modified text on 6/13/2017 (M,TL).
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] In light of the plaintiff's notice of withdraw (Doc. No. #554 ) of its motion for order confirming condemnation authority and awarding immediate possession of the easements sought ("motion for immediate possession") (Doc. No. #4 , incorrectly referenced in plaintiff's notice as Doc. No. 7), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminated the motion for immediate possession (Doc. No. #4 ) as moot. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/7/2017.(P,J)
June 5, 2017 Filing 555 Joint Motion for Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Huntington Trust Company, NA, Trustee Under the Trust of Helen G. Puncheon Smith, Virginia Dreher, Florence E. Puncheon, Helen P. Puncheon Green and Elizabeth Bell, dated January 24, 1977 and amended November 18, 1993 filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document on 6/12/2017 (M,TL).
June 5, 2017 Filing 554 Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #4 .(Brunton, Gregory)
June 5, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On June 5, 2017 and in response to the Court's show cause order, counsel contacted the Court to advise on the status of the right of entry agreements. Attorneys Tom Zabel and Gregory Bruton participated on behalf of plaintiff, and Attorney Randall Moore participated on behalf of several defendants. Counsel advised that all outstanding issues relative to the right of entry agreements are resolved and Rover will file a notice of withdrawal of its motion for immediate possession by no later than June 6, 2017. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 5 minutes.) (P,J)
June 2, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The telephonic status conference with counsel for plaintiff Rover Pipeline and defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio scheduled for June 5, 2017 at 12:00 PM is canceled. (P,J)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal of defendants United Telephone Company of Ohio and CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Related Doc. No. #550 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 6/2/2017. (P,J)
June 2, 2017 Filing 552 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Appoint Commission filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rover v. Kanzigg Opinion)Related document(s) #3 .(Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Order. The Court instructed the law firm of Roetzel & Andress to finalize the right of entry agreements for their clients by 5/26/2017. The Court further instructed Rover Pipeline LLC to move to withdraw (as moot) its motion for immediate possession by no later than 5/27/2017. As of the date of this Order, Rover has yet to withdraw its motion or otherwise indicate that issues as to immediate possession remain as to any defendant properties. Accordingly, Rover is directed to show cause by 6/05/2017 as to why its motion for immediate possession #4 should not be denied as moot. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/01/2017. (T,Je)
May 31, 2017 Filing 550 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio and Defendant Centurylink Communications, LLC filed by United Telephone Company of Ohio and Centurylink Communications, LLC. (Farrell, Michael) Modified text to match document on 6/5/2017 (M,TL).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot the #541 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Related document #454 ) . Judge Sara Lioi on 5/30/2017.(P,G)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Order of Dismissal of Defendant Blue Racer Midstream, LLC without prejudice (Related document #548 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/30/2017. (P,G)
May 26, 2017 Filing 548 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Defendant Blue Racer Midstream, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 25, 2017 Filing 547 Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Eclipse Resources-Ohio LLC and Eclipse Resources I, LP filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 24, 2017 Filing 546 Omnibus Reply to Defendants' Memoranda in Opposition #267 , #535 , #536 , #543 , #544 to Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified to add links on 6/1/2017 (M,TL).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant United Telephone's motion for an extension of time until 6/1/2017 in which to answer (Doc. No. #545 ) is granted. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference with counsel for Rover and United Telephone on June 5, 2017 at 12:00 PM if the parties have not filed a stipulated dismissal by that date. Rover's counsel shall initiate the call. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/23/2017.(P,J)
May 22, 2017 Filing 545 Motion for extension of time until 06/01/2017 to answer filed by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
May 16, 2017 Filing 544 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, Lloyd Wayne James. Related document(s) #3 . (Moore, Randall)
May 16, 2017 Filing 543 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Roger Dush Declaration, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Easement) (Moore, Randall)
May 12, 2017 Minutes of Proceedings and Order [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On 5/12/17, prior to the scheduled hearing on the motion to enforce settlement and the motion for immediate possession, the Court met with counsel in chambers. After a period of discussion, counsel advised that the parties had reached an agreement obviating the need for a hearing. Counsel's oral motion to withdraw the motion to enforce (Doc. No. #539 ) is granted and the motion is withdrawn. Counsel further advised that the parties had reached a final settlement as to the property owned by James Lloyd Wayne. With respect to that tract, the parties are to finalize the permanent easement with confidential addendum by May 23, 2017. As to the remaining tracts represented by Roetzel & Andress, defendants are to finalize the right of entry agreements by 12:00 PM on May 26, 2017. Rover shall move to withdraw (as moot) its motion for immediate possession (Doc. No. #4 ) by May 29, 2017. Counsel shall meet on June 26, 2017 at 10:00 AM at the offices of Roetzel & Andress for the purpose of continuing settlement discussions on the remaining tracts. If settlement is not reached as to all remaining tracts, the Court shall conduct a status conference and mediation session regarding the remaining tracts on July 17, 2017 at 11:00 AM. All counsel and parties or party representatives (with full authority to settle) must attend. (Court Reporter: n/a). Time: 1 hour 20 minutes. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/12/17. (S,HR) Modified text on 5/12/2017 (S,HR).
May 12, 2017 Filing 542 Response to Defendant's #539 Motion to enforce Settlement filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zabel, Thomas - s/Gregory Brunton) Modified to remove duplicate wording and all caps on 5/17/2017 (M,TL).
May 11, 2017 Filing 541 Motion for extension of time until 05/21/2017 to answer filed by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
May 11, 2017 Filing 540 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference from March 6, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, Lloyd Wayne James. Related document(s) #538 , #539 . (Moore, Randall) Modified text on 5/19/2017 (S,HR).
May 11, 2017 Filing 539 WITHDRAWN per Minute Order on 5/12/17. Motion to enforce Settlement filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, Lloyd Wayne James. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Randall) Modified to withdraw on 5/12/2017 (S,HR).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Order: The motion to file under seal (Doc. No. #537 ) is granted in part. The moving defendants may file the transcript of the settlement conference under seal, but they are not granted leave to file the motion to enforce the settlement under seal. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/11/2017.(P,J)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the motion contained in Doc. No. #535 . The moving defendants shall be granted leave to join in the briefs in opposition to plaintiff's motion to appoint a commission that appear on the Court's docket as Doc. Nos. #533 and #534 . Judge Sara Lioi on 5/11/2017.(P,J)
May 11, 2017 Filing 537 Motion for leave to File Under Seal Their Motion to Enforce Settlement and Supporting Transcript filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, Lloyd Wayne James. (Moore, Randall)
May 10, 2017 Filing 536 Opposition to Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III. (Braunstein, Michael) Modified text on 5/16/2017 (M,TL).
May 10, 2017 Filing 535 Motion to Join in Defendants' pleadings #533 , #534 Opposing a Commission and Requesting a Jury Trial filed by Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. (Tscholl, Robert) Modified on 5/16/2017 (M,TL).
May 10, 2017 Filing 534 FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT NOT TEXT SEARCHABLE - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE - Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint A Commission filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, Lloyd Wayne James. (Moore, Randall) Modified to note filing error, attorney contacted and NEF regenerated on 5/16/2017 (M,TL).
May 10, 2017 Filing 533 FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT NOT TEXT SEARCHABLE - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE - Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Roger Dush, #2 Exhibit Easement Plan) (Moore, Randall) Modified to note filing error, attorney contacted and NEF regenerated on 5/16/2017 (M,TL).
May 10, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On May 10, 2017, at the request of counsel, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference to discuss the hearing scheduled in this matter for May 12, 2017. Attorney Greg Brunton participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorney Randall Moore participated, representing various landowners. The Court reaffirmed for counsel that the Court will conduct an evidentiary hearing on both the anticipated motion to enforce the settlement and Rover's motion for immediate possession on May 12, 2017. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 7 minutes.) (P,J)
May 9, 2017 Filing 532 Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc. filed by Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc. (Document not text searchable.). (Young, Jeremy) Modified to note document not text searchable and attorney notified on 5/15/2017 (M,TL).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by attorneys Jeremy S. Young and Stephen D. Jones for leave to file their notice of withdrawal as counsel for Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc. (Related Doc #376 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/8/2017.(P,J)
May 2, 2017 Minute Order [non-document]: On May 1, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference to receive an update on the status of outstanding issues relating to certain property owners. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham participated, representing various defendant properties. Counsel for plaintiff advised the Court that it had not heard back from its client regarding a possible resolution of the outstanding issues. Accordingly, the Court sets this matter for an evidentiary hearing on May 12, 2017 at 10:00 AM on the issue of enforcement of settlement, and, if the Court determines that the parties do not have an enforceable settlement, for a hearing on Rover's motion for immediate possession. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/2/2017. (Court Reporter: None) (Time: 10 minutes) (P,J)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #531 motion by defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio for extension of time until 05/11/2017 to answer. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/1/2017.(P,J)
May 1, 2017 Filing 531 Motion for extension of time until 05/11/2017 to answer filed by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Filing 530 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Western Reserve Land Conservancy. (Krebs, Patrick)
April 28, 2017 Filing 529 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended Complaint filed by Western Reserve Land Conservancy. (Krebs, Patrick) Modified text to match document on 5/8/2017 (M,TL).
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Stipulation and Order of agreement between plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. (Related Doc. No. #525 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/28/2017. (P,J)
April 28, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On April 28, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference to continue discussions regarding unresolved issues relating to certain property owners. Attorneys Greg Brunton and Tom Zabel participated on behalf of Rover, and Attorneys Randall Moore and David Wigham participated, representing various defendant properties. After a period of discussion, the Court determined that it will conduct a follow-up telephonic conference with counsel on May 1, 2017 at 3:00 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. In the interim, counsel are encouraged to continue discussions in an effort to resolve all outstanding issues relative to possession and compensation. (Time: 25 minutes.) (Court Reporter: None.) (P,J)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Stipulation and Order of agreement between plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendant Verizon North LLC. (Related Doc. No. #524 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/28/2017. (P,J)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Stipulation and Order of agreement between plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and defendants George Welch and Dart Oil & Natural Gas-Ohio LLC. (Related Doc. No. #523 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/28/2017. (P,J)
April 28, 2017 Filing 525 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of CSX Transportation, Inc. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Moore, Branden)
April 26, 2017 Filing 524 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Verizon North LLC filed by Verizon North, Inc.. (Haaker, Christine)
April 26, 2017 Filing 523 Proposed Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants George Welch and Dart Oil & Natural Gas Ohio, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 19, 2017 Filing 522 Notice of Filing Outstanding Compensation Report filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Outstanding Compensation Report)(Brunton, Gregory)
April 19, 2017 Filing 521 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Attorneys Gregory D. Brunton, Daniel J. Hyzak and Bruce A. Moore have left the firm of Reminger Co., LPA and joined the firm of Gordon & Rees, LLP filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document on 5/1/2017 (M,TL).
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #509 motion by defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio for extension of time to respond to complaint until 5/1/2017. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/19/2017.(P,J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Order granting joint motion for dismissal of defendant Eric Petroleum Corporation (EPC), and for approval of the stipulation of the parties. (Related Doc. No. #485 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/19/2017.(P,J)
April 19, 2017 Filing 519 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apple Creek Banking Company. (Wright, Elizabeth) Modified text to match document on 5/1/2017 (M,TL).
April 19, 2017 Filing 518 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney David W. Wenger and adding attorney J. Andrew Crawford filed by on behalf of Park National Bank. (Crawford, J.)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court has reviewed the settlement status report filed by defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. ("CSXT"). (Doc. No. #516 .) If a stipulation between Rover Pipeline, LLC and CSXT is not finalized on or before 4/28/2017, the parties shall appear before the Court on 5/1/2017 at 11:00 a.m. for a hearing in Courtroom 530, U.S. District Court, 2 South Main Street, Akron, Ohio, on all remaining issues. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/19/2017. (P,J)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Order: In the minutes dated March 10, 2017, Rover was instructed to file a spreadsheet identifying all defendant properties for which compensation has yet to be determined. In reviewing the docket, the Court finds that Rover has yet to comply with this directive. Rover shall file the required spreadsheet by 12:00 PM on April 19, 2017, or show cause as why it is unable to do so. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/17/2017. (P,J)
April 14, 2017 Filing 516 Settlement Status Report filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Related document(s) #450 .(Moore, Branden) Modified text to match document on 4/21/2017 (M,TL).
April 14, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On April 13, 2017, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference to address a potential dispute between Rover and certain defendants. Attorneys Greg Bruton, Tom Zable, Randy Moore, and Dave Wiggins participated. Counsel advised the Court that the parties continue to work toward a resolution. The parties are instructed to continue to work diligently to resolve the disagreement within the coming week and advise the Court as soon as an agreement is reached. If no final resolution is reached by April 19, 2017, the Court will schedule this matter for a hearing. (Time: 10 minutes.) (Court Reporter: None.) (P,J)
April 13, 2017 Filing 515 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Moore, Branden)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Cardinal Gas Services, LLC. (Related Doc. No. #488 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., Successor In Interest To Standard Oil Co. (Related Doc. No. #481 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Green Energy, Inc. and Carl R. Gessel, dba Green Energy Corp. (Related Doc. No. #464 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Aspire Energy of Ohio, LLC and Consumers Gas Cooperative. (Related Doc. No. #452 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Jerry Moore, Inc. and MGH, Inc. (Related Doc. No. #434 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Filing 509 Motion for extension of time until May 1, 2017 to answer filed by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court construes Doc. No. #427 as a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 to dismiss defendant The East Ohio Gas Company without prejudice and the same is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #506 motion by defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. for extension of time of 14 days to file answer. (Answer due 4/24/2017.) Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017.(P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #504 motion by defendants Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC and George C. Welch, III for extension of time until 5/1/2017 to answer complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017.(P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court hereby sets the briefing schedule for plaintiff Rover Pipeline's Motion to Appoint a Commission (Doc. No. #3 ) as follows: any oppositions to the motion must be filed by May 10, 2017, and Rover shall have leave until May 24, 2017 to file a reply. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017. (P,J)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court has been advised that the parties have conferred and are working diligently to finalize documentation relating to the parties' settlement. Accordingly, defendant Farquhar's motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint (Doc. No. #494 ) is terminated as moot. Should the parties encounter difficulties processing the necessary documentation, they may seek the Court's assistance. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/11/2017.(P,J)
April 10, 2017 Filing 508 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Moore, Branden) Modified text to match document on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 507 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Apple Creek Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B Note)(Wright, Elizabeth) Modified description of attachments on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 506 Motion for extension of time of fourteen (14) days to answer Complaint filed by Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. Related document #1 . (Moore, Branden) Modified text to include extension requested on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 505 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey. (Moore, Randall) Modified text to match document on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 504 Motion for extension of time until 5/1/17 to answer Complaint filed by Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC, George C. Welch, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Bruce) Modified to note time requested on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 503 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Lloyd Wayne James. (Moore, Randall) Modified text to match document on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 502 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall) Modified text to match document on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 501 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Fred A. Ickert. (Moore, Randall) Modified text to match document on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 500 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A. for Bank of America Corporation filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Kostura, Bryan)
April 10, 2017 Filing 499 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint and #279 Second Amended complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Kostura, Bryan) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #493 motion by defendant Verizon North, Inc. for extension of time until 5/1/2017 to respond to the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/10/2017.(P,J)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Order of Dismissal of Party: The Court construes Doc. No. #487 as a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 to dismiss Leesville Land, LCC without prejudice and the same is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/10/2017. (P,J)
April 10, 2017 Filing 497 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley)
April 10, 2017 Filing 496 Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Krieder Wright and Margo E. Broehl filed on behalf of Apple Creek Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(Wright, Elizabeth) Modified text to add additional attorney on 4/19/2017 (M,TL).
April 10, 2017 Filing 495 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley)
April 10, 2017 Filing 494 Motion for extension of time until 05/10/2017 to Finalize Easement and Addendum pursuant to Settlement filed by Cynthia A. Farquhar, Robert E. Farquhar. (Stacy-Hartman, Amanda)
April 7, 2017 Filing 493 Second Consent Motion for extension of time until May 1, 2017 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Verizon North, Inc. (Haaker, Christine) Modified text to match document on 4/13/2017 (M,TL).
April 7, 2017 Filing 492 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint and #279 Second Amended complaint filed by CNX Gas Company, LLC, Consol Energy, Inc. (Hogan, Christopher) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 4/14/2017 (M,TL).
April 7, 2017 Filing 491 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Park National Corporation filed by Park National Bank. (Wenger, David) Modified to add other affiliate on 4/13/2017 (M,TL).
April 7, 2017 Filing 490 Answer to #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Park National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage attached to Answer as Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Mortgage attached to Answer as Ex. B)(Wenger, David) Modified text on 4/13/2017 (M,TL).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Order granting joint motion of plaintiff Rover Pipeline and defendant Eric Petroleum Corporation for dismissal without prejudice, but subject to the Stipulation and Order of agreement between Rover Pipeline and defendant Eric Petroleum Corporation, which is hereby approved by the Court. (Related Doc. No. #485 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/7/2017. (P,J)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #486 motion for extension of time until April 30, 2017 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Western Reserve Land Conservancy. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/7/2017.(P,J)
April 7, 2017 Filing 488 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant Cardinal Gas Services, L.L.C. filed by Cardinal Gas Services, LLC. (McQueen, Aaron)
April 7, 2017 Filing 487 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Defendant Leesville Land, LLC, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 6, 2017 Filing 486 Motion for extension of time until April 30, 2017 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Western Reserve Land Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krebs, Patrick) Modified description of attachment on 4/13/2017 (M,TL).
April 6, 2017 Filing 485 Joint Motion to dismiss party and Approve Stipulation filed by Defendant Eric Petroleum Corporation. Related document(s) #388 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed EPC Dismissal Order)(Hill, Thomas) Modified description of attachment on 4/13/2017 (M,TL).
April 6, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. In light of plaintiff's response to the Court's show cause order (Doc. No. #480 ; see Doc. No. 474), the Court conducted an informal telephonic status conference on 4/5/2017. Attorneys Tom Zabel and Gregory Bruton participated on behalf of plaintiff, and attorney Randall Moore participated on behalf of several defendants. In accordance with the discussion during the status conference, counsel are directed to meet and confer to attempt to resolve a potential disagreement as to their settlement of plaintiff's right to immediate access. The Court will conduct a follow-up telephonic status conference with counsel on April 13, 2017 at 10:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call and contact the Court when attorney Moore is on the line. (Time: 25 minutes.) (Court Reporter: None.) (P,J)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting, in part, motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint filed by defendant Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. Leave is granted until April 10, 2017. (Related Doc. No. #484 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/6/2017.(P,J)
April 5, 2017 Filing 484 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 19, 2017 to Move or Plead to the Complaint filed by Defendant Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The parties' joint stipulation (Doc. No. #483 ) shall be construed as a motion for leave to plead and shall be granted in part. Defendants Welch and Dart Oil shall have leave until April 10, 2017 to answer or otherwise plead. Should these defendants require additional time, they may file a proper motion requesting such time and setting forth the reason for such an extension. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/5/2017. (P,J)
April 4, 2017 Filing 483 Proposed Stipulation For Extension of Time to Plead until 5/1/17 filed by Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC, George C. Welch, III. (Barnes, Brent) Modified to note time requested on 4/11/2017 (M,TL).
April 4, 2017 Filing 482 Attorney Appearance by Brent A. Barnes and Bruce E. Smith filed on behalf of Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC, George C. Welch, III. (Barnes, Brent) Modified to add second attorney name on 4/11/2017 (M,TL).
March 30, 2017 Filing 481 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant BP Pipelines (North America) Inc., Successor In Interest to Standard Oil Co. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 29, 2017 Filing 480 Response to Court's #474 March 24, 2017 Order to Show Cause filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory) Per Court instructions, access given to plaintiff and parties represented by Attorney Randall Moore on 4/3/2017 (P,J). Modified to remove ex parte restriction as ex parte chosen in error and NEF regenerated on 4/5/2017 (M,TL).
March 29, 2017 Filing 479 Hourly Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/06/2017 before Judge Burke, Court Reporter: Geizer. Requested completion date: ASAP filed by All Plaintiffs. (Zabel, Thomas)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Order: The joint motion for dismissal of defendant Frontier North Inc. is hereby granted, and it is, therefore, ordered that defendant Frontier North Inc. is hereby dismissed from the civil action without prejudice. (Related Doc. No. #476 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/28/2017. (P,J)
March 27, 2017 Filing 477 Attorney Appearance by Michael Braunstein filed by on behalf of Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III. (Braunstein, Michael)
March 27, 2017 Filing 476 Joint Motion to dismiss Frontier North Inc. filed by Frontier North Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noble, Michele) Modified text on 3/28/2017 (S,HR).
March 27, 2017 Filing 475 Non-Appeal Telephonic Transcript Order for settlement proceedings held on 3/6/17 before Magistrate Judge Burke, requested by Defendant James Yoder. Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Requested completion date: 3/30/17 (K,J)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Order: Rover is directed to show cause by March 29, 2017 as to why its motion for immediate possession (Doc. No. #4 ) should not be denied as moot. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2017. (P,J)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court construes the parties' stipulation for an extension of time (Doc. No. #473 ) as a motion for an extension of time in which to answer and grants same in part. Defendant The Park National Bank, doing business as The Park National Bank, Richland Bank, Farmers and Savings Bank and First-Knox National Bank, shall have until April 10, 2017 to answer the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2017. (P,J)
March 23, 2017 Filing 473 Proposed stipulation for extension of time until 4/11/17 to move or plead filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 3/28/2017. Signed by Daniel L. Bey. (S,HR).
March 23, 2017 Notice to Attorney Kevin L. Colosimo. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #457 . (G,CA)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court construes Doc. No. #470 as a joint motion for an extension of time in which to answer the complaint and grants the motion in part. Defendant Leesville Land, LLC shall have leave until April 10, 2017 to file an answer. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/23/2017. (P,J)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #472 motion by defendant Bank of America Corporation for leave until 4/10/2017 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/23/2017.(P,J)
March 21, 2017 Filing 472 Motion for leave until 4/10/17 to File a Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Kostura, Bryan) Modified text on 3/28/2017 (S,HR).
March 21, 2017 Filing 471 Attorney Appearance by Bryan T. Kostura and Nicholas J. Kopcho filed by on behalf of Bank of America Corporation. (Kostura, Bryan)
March 21, 2017 Filing 470 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time until April 25, 2017 to Answer Complaint filed by Leesville Land, LLC. (Schramm, Erik) Not text searchable. Filer advised on 3/28/2017 (S,HR).
March 21, 2017 Filing 469 Stipulated Agreed Entry: Defendants will refrain from interfering with or otherwise obstructing Rover's pipeline construction activities on the Property and Rover AGREES that its access onto the Property shall be limited in location to those certain pipeline easements and temporary workspace easements which have been identified in Rover's FERC Certificate. Rover further AGREES that it will fully comply with all FERC construction requirements on the Property and with all terms of the Permanent Easement Agreement and Confidential Addendum to Easement Agreement between the parties for all of Rover's pipeline construction activities on the Property. (Related Doc. Nos. #467 , #468 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/21/2017. (P,J)
March 21, 2017 Filing 468 Proposed Stipulated Agreed Entry filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document #467 . (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document on 3/27/2017 (M,TL).
March 20, 2017 Filing 467 Motion for temporary restraining order , Motion for preliminary injunction and to enforce settlement agreement filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plat, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Mark Vedral, #3 Exhibit C - Settlement Transcript)(Brunton, Gregory)
March 20, 2017 Filing 466 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Frontier Communications Corporation for Frontier North Inc. filed by Frontier North Inc.. (Noble, Michele)
March 20, 2017 Filing 465 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First and #279 Second Amended Complaint filed by Frontier North Inc. (Noble, Michele) Modified text to match document and added links on 3/24/2017 (M,TL).
March 17, 2017 Filing 464 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Green Energy, Inc., and Carl R. Gessel, dba Green Energy Corp. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC and Defendant Buckeye Oil Producing Co. (Related Doc. No. #455 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Sprint Communications Company L.P., Level 3 Communications LLC, and Wiltel Communications LLC. (Related Doc. No. #449 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants MFC Drilling, Inc. and Jim Aslanides. (Related Doc. Nos. #435 , #448 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J) Added link on 4/11/2017 (P,J).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Carroll Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Related Doc. No. #447 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J)
March 17, 2017 Filing 459 Stipulation & Order: The parties have agreed and jointly stipulated that plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC shall have access to that certain property held by defendants Patrick C. Goebel and Karen A. Goebel, more commonly known by the Wayne County Property ID Number 43-00080.000, in order to conduct certain limited pipeline survey and construction activities which are reasonably necessary for Rover to complete its Rover Pipeline Project. Rover's access shall be strictly limited in location to those certain pipeline easements and temporary workspace easements which have been identified in Rover's FERC Certificate and which cross the Property. This Order shall not grant Rover any additional rights pertaining to defendants' Property beyond what has already been agreed to by the parties. This Order only confirms Rover's right of entry for those limited purposes previously identified by counsel. (Related Doc. No. #456 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J) Modified document relationship on 3/17/2017 (P,J).
March 17, 2017 Filing 458 Stipulation & Order: By agreement between counsel for plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC and defendant Ascent Resources Utica, LLC, defendant is granted a 21 day extension of time to move or plead to the complaint. Plaintiff and defendant stipulate that said extension shall not impact plaintiff's right to enter the property immediately for tree felling and construction activities as approved by the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. Defendant's new response deadline shall be on or before April 5, 2017. (Related Doc. No. #457 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2017. (P,J)
March 16, 2017 Filing 457 Proposed Stipulation For Extension of Time of 21 days to Move or Plead filed by Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley) Modified to add extension requested on 3/23/2017 (M,TL).
March 16, 2017 Filing 456 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants Patrick C. Goebel and Karen A. Goebel filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Hyzak, Daniel)
March 16, 2017 Filing 455 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff & Defendant, Buckeye Oil Producing Co. filed by Buckeye Oil Producing Co.. (Rose, Tara)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The motion of defendant United Telephone Co. of Ohio for an extension of time to answer (Doc. No. #454 ) is granted in part. Defendant shall have until April 10, 2017 to answer the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/16/2017.(P,J)
March 15, 2017 Filing 454 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 14, 2017 to answer filed by Defendant United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
March 15, 2017 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $14,534.00 received via Fedwire on 03/10/2017. (K,Ve)
March 14, 2017 Filing 453 Notice of appearance of Defendant Mutual Oil & Gas Co. filed by Mutual Oil & Gas Co. (Grashoff, Matthew) Modified to remove all caps on 3/23/2017 (M,TL).
March 14, 2017 Filing 452 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Aspire Energy of Ohio, LLC and Consumers Gas Cooperative filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory - s/Daniel J. Hyzak) Modified to note signing attorney on 3/23/2017 (M,TL).
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #431 motion by defendant Cardinal Gas Services, LLC for leave to plead. (See blanket order Doc. No. #450 granting leave to those parties who have not settled all matters in dispute with plaintiff, and who have not already answered or otherwise plead, to do so by April 10, 2017.) Judge Sara Lioi on 3/14/2017.(P,J)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #430 motion by defendant Verizon North for extension of time to answer. (See blanket order Doc. No. #450 granting leave to those parties who have not settled all matters in dispute with plaintiff, and who have not already answered or otherwise plead, to do so by April 10, 2017.) Judge Sara Lioi on 3/14/2017.(P,J)
March 14, 2017 Filing 451 Attorney Marilyn McConnell's Notice of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel for Defendants Ohio Power Company, AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc. and American Electric Power Company, Inc. filed by AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Ohio Power Company. Related document(s) #415 .(Grayem, Jeremy)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Order: All matters in dispute regarding plaintiff Rover Pipeline's motion for confirmation and immediate access (Doc. No. #4 ) having been resolved, and Rover having reached compensation settlements with some, but not all defendants in this case, it is hereby Ordered that: Leave granted to those parties who have not settled all matters in dispute with plaintiff, and who have not already answered or otherwise plead, to do so by April 10, 2017. Plaintiff to continue to attempt to settle remaining matters in dispute with such parties; plaintiff and those defendants who desire to do so shall submit a status report by April 14, 2017; thereafter the undersigned will hold a status/scheduling conference, as such may be needed, in light of the information in the status reports. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/14/2017. (P,J)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by attorney Marilyn McConnell for leave to file notice of withdrawal as co-counsel for defendants AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., and Ohio Power Company. (Related Doc #415 ). Attorney McConnell shall file the notice of withdrawal. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/14/2017.(P,J)
March 13, 2017 Filing 449 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff & Defendants Sprint Communications Company L.P., Level 3 Communications, LLC, and Wiltel Communications, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 13, 2017 Filing 448 Amended Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants MFC Drilling, Inc. and Jim Aslanides filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 13, 2017 Filing 447 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff & Defendant Carroll Electric Cooperative, Inc. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Order for Cash Bond: Rover is ordered to deposit a cash bond with the Clerk of Courts to secure the amount of just compensation when awarded for the easements sought by Rover on, over, across and under Landowner's tract. The amount of the cash bond to be deposited is $14,534.00. This amount represents Rover's appraised value plus an additional 30% surety. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/13/2017. (P,J)
March 13, 2017 Notice to Attorney Brian E. Chorpenning. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #368 , #366 . (G,CA)
March 13, 2017 Filing 445 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 9, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [5 pages] Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 444 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on March 9, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi and James G. Carr. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [26 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 3/20/2017. Redaction Request due 4/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2017. Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 443 Attorney Appearance by Craig R. Reynolds filed by on behalf of Robert F. Breneman, Ponderosa Consulting Services, Inc.. (Reynolds, Craig)
March 13, 2017 Filing 442 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [5 pages] Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 441 Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [6 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 3/20/2017. Redaction Request due 4/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2017. Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 440 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/06/2017 before Judge Kathleen B. Burke, Court Reporter: Heidi Geiser. Requested completion date: Ordinary filed by Dean Chance LLC. (Richard, James)
March 13, 2017 Filing 439 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [7 pages] Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 438 Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [5 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 3/20/2017. Redaction Request due 4/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2017. Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 437 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [8 pages] Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 436 SEALED Transcript of Settlement Conference held on March 8, 2017 before Judge Sara Lioi. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. [6 pages] Related document(s) #432 . (M,Ca)
March 10, 2017 Filing 435 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants MFC Drilling, Inc. and Jim Aslanides filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 10, 2017 Filing 434 Joint Proposed Stipulation filed by Jerry Moore, Inc., MGH, Inc.. (Barnes, Brent)
March 10, 2017 Filing 433 Attorney Appearance by Brent A. Barnes filed by on behalf of Jerry Moore, Inc., MGH, Inc.. (Barnes, Brent)
March 10, 2017 Filing 432 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 3/8/17 and 3/9/17 before Judge Judge Sara Lioi, Court Reporter: Carolin Mahnke. Requested completion date: 3/13/17 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 10, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On March 9, 2017, a preliminary injunction hearing was held. (Related Doc. No. #4 .) Attorneys Greg Brunton and Bruce Moore were present, representing plaintiff. Present for defendants were Attorney Bruce Horrigan, representing defendant Ohio Department of Transportation; Attorney Jeremy Grayem, representing Ohio Power Company, AEP Ohio Transmission Company, American Electric Power Company, Spelman Pipeline Holdings LLC, North East Natural Gas Corp., Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., and Huntington Trust Company; Attorney Richard Cline, representing The East Ohio Gas Company. At the commencement of the hearing, counsel for plaintiffs advised that it believed that it had reached agreement with all affected landowners regarding the issue of immediate possession and that, in some instances, final resolution as to compensation had also been reached. After adjourning the hearing to permit additional negotiations with non-landowner entity defendants impacted by plaintiff's pipeline project, plaintiff's counsel reported that it believed that all outstanding issues relative to immediate possession had been resolved as to all defendants in this matter. Plaintiff advised the Court that, by March 16, 2017, it shall confirm that it has resolved these preliminary issues as to all defendants and withdraw its motion for condemnation and immediate possession inasmuch as the issues raised in the motion would be moot. Also, by April 14, 2017, Rover shall file a spreadsheet for all defendant properties for which compensation has yet to be determined. For each remaining tract, the spreadsheet shall identify the interested landowners and corresponding docket number for defendant's answer. Once all timely answers for the remaining defendants have been filed, the Court will set a schedule for briefing on Rover's motion to appoint a commission (Doc. No. #3 ) and for the filing of periodic status reports. Rover is further instructed to use its best efforts to reach out to counsel for the remaining defendants and/or unrepresented landowners to resolve all outstanding issues of compensation. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke) (Time: 8 hours) (P,J)
March 10, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On March 8, 2017,attorneys for plaintiff and various attorneys and unrepresented landowners participated in settlement negotiations. The settlement terms respective to various landowner interests were placed on the record. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke) (Time: 15 hours) (P,J)
March 9, 2017 Filing 431 Motion for leave to Plead until 4/8/17 filed by Defendant Cardinal Gas Services, LLC. Related document #279 . (McQueen, Aaron) Modified to include time requested on 3/20/2017 (M,TL).
March 9, 2017 Filing 430 Consent Motion for extension of time until March 30, 2017 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Plaintiff filed by Defendant Verizon North, Inc.. (Haaker, Christine)
March 9, 2017 Filing 429 Proposed Order for Cash Bond filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text to match document on 3/20/2017 (M,TL).
March 9, 2017 Filing 428 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. (Tscholl, Robert)
March 9, 2017 Filing 427 Notice of Dismissal of The East Ohio Gas Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 9, 2017 Filing 426 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by E.C.O Production, LLC. (Michener, Eric)
March 9, 2017 Filing 425 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by E.C.O Production, LLC. (Michener, Eric)
March 9, 2017 Filing 424 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Martha L. Starr, Steven P. Starr. (Michener, Eric)
March 8, 2017 Filing 423 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eric Petroleum Corporation. (Hill, Thomas)
March 8, 2017 Filing 422 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Range Resources Corporation for Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC filed by Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
March 8, 2017 Filing 421 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
March 8, 2017 Filing 420 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Buckeye Oil Producing Co.. (Rose, Tara)
March 8, 2017 Filing 419 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Buckeye Oil Producing Co. (Document not text searchable.) (Rose, Tara) Modified to note document not text searchable and attorney notified on 3/17/2017 (M,TL).
March 8, 2017 Filing 418 Answer to #1 Complaint, (Including Notice of Appearance of Counsel) to Condemnation Action and Related Matters filed by AT&T Ohio. (Bettendorf, Edward) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/15/2017 (M,TL).
March 8, 2017 Filing 417 Notice of Suggestion of Death filed by Judith A. Ingram. (Moore, Randall)
March 8, 2017 Filing 416 Attorney Appearance by Jerome W. Cook filed by on behalf of Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
March 8, 2017 Filing 415 Motion for leave to file Notice of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel of Attorney Marilyn McConnell filed by AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Ohio Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel)(Grayem, Jeremy)
March 8, 2017 Filing 414 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Huntington Trust Company, N.A.. (Grayem, Jeremy)
March 8, 2017 Filing 413 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by Huntington Trust Company, N.A. (Grayem, Jeremy) Modified text to match document on 3/15/2017 (M,TL).
March 8, 2017 Filing 412 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Gas Natural, Inc. for Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC filed by Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC. (Grayem, Jeremy)
March 8, 2017 Filing 411 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Gas Natural, Inc. for Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp. filed by Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp.. (Grayem, Jeremy)
March 8, 2017 Filing 410 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by North East Natural Gas Corp., Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC. (Grayem, Jeremy) Modified text to match document on 3/15/2017 (M,TL).
March 8, 2017 Filing 409 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Ohio Power Company filed by Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy)
March 8, 2017 Filing 408 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Second Amended complaint, filed by AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy) Modified text to match document on 3/15/2017 (M,TL).
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant, Eric Petroleum Corporation. (Doc. No. #388 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Ohio Edison Company. (Doc. No. #373 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Knox Energy, Inc. (Doc. No. #362 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Allen Oil LLC. (Doc. No. #352 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Jack K. Miller. (Doc. No. #351 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Kenoil, Kenoil LLC, and Kenoil Producing LLC. (Doc. No. #350 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendants Franklin Gas & Oil Company LLC and Erie Land & Mineral Ltd. (Doc. No. #349 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Stipulation and Order of agreement between Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC. (Doc. No. #341 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Stipulation and Order of dismissal of all claims by plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC against defendant Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company without prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J) (Related Doc. Nos. #251 , #292 ) Modified text on 3/29/2017 to add document relationship (P,J).
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Stipulation and Order of agreement between plaintiff and defendant RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC. (Related Doc. No. #291 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/8/2017. (P,J)
March 8, 2017 Filing 397 Attorney Appearance by Ashley L. Oliker and Kevin Colosimo filed by on behalf of Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC. (Oliker, Ashley)
March 8, 2017 Filing 396 Attorney Appearance by Amanda J. Stacy-Hartman and David C. Barrett, Jr. filed by on behalf of Cynthia A. Farquhar, Robert E. Farquhar. (Stacy-Hartman, Amanda) Modified text on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 8, 2017 Filing 395 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC. (Michener, Eric)
March 8, 2017 Filing 394 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kindred Acres, Ltd.. (Michener, Eric)
March 8, 2017 Filing 393 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Kindred Acres, Ltd., Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC. (Michener, Eric)
March 8, 2017 Filing 392 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Mark Allen Gifford, Anita Sue Jorney-Gifford. (Lycans, Andrew) Modified to indicate case number on document is incorrect, filer notified on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Order of Dismissal of Parties: Before the Court are multiple notices of dismissal filed by plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and purporting to dismiss individual defendants under Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Doc. Nos. #272 , #284 , #298 , #299 , #300 , #301 , #302 , #303 , #304 , #306 , #307 , #308 , #309 , #310 , #312 , #313 , #314 , #340 , #342 , #348 , #365 , #367 , #374 .) Even though these defendants have yet to file answers or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, the dismissals cannot proceed under Rule 41(a), since that rule applies solely to dismissal of "actions" by "all parties who have appeared." Dismissal of individual parties properly occurs under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, which provides, in relevant part: "On motion or on its own, the court may at any time, on just terms, add or drop a party." Accordingly, the Court construes the above-referenced documents as motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 to dismiss the individual defendants identified therein without prejudice and the same is granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/7/2017. (P,J)
March 7, 2017 Filing 390 Plaintiff's Notice of FIling Timber Status Reports filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timber, #2 Exhibit No Timber)(Brunton, Gregory)
March 7, 2017 Filing 389 OmnibusReply in support of #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 7, 2017 Filing 388 Proposed Stipulation between Rover and EPC filed by Eric Petroleum Corporation. (Hill, Thomas)
March 7, 2017 Filing 387 Answer to #238 Amended complaint, #1 Complaint, #279 Amended complaint, filed by Eric Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Leases Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2-Pleasantree Lease, #3 Exhibit Exh 3-Schlabach Lease, #4 Exhibit Exh 4-Javersak Lease, #5 Exhibit Exh 5-Wefler Lease, #6 Exhibit Exh 6-Meyer Lease, #7 Exhibit Exh 7-McClaren Lease)(Hill, Thomas) Modified text for triplicate entry of event type filer notified on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 7, 2017 Filing 386 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Holmes-Wayne Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Hall, Kimberly)
March 7, 2017 Filing 385 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Donna M. Sloan, Michael J. Sloan. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 384 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Kenneth L. Richards. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 383 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Stuart N. Swinehart, Theresa Lee Swinehart. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 382 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Elizabeth Bucher, Michael Bucher. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 381 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RWM & M Development Corporation. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 380 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Prairie Lane Corporation. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 379 Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Prairie Lane Corporation, RWM & M Development Corporation. (Michener, Eric)
March 7, 2017 Filing 378 Minute Order of Mediation in Case No. 5:17-cv-239, Rover Pipeline LLC v. Barrter, et al. (J. Lioi) and Case No. 3:17-cv-225, Rover Pipeline LLC v. Rohrs, et al. (J. Carr). A number of settlements were reached during the mediation. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for filing dismissals or other appropriate documentation reflecting those settlements. See order for details. Time: 13 hours, 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/6/2017. (D,I)
March 7, 2017 Filing 377 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Erik A. Schramm, Sr. filed by Leesville Land, LLC. (Schramm, Erik) Modified text for appearing attorney on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 7, 2017 Filing 376 Motion for leave to File Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc. filed by Defendant Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
March 7, 2017 Filing 375 Attorney Appearance by David B. Harwood filed by on behalf of Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Harwood, David) Modified to indicate document not text searchable, filer notified of requirement on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 7, 2017 Filing 374 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Marathon Pipe Line LLC (sometimes incorrectly identified as Marathon Pipe Line, LLC and Marathon Pipeline, LLC), Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP (sometimes incorrectly identified as Marathon Petroleum Company, LP) and Ashland Oil, Inc., without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 7, 2017 Filing 373 Proposed Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Ohio Edison Company Without Prejudice filed by Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: In addition to the information requested by the Court in its February 28, 2017 Order (Doc. No. #316 ), Rover is instructed to identify in its updated spreadsheets any landowners who have not settled and have not received notice of the March 9, 2017 preliminary injunction hearing. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/7/2017. (P,J)
March 6, 2017 Filing 372 Notice of intent of Process by Publication Certificate filed on behalf of Rover Pipeline LLC (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 6, 2017 Filing 371 Notice from CT Corporation to Jeremy M. Greyam regarding service of process upon Great Lakes Gas Transport, LLC and Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation. (D,JJ)
March 6, 2017 Filing 370 Attorney Appearance by Wayne A. Zacour filed on behalf of Wayne Savings Community Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Open-End Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note )(Zacour, Wayne) Modified text for exhibit description and to note text not searchable, filer notified on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 6, 2017 Filing 369 Answer to #238 Amended complaint filed by Holmes-Wayne Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Hall, Kimberly)
March 6, 2017 Filing 368 Attorney Appearance for Defendant Jim Aslanides by Brian E. Chorpenning and Van R. Shirey filed by on behalf of Jim Aslanides. (Shirey, Van) Modified text for Attorney Chorpenning on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 6, 2017 Filing 367 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of The Ashland Railway, Inc., without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 6, 2017 Filing 366 Attorney Appearance for MFC Drilling, Inc. by Brian E. Chorpenning and Van R. Shirey filed by on behalf of MFC Drilling, Inc. (Shirey, Van) Modified to add Attorney Chorpenning on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 6, 2017 Filing 365 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Dominion East Ohio, Dominion Transmission, Inc., Dominion Natrium Holdings, Inc., Dominion Field Services, Inc., and Dominion Resources, Inc. aka Dominion Natrium Holdings, Inc., without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 3, 2017 Filing 364 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent NiSource, Inc. for Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company filed by Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company. (Rechner, Matthew)
March 3, 2017 Filing 363 Joint Answer to #279 Amended complaint, filed by Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule 1 - List of Parcels)(Rechner, Matthew)
March 3, 2017 Filing 362 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant Knox Energy, Inc. filed by Knox Energy Cooperative Association, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Kilgard, Celia)
March 3, 2017 Filing 361 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashland Oil, Inc.. (Jones, Stephen)
March 3, 2017 Filing 360 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashland Oil, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
March 3, 2017 Filing 359 Plaintiff''s Notice of Filing Timber Status Reports filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No Timber, #2 Exhibit Timber)(Brunton, Gregory)
March 3, 2017 Filing 358 Answer to #238 Amended complaint, #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush. (Moore, Randall) Modified text for duplicate wording on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 3, 2017 Filing 357 Attorney Appearance by Michael K. Farrell filed by on behalf of United Telephone Company of Ohio. (Farrell, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 356 FILING ERROR. Wrong document uploaded. Attorney notified. Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Tscholl and James Mathews filed by on behalf of John M. Fiocca, Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. (Tscholl, Robert) Modified text on 3/10/2017 (R,Sh).
March 3, 2017 Filing 355 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by John M. Fiocca, Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane. (Tscholl, Robert)
March 3, 2017 Filing 354 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 Amended complaint and #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Fred A. Ickert. (Moore, Randall) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/10/2017 (M,TL).
March 3, 2017 Filing 353 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint, #1 Complaint and #279 Second Amended complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Carol L. Grindstaff, Melvin R. Grindstaff. (Glazer, Richard) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/10/2017 (M,TL).
March 3, 2017 Filing 352 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant, Allen Oil LLC filed by Allen Oil LLC. (Richard, James)
March 3, 2017 Filing 351 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant, Jack K. Miller filed by Jack K. Miller. (Richard, James)
March 3, 2017 Filing 350 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants, Kenoil, Kenoil LLC and Kenoil Producing LLC filed by Kenoil, Kenoil Producing, Inc., Kenoil, LLC. (Richard, James)
March 3, 2017 Filing 349 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants, Erie Land & Mineral Ltd., LLC and Franklin Gas & Oil Company LLC filed by Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC, Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC. (Richard, James)
March 3, 2017 Filing 348 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Ohio Central Railroad, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 2, 2017 Filing 347 Response to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
March 2, 2017 Filing 346 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by John S. McClaren, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - aerial photo, #2 Exhibit B Pipeline Right-of-Way Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Tract No(s). OH-CA-HL-004.000-ROW(T), #4 Exhibit D Letter re Partial Notice to Proceed with Tree Felling)(Simon, Samuel) Modified description of attachments on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 2, 2017 Filing 345 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Eagle Realty, Ltd., Kismet Organic Farms, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-13-17 Partial Notice to Proceed, #2 Exhibit 2-24-17 Partial Notice to Proceed, #3 Exhibit 2/28/17 Pre-Construction Authorization, #4 Exhibit 11/7/13 Order Approving Abandonment, #5 Exhibit 3/29/01 Order Granting Abandonment, #6 Exhibit An Analysis of the Judicial Grant of the Quick Take Power, #7 Exhibit 12-16-16 Letter to FERC, #8 Exhibit SD Ohio Order)(Fusonie, Thomas)
March 2, 2017 Filing 344 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Carol L. Grindstaff, Melvin R. Grindstaff. (Glazer, Richard)
March 2, 2017 Filing 343 Attorney Appearance by Jeremy M. Grayem filed by on behalf of North East Natural Gas Corp., Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC. (Grayem, Jeremy)
March 2, 2017 Filing 342 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Defendant Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC filed by Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC. (Fusonie, Thomas)
March 2, 2017 Filing 341 Proposed Stipulation of Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC and Defendant Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC filed by Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC and Rover Pipeline LLC. (Fusonie, Thomas) Modified filers on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 2, 2017 Filing 340 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of O-Tex Pumping, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
March 2, 2017 Filing 339 SEALED Exhibit B to #317 Deposition of Mark Vedral filed by Dercams, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, Roger J. Maurer, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. Related document(s) #323 . (White, Thomas) Modified to add link on 3/23/2017 (S,HR).
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court resolves several motions on the docket as follows: Jones defendants' motion (Doc. No. #234 ) for leave to conduct expedited discovery was previously granted as set forth in the Court's non-document order dated February 17, 2017 and is hereby terminated as moot; Dercams defendants' motion (Doc. No. #257 ) for leave until April 7, 2017 to file an answer is granted, however, the dates set for responses and replies to plaintiff's motion for condemnation and for immediate possession (see Doc. No. #4 ) remain in effect; Jones defendants' motion (Doc. No. #231 ) for an order scheduling a status conference and denying any request for a Rule 65 hearing or preliminary injunctive relief is denied, as the Court intends to conduct its proceedings in accordance with the governing civil rules; Dercams defendants' motion (Doc. No. #265 ) to stay briefing on plaintiff's motion to appoint a commission (see Doc. No. #3 ) is granted; and Eagle Realty defendants' motion (Doc. No. #264 ) for an extension of time in which to respond to plaintiff's motion to appoint a commission is denied as moot. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2017.(P,J)
March 1, 2017 Filing 338 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 337 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 336 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint, #1 Complaint and Second #279 Amended complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC, Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC. (Richard, James) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 335 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 Amended complaint and #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey. (Moore, Randall) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 334 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 Amended complaint and #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lloyd Wayne James. (Moore, Randall) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 333 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 Amended complaint, #1 Complaint and #279 Amended complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Jack K. Miller. (Richard, James) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 332 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 Amended complaint and #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Judith A. Ingram. (Moore, Randall) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 331 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allen Oil LLC. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 330 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint, #1 Complaint and #279 Second Amended complaint, with Jury Demand, filed by Allen Oil LLC. (Richard, James) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 329 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kenoil Producing, Inc.. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 328 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kenoil, LLC. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 327 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kenoil. (Richard, James)
March 1, 2017 Filing 326 Answer to Plaintiff's #238 First Amended complaint, #1 Complaint and #279 Second Amended complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kenoil, Kenoil Producing, Inc., Kenoil, LLC. (Richard, James) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 3/9/2017 (M,TL).
March 1, 2017 Filing 325 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Consol Energy Inc. for CNX Gas Company, LLC filed by CNX Gas Company, LLC. (Hogan, Christopher)
March 1, 2017 Filing 324 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Consol Energy, Inc.. (Hogan, Christopher)
March 1, 2017 Filing 323 Marginal Entry Order granting #321 motion by defendants Gary and Catherine Habrun, Michael and Patsy Schmucki, Gregory and Dianne Sautter, Dercams LLC and Roger Maurer, Greg McNaull Real Estate LLC, Greg McNaull, Jim McNaull, and McNaull Real Estate LLC permitting them to file Exhibit B to the Deposition of Mark James Vedral under seal. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2017.(P,J)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff is directed to make a good faith effort to provide notice of the March 6, 2017 mediation conference to all affected landowners who are not represented by counsel of record. If a landowner is represented by counsel who is not counsel of record in this case, then notice may be provided to the landowner through the landowner's counsel. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2017. (P,J)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Catherine S. Loeffler for defendants Sharon R. McClaren and John S. McClaren, Jr. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #282 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2017.(P,J)
February 28, 2017 Notice to Attorney Marilyn McConnell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #269 . (G,CA)
February 28, 2017 Filing 322 Attorney Appearance by Randall J. Moore , David Wigham and Timothy Pettorini filed on behalf of Judith A. Ingram. (Document not text searchable.) (Moore, Randall) Modified to note document not text searchable and attorney notified on 3/7/2017 (M,TL).
February 28, 2017 Filing 321 Motion to seal document filed by Dercams, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, Roger J. Maurer, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas)
February 28, 2017 Filing 320 IMPORTANT: Notice of mediation conference to be held on 3/6/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Please report directly to the courtroom. (D,I)
February 28, 2017 Filing 319 Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Hogan filed by on behalf of CNX Gas Company, LLC, Consol Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Relevant Tracts of Land)(Hogan, Christopher)
February 28, 2017 Filing 318 Notice of Filing Exhibits A, C, D, E, F, G, H, I, and J to #317 Deposition Transcript of Mark Vedral filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, Roger J. Maurer, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Mark Vedral, #2 Exhibit C- Correspondence, #3 Exhibit D- ROW Cost Estimate Kindler Properties, #4 Exhibit E - ROW Cost Estimate Lang Properties, #5 Exhibit F - Email from Matt Strayer to Gregory Brunton, #6 Exhibit G - Email from Gregory Brunton to Micheal Braunstein, #7 Exhibit H - Email from Carl Duke re Drain Tile Matters, #8 Exhibit I - Advertisement, #9 Exhibit J - Correspondence from Rover)(White, Thomas) Modified to remove duplicate wording and add link on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 28, 2017 Filing 317 Notice of filing Deposition Transcript of Mark Vedral filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (Attachments: #1 Mark Vedral Deposition transcript)(White, Thomas)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order: In anticipation of a court ordered mediation as set forth in this Order, plaintiff Rover Pipeline, LLC, is directed to file, by March 3, 2017, two spreadsheets for all defendant properties for which there is not an agreement (see Order for details regarding the spreadsheets.) For all properties for which plaintiff has entered into an agreement and for which no further court action is necessary, plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal. As to all parties that have not settled, the Court refers this matter to mediation before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on March 6, 2017 in Akron, Ohio. Rover, and all parties that have not entered into a settlement agreement with Rover, through a person with full settlement authority to enter into settlement agreements, must report to the Akron Courthouse by 8:30 AM on March 6, 2017. A party represented by counsel in attendance need not appear, provided that counsel has full settlement authority. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/27/2017. (S,He)
February 27, 2017 Filing 315 Answer to Plaintiff's #279 Amended complaint filed by Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Wherley, James) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 27, 2017 Filing 314 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Norman Miller and Rosalyn Miller, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 313 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Max M. Acker and Deborah L. Acker, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 312 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Lori P. Troyer and Raymond L. Troyer, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 311 FILING ERROR. (Per filer, to be refiled attached to transcript). Notice of Filing Exhibits A, C, D, E, F, G, H, I and J to Deposition transcript of Mark Vedral filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas) Marked filing error and regenerated NEF (S,HR).
February 27, 2017 Filing 310 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of John F. Brainerd and Mildred F. Brainerd, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 309 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of David E. Acker and Christene L. Acker, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 308 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Carol A. Stroh, Trustee of the Carol A. Stroh Trust dated April 8, 2015, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 307 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Alvin D. and Mary E. Yoder, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 306 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Ted E. Acker, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 305 FILING ERROR. (Per filer, document to be refiled with exhibits). Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Mark Vedral filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, Roger J. Maurer, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas) Marked filing error and regenerated NEF (S,HR).
February 27, 2017 Filing 304 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc., without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 303 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Patrick R. Soos and Cynthia K. Soos, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 302 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Wayne Fennimore and Caroline K. Fennimore, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 301 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Carole M. Scheetz, Trustee of the Carole M. Scheetz Revocable Trust dated October 21, 2008, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 300 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Bryan Bodager, Duane Bodager and Ronnie Bodager, Co-Trustees of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 299 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Brownlee Land Ventures, LP, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 27, 2017 Filing 298 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Belden & Blake, LLC, CGas Exploration, Inc., CGas Properties, LP, CHK Utica, LLC, Capital C Energy Operations, LP, Chesapeake AEC Acquisition, LLC, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Enervest Acquisitions, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-A, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-WI, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-A, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-WI, LP, Enervest Ltd., Enervest Operating, LLC, Total E&P USA, Inc.. (Fusonie, Thomas)
February 27, 2017 Filing 297 Attorney Appearance by James M. Richard filed by on behalf of Kenoil, Kenoil Producing, Inc., Kenoil, LLC. (Richard, James)
February 27, 2017 Filing 296 Attorney Appearance by James M. Richard filed by on behalf of Allen Oil LLC. (Richard, James)
February 27, 2017 Filing 295 Attorney Appearance by James M. Richard filed by on behalf of Jack K. Miller. (Richard, James)
February 27, 2017 Filing 294 Attorney Appearance by James M. Richard filed by on behalf of Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC, Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC. (Richard, James)
February 27, 2017 Filing 293 Opposition to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation filed by Dean Chance LLC. (Richard, James) Modified text to match document and correct link on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On February 24, 2017, the Court held a hearing on plaintiff Rover's Motion for an order of condemnation and temporary restraining order granting immediate possession. (Doc. No. #4 .) Attorneys Greg Brunton, Tom Zabel, and Bruce Moore attended on behalf of plaintiff, Attorneys Thomas Fusonie, Scott Zurakowski, Greg Watts, Stephen Funk, Randall Moore, Craig Wilson, Matt Kearney, Patrick Krebs, Vamej Richard, Catherine Loeffler, Jim Coherky, Joshua O'Farrell, Jeremy Grayem, Richard Glanon, Teresa Pamrenger, Richard Cline, Michael Braunstein, and Matthew Strayer also attended, representing various defendants as set forth on the docket. Numerous landowners were also in attendance. The Court heard oral argument on Rover's motion, and counsel and the parties also engaged in settlement negotiations. At the conclusion of the hearing, the Court took Rover's motion under advisement. The Court shall permit briefing on Rover's motion, including whether condemnation is permissible at this stage of the proceedings and under what rule of procedure, and the appropriate bond amount, as follows: all parties who have not yet filed an opposition to Rover's motion may file an opposition brief, not to exceed 15 pages, by March 2, 2017. Parties who have already filed an opposition may file a supplement, not to exceed 7 pages, by March 2, 2017. Rover shall have leave until March 7, 2017 to file a single reply, not to exceed 20 pages. As set forth on the record, the protective order in effect in the related case in the Southern District of Ohio (Case No. 2:17-cv-105) shall govern this case. If any party intends to offer evidence as to confidential settlement agreements with other gas companies must seek leave of court well in advance of the March 9, 2017 preliminary injunction hearing. The Court will issue a briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to appoint a commission (Doc. No. #3 ) at a later date. (Court Reporter: Lori Callahan.) Time: 4 hours, 15 minutes. (S,He)
February 24, 2017 Filing 292 Stipulated Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims against Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified to remove all caps on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 291 Proposed Stipulation filed by RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC. (Vaughan, Nathan)
February 24, 2017 Filing 290 Attorney Appearance by Randall J. Moore , David Wigham and Timothy Pettorini filed on behalf of Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Lloyd Wayne James. (Moore, Randall)
February 24, 2017 Filing 289 Amended Attorney Appearance by Patrick J. Krebs filed by on behalf of Western Reserve Land Conservancy. (Krebs, Patrick)
February 24, 2017 Filing 288 Attorney Appearance Limited Entry by Thomas L. Scanlon and John A. Murphy, Jr. filed on behalf of R.J. Corman Railroad Company/Cleveland Line. (Scanlon, Thomas) Modified to add additional attorney on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 287 Attorney Appearance by Michael Braunstein filed by on behalf of Sandra K. Snyder. (Braunstein, Michael)
February 24, 2017 Filing 286 Motion to strike Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation or Motion for Alternate Relief filed by Sharon R. McClaren, John S. McClaren, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2/22/2017 email, #2 Exhibit 2/23/2017 email, #3 Exhibit Photo, #4 Proposed Order)(Simon, Samuel). Modified to add second motion on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 285 Attorney Appearance by Michael Braunstein, Clinton P. Stahler and Matthew L. Strayer filed on behalf of A. & B. Metzger Family Farms, LLC, Anita L. Ackerman, Roger J. Ackerman, Larry J. Adam, Marie R. Adam, Dawson G. Alsdorf, Judy J. Alsdorf, Brian J. Alt, Keith A. Alt, Cynthia H. Arnholt, Earl F. Arnholt, Jacob R. Ash, Shelly M. Ash, Wayne Ralph Bartter, Christopher L. Beebe, Leona M. Berger, Rudolph J. Berger, Lawrence H. Biglin, Elizabeth A. Bowers, Wayne Bright, Kenneth R. Burger, Glenn A. Burky, Iva C. Burky, Naomi A. Burky, Burrier Farm, LLC, Gary R. Caldwell, Janet L. Clabaugh, Thomas L. Clabaugh, Jerry D. Cline, Linda K. Cline, Andrew E. Coblentz, Christina Coblentz, Dorthy H. Copeland, Harry D. Copeland, Margo J. Craft, Daniel L. Detwiler, Linda L. Detwiler, Karen L. Dohner, Keith S. Dohner, John Ryan Dutton, Jr, Laura M. Dutton, Jon C. Foley, Marlene J. Ford, Karla S. Fulk, Max D. Fulk, Nancy Garcia, Edison T. Gartrell, Tanya S. Gartrell, Timothy M. Gartrell, William D. Gartrell, Joan A. Gerber, Nevin D. Gerber, Karen A. Goebel, Patrick C. Goebel, Ralph L. Graybill, III, Georgia M. Gregory, Wayne R. Gregory, Barbara J. Harer, Dwight Charles Harer, Edward L. Harer, Florence Marie Harer, Cynthia M. Harrer, Stephen R. Harrer, Hill Haven Farms, LLC, Barbara E. Hostetler, Eli Y. Hostetler, Roman E. Hostetler, Glenn M. James, Nellie L. James, John C. Foley Living Trust Agreement u/d/t March 10, 2015, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., Jason F. Kalb, Angela M. Kamenik, John C. Kamenik, Kamenik Real Estate, LLC, Nancy Kanney, Paul J. Kanney, Ruth A. Kaplan, Kathleen A. Kark, Kenneth L. Kark, Reuben A. Keim, Ruth P. Keim, Gerald L. Kendle, Jodi Kendle, Mary Ann Kendle, Gerald Kendle, Jr., David K. Kennedy, James Donald Kleinhenz, Wilma Faye Kleinhenz, Samuel J. Kraft, Terrence O. Lahr, Noreen S. Leavers, Connie L. Lee, Kevin C. Lee, B. Nadine Leggett, Michael F. Leuthold, Ruth Mae Linder, Keith R. Loy, Pamela E. Loy, LaVon I. Luidhardt, MMJ Farms, LLC, Aden E. Mast, Doral P. McCartney, Wanda D. McCartney, Richard M. McCarty, Mark Metzger, Stephanie Metzger, John C. Meyer, Sharon L. Meyer, Andrea I. Michelson, Allen F. Miller, Karen S. Miller, Roman E. Miller, Rosalyn Miller, Sherry L. Miller, Carl D. Miller, III, Lynn Morrison, Monty Morrison, Richard S. Morrison, Richard T. Morrison, Murphy Boys, LLC, Niese Brothers Farms, Niese Family Farms, LTD., Kenneth R. Orr, Linda L. Orr, Lynn E. Orr, Clayton E. Over, Lisa C. Over, Maricia Phillips Parkinson, Ray L. Pfahler, Donald L. Phenicie, E. Jane Phenicie, Jane Phenicie, Charles J. Phillips, Charles C. Phillips, David E. Phillips, Pleasantree Acres, Ltd., Donald A. Pontones, Kathryn S. Pontones, RRC Investment Group, LLC, Cathy Jean Rennie, Paul Leslie Rennie, Sr., Robert and Lillian Niese Farms, LTD., Rolling Ridge Angus Farms, LTD., Janet B. Romer, Richard A. Romer, Helen M. Rossman, W. Dexter Rossman, Carole M. Scheetz, Joe A. Schimpf, John D. Schimpf, Joyce E. Schimpf, Wanda L. Schimpf, Clark B. Scott, Gregory Shetler, Roger Phillip Smailes, Joseph W. Smith, Joyce A. Smith, Matthew P. Smith, Tammy S. Smith, Cynthia K. Soos, Patrick R. Soos, Keith A. Speelman, Roger W. Spellman, Ronald J. Spellman, James R. Springer, Gerald T. Stacklin, Jeffrey A. Stacklin, Lyndsey A. Stacklin, Rebecca M. Stacklin, Craig W. Strasser, Doris E. Studer, Kenneth E. Studer, Phillip G. Studer, Paul Tackett, Danny R. Thompson, Sharon E. Thompson, Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc., Gregory Tieche, Peggy Tieche, Danny S. Tomecko, DeAnna M. Tomecko, Lori P. Troyer, Raymond L. Troyer, Robert K. Waines, Jr., Patrick G. Weaver, Renee L. Weaver, Cathy M. Weisenauer, James A. Weisenauer, Frannie D. Wengerd, Melvin D. Wengerd, James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe, Aden D. Yoder, Martha M. Yoder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G&B Client List)(Braunstein, Michael) Modified to add additional attorneys on 3/3/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 284 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims against R.J. Corman Railroad/Cleveland Line, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified to remove all caps on 3/2/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 283 Attorney Appearance by Patrick J. Krebs and William A. Doyle filed on behalf of Western Reserve Land Conservancy. (Krebs, Patrick) Modified to add additional attorney on 3/2/2017 (M,TL).
February 24, 2017 Filing 282 Motion for attorney Catherine S. Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8040403, filed by Sharon R. McClaren, John S. McClaren, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Samuel) Modified exhibit text on 2/24/2017 (G,CA).
February 23, 2017 Filing 281 Joint Proposed Stipulation filed by Belden & Blake, LLC, CGas Exploration, Inc., CGas Properties, LP, CHK Utica, LLC, Capital C Energy Operations, LP, Chesapeake AEC Acquisition, LLC, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Enervest Acquisitions, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-A, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-WI, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-A, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-WI, LP, Enervest Ltd., Enervest Operating, LLC, Total E&P USA, Inc.. (Fusonie, Thomas)
February 23, 2017 Filing 280 Attorney Appearance by Richard H. Glazer and Teresa M. Bamberger filed by on behalf of Carol L. Grindstaff, Melvin R. Grindstaff. (Glazer, Richard)
February 23, 2017 Filing 279 Second Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) The Ohio Department of Transportation, et al.. Filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Commencement, #2 Exhibit B FERC Certificate, #3 Exhibit C Route Map, #4 Exhibit D FEIS) (Brunton, Gregory)
February 23, 2017 Filing 278 Opposition to #248 Motion to strike Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought Motion to stay all briefing and decisions pending the filing of an answer and discovery filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 23, 2017 Filing 277 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possesion of the Easements Sought filed by Dean Chance LLC. (Richard, James)
February 23, 2017 Filing 276 Attorney Appearance by Stephen D. Jones filed on behalf of Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Marathon Pipe Line, LLC. (Jones, Stephen - s/Jeremy S. Young) Modified to note signing attorney on 3/2/2017 (M,TL).
February 23, 2017 Filing 275 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent FirstEnergy Corp. for Ohio Edison Company filed by Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen)
February 23, 2017 Filing 274 Attorney Appearance by Stephen W. Funk and Leighann K. Finnk filed on behalf of Ohio Edison Company. (Funk, Stephen) Modified to add attorney on 3/2/2017 (M,TL).
February 22, 2017 Filing 273 Attorney Appearance by Jeremy S. Young filed by on behalf of Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Marathon Pipe Line, LLC. (Young, Jeremy)
February 22, 2017 Filing 272 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims against R.J. Corman Railroad Company/Cleveland Line, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified to remove all caps on 2/28/2017 (M,TL).
February 22, 2017 Filing 271 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC. (Vaughan, Nathan)
February 22, 2017 Filing 270 Attorney Appearance by Nathan D. Vaughan filed by on behalf of RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC. (Vaughan, Nathan)
February 22, 2017 Filing 269 Attorney Appearance by Jeremy M. Grayem & Marilyn McConnell filed by on behalf of AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy) Modified to add Marilyn McConnell on 2/28/2017 (G,CA).
February 21, 2017 Filing 268 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possesion of the Easements Sought filed by Tate Farms Company, Ltd.. (Zurakowski, Scott)
February 21, 2017 Filing 267 Opposition to #3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Tate Farms Company, Ltd.. (Zurakowski, Scott)
February 21, 2017 Filing 266 Opposition to #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas) Modified to remove motion language per filer on 2/27/2017 (M,TL).
February 21, 2017 Filing 265 Motion to stay Briefing on Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas) Modified text to add link on 2/27/2017 (M,TL).
February 21, 2017 Filing 264 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 3/13/2017 to file response to Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Eagle Realty, Ltd., Kismet Organic Farms, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Fusonie, Thomas) Modified text to match document on 2/27/2017 (M,TL).
February 20, 2017 Filing 263 Attorney Appearance by Whitney L. Willits filed on behalf of Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Willits, Whitney) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 20, 2017 Filing 262 Answer to #1 Complaint and Answer to #238 Amended complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Dean Chance LLC. (Document not text searchable.) (Richard, James) Modified text to match document on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 19, 2017 Filing 261 Notice of Filing Exhibits 63-72 to their Memorandum Contra to Plaintiff's #4 Motion For Order Confirming Condemnation Authority And Awarding Immediate Possession Of The Easements filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 63 - Duff & Phelps Appraisal - RJ Carpenter, #2 Exhibit 64 - IRR Appraisal - McCartney, #3 Exhibit 65 - Article - Moodys changes ET's outlook to negative, #4 Exhibit 66 - Article - Moody's Rating Symbols & Definitions, #5 Exhibit 67 - ETP Dividend Yield Chart, #6 Exhibit 68 - Vannatta Appraisal - Kamenik, #7 Exhibit 69 - Vannatta Appraisal - Schultz, #8 Exhibit 70 - Vannatta Appraisal - Shetler, #9 Exhibit 71 - Weiler Appraisal - McCartney, #10 Exhibit 72 - Weiler Appraisal - Double M Tree Farms)Related document(s) #258 .(Braunstein, Michael) Modified to add link on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 19, 2017 Filing 260 Notice of Filing Exhibits 59-62 to their Memorandum Contra to Plaintiff's #4 Motion For Order Confirming Condemnation Authority And Awarding Immediate Possession Of The Easements filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 59 - letter from Kurt Kielisch, #2 Exhibit 60 - Guardian Pipeline Study, #3 Exhibit 61 - IRR Appraisal - Shetler, #4 Exhibit 62 - IRR Appraisal - Arnholt)Related document(s) #258 .(Braunstein, Michael) Modified to add link on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 19, 2017 Filing 259 Notice of Filing Exhibits 26-58 to their Memo Contra to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - Statement - Kamenik, #2 Exhibit 27 - Statement - Goshe, #3 Exhibit 28 - Letter from Mahmoud to landowners, #4 Exhibit 29 - Letter from Roberts to landowners, #5 Exhibit 30 - Letter from Roberts to landowners re commencement of construction on Feb 13, 2017, #6 Exhibit 31 - Affidavit - Scott, #7 Exhibit 32 - Affidavit - Klingel, #8 Exhibit 33 - Affidavit - Kraft, #9 Exhibit 34 - Affidavit - Frisch, #10 Exhibit 35 - Comment - Draper, #11 Exhibit 36 - Comment - Mauer, #12 Exhibit 37 - Statement - Lahr, #13 Exhibit 38 - Statement - Wilson, #14 Exhibit 39 - Statement - Kanney, #15 Exhibit 40 - Comment - Polasck, #16 Exhibit 41 - Comment - Sautter, #17 Exhibit 42 - Letter from Rover to Kendle, #18 Exhibit 43 - Email from Carl Duke to G&B, #19 Exhibit 44 - Email from Brunton to G&B, #20 Exhibit 45 - Comment - Harer, #21 Exhibit 46 - G&B's Objection to Rover's Request for Immediate Action, #22 Exhibit 47 - Comment - Pullins, #23 Exhibit 48 - Appraisal Review of Real Property, #24 Exhibit 49 - Letter from Roberts to Lause, #25 Exhibit 50 - Table of Landowner offers from Rover, #26 Exhibit 51 - Letter from Brunton to K-SLP, #27 Exhibit 52 - Letter from Roberts to K-SLP, #28 Exhibit 53 - Email from Vedral to Craig Wilson, #29 Exhibit 54 - Statement - Hennessey, #30 Exhibit 55 - Email from Braunstein to Brunton, #31 Exhibit 56 - Emens & Wolper Ex B, #32 Exhibit 57 - Rover Budget, #33 Exhibit 58 - Public Comment - Vannatta)Related document(s) #258 .(Braunstein, Michael) Modified to add link on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 19, 2017 Filing 258 Response (Memorandum Contra) to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Rich McGuire, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from USFWS, #3 Exhibit 3 - Marbley Order Denying TRO, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rover Precedent Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Mahmoud to FERC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Mahmoud to Chairman Bay, #7 Exhibit 7 - Weiler Appraisal - RJ Carpenter, #8 Exhibit 8 - Comment - Weinberg, #9 Exhibit 9 - Comment - Forni, #10 Exhibit 10 - Statement - Alsdorf, #11 Exhibit 11 - Statement - Shetler, #12 Exhibit 12 - Affidavit - Daniel, #13 Exhibit 13 - Statement - Kendle, #14 Exhibit 14 - Statement - Gobrogge, #15 Exhibit 15 - Statement - Bedford, #16 Exhibit 16 - Statement - Orr, #17 Exhibit 17 - Statement - Henry County, #18 Exhibit 18 - Statement - Clabaugh, #19 Exhibit 19 - Statement - Rickenberg, #20 Exhibit 20 - DAPL Complaint, #21 Exhibit 21 - Affidavit - Weaver, #22 Exhibit 22 - Statement - Kaldor, #23 Exhibit 23 - Statement - Scatterday, #24 Exhibit 24 - Affidavit - Hill, #25 Exhibit 25 - Statement - Forni)(Braunstein, Michael) Modified text to match document on 2/24/2017 (M,TL).
February 17, 2017 Filing 257 First Motion for extension of time until April 7, 2017 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas)
February 17, 2017 Filing 256 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McNaull Real Estate, LLC. (White, Thomas)
February 17, 2017 Filing 255 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dercams, LLC. (White, Thomas)
February 17, 2017 Filing 254 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC. (White, Thomas) Modified filer on 2/17/2017 (M,TL).
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants have filed motions seeking expedited discovery. (See Doc. Nos. #234 , #248 .) In anticipation of the February 24, 2017 hearing on plaintiff's motion for condemnation and immediate possession (Doc. No. #4 ), the Court instructs counsel to meet and confer to determine what expedited and narrowly tailored discovery would be useful and necessary to enable all parties to adequately address plaintiff's motion and to set a schedule for the completion of such discovery before the hearing. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/17/2017. (P,J)
February 17, 2017 Filing 253 Attorney Appearance by Robert B. Preston, III filed on behalf of Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Preston, Robert) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 2/23/2017 (M,TL).
February 17, 2017 Filing 252 Attorney Appearance by James M. Wherley, Jr filed on behalf of Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Wherley, James) Modified text to remove duplicate wording on 2/23/2017 (M,TL).
February 17, 2017 Filing 251 Stipulated Dismissal of all claims against Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company, without prejudice filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/17/2017 (P,G).
February 15, 2017 Filing 250 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kismet Organic Farms, LTD. (Fusonie, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 Filing 249 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eagle Realty, Ltd.. (Fusonie, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 Filing 248 Motion to strike Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay all Briefing and Decisions Pending the Filing of an Answer and Discovery filed by Eagle Realty, Ltd., Kismet Organic Farms, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wilson Order)(Fusonie, Thomas). Modified to add second part of motion and attorney notified on 2/22/2017 (M,TL).
February 15, 2017 Filing 247 Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Landes filed on behalf of Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Landes, Mark)
February 15, 2017 Filing 246 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dean Chance LLC. (Richard, James) Modified text to match document on 2/22/2017 (M,TL).
February 15, 2017 Filing 245 Attorney Appearance by James M. Richard filed on behalf of Dean Chance LLC. (Document not text-searchable.) (Richard, James) Modified to note document not text searchable and attorney notified on 2/22/2017 (M,TL).
February 15, 2017 Filing 244 Notice of Two Hearings: 1) A hearing for a Temporary Restraining Order relating to Rover Pipeline's Motion for Order confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought (Doc. No. #4 ) at 1:30 PM on February 24, 2017; 2) A hearing for a Preliminary Injunction relating to Rover Pipeline's Motion for Order confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought (Doc. No. #4 ) at 9:00 AM on March 9, 2017. Both hearings will be held before the Honorable Sara Lioi, United States District Judge in Courtroom 530, United States District Court, 2 South Main Street, Akron, Ohio, 44308. Plaintiff must serve notice of the hearings on all defendants or their counsel on or before February 22, 2017. (P,J)
February 15, 2017 Filing 243 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Snow, Randolph)
February 15, 2017 Filing 242 Attorney Appearance of Randolph L. Snow, James M. Wherley, Jr. and Robert B. Preston, III on behalf of Barkheimer Realty LTD. (Snow, Randolph) Modified to add attorney names on 2/22/2017 (M,TL).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion by defendants Dixie A. Jones and William L. Jones for leave to file in excess of page limits a memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for order confirming condemnation authority and awarding immediate possession of the easements sought. (Related Doc #233 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/15/2017.(P,J)
February 14, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On February 14, 2017, the Court conducted an informal telephonic status conference with counsel who have entered an appearance in this case for the purpose of discussing defendants' motion to exceed page limitations. (Doc. No. #233 .) Attorney Greg Brunton participated on behalf of plaintiff, and Attorneys Michael Braunstein, Clinton Stahler, and Matthew Strayer participated on behalf of Joneses defendants. After discussing the matter with counsel, the Court advised that it would grant the motion to exceed the page limitations. The Court also cautioned all counsel that it expects attorneys participating in this matter to conduct themselves in a professional manner. (Court Reporter: None.) (Time: 40 minutes.) (P,J)
February 14, 2017 Filing 241 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tate Farms Company, Ltd.. (Zurakowski, Scott)
February 14, 2017 Filing 240 Attorney Appearance by Scott M. Zurakowski, William G. Williams, Gregory W. Watts and Matthew W. Onest filed on behalf of Tate Farms Company, Ltd. (Zurakowski, Scott) Modified to add additional attorneys on 2/21/2017 (M,TL).
February 14, 2017 Filing 239 Attorney Appearance by Thomas L. Scanlon , John A. Murphy, Jr., and the law firm of Day Ketterer Ltd. filed by on behalf of Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company. (Scanlon, Thomas)
February 10, 2017 Filing 238 First Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Kathy A. Wolfe and parties listed in 2 notices filed 2/10/17. Filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (P, S).
February 10, 2017 Party A. & B. Metzger Family Farms, LLC, Brian J. Alt, Keith A. Alt, Nancy A. Alt, Lawrence H. Biglin, Trustee of The Lawrence H. Biglin and Mary Alice Biglin Revocable Living Trust dated July 27, 1993, CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Don D. Crum, Energex Corp., Energex Corporation, Level 3 Communications, LLC and Wiltel Communications, LLC added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 10, 2017 Party Janet L. Clabaugh, Thomas L. Clabaugh, Sue L. Donahue, John N. Foley, Jon C. Foley, Patricia A. Foley, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, John C. Foley Living Trust Agreement u/d/t March 10, 2015, Julius H. Clabaugh 'B' Trust FBO Bertha Clabaugh, Kindred Acres, Ltd., Beverly Kruso, Joseph M. Kruso, Mechanics Bank, Mark Metzger, Stephanie Metzger, Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, John A. Shoup, Linda Shoup, Sprint Communications Company LP, Connie Jo Swogger, The Julius H. Clabaugh and Bertha I. Clabaugh Revocable, Inter-Vivos Trust Agreement dated 7/2/96, Danny R. Thompson, Sharon E. Thompson, Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc., James R. Wolfe and Kathy A. Wolfe added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 10, 2017 Filing 237 Attorney Appearance by Thomas A. Zabel filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zabel, Thomas)
February 10, 2017 Filing 236 Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. White, Matthew Kearney, J. Richard Emens and Craig Wilson on behalf of Dercams, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Catherine E. Habrun, Gary L. Habrun, Roger J. Maurer, McNaull Real Estate, LLC, Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki. (White, Thomas) Modified to add additional attorneys on 2/10/2017 (M,TL).
February 9, 2017 Filing 235 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/9/2017. (P,J)
February 9, 2017 Filing 234 Motion for leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 FILING ERROR - WRONG CASE. Exhibit A - proposed discovery requests, #2 Proposed Order to Defendants' Motion to Expedite Discovery)(Braunstein, Michael) Modified text on 2/15/2017 (D,JJ).
February 9, 2017 Filing 233 Motion for leave to File a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought That Exceeds the Page Limits Set forth in Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to D's Motion to Exceed Pages)(Braunstein, Michael) Link added on 2/15/2017 (D,JJ).
February 9, 2017 Filing 232 Redacted Exhibit B to Defendants' Motion for an Order Scheduling a Status Conference filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - letter from USFWS Asst. Regional Director to FERC)Related document(s) #231 .(Braunstein, Michael)
February 9, 2017 Filing 231 Motion for an Order Scheduling a Status Conference and Motion for the Court to Refrain from Signing any Order Requested by Rover and from Scheduling any Hearings in this Matter Until All Defendants Have been Served Under Rules 4 and 71.1 filed by Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - excerpt from FERC Order Issuing Certificates, #2 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT SEALED - SEE #232 Exhibit B - Letter from USFWS to FERC, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint in Olin v. Dakota Access, #4 Proposed Order for D's Motion for a Status Conference)(Braunstein, Michael) Modified to note filing error of attachment and added additional motion part on 2/10/2017 (M,TL).
February 9, 2017 Filing 230 Attorney Appearance by Michael Braunstein filed by on behalf of Dixie A. Jones, William L. Jones. (Braunstein, Michael)
February 8, 2017 Filing 229 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-099.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Melvin R. Grindstaff and Carol L. Grindstaff filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 228 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-094.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Dean Chance, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 227 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-087.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Mark Allen Gifford and Anita Sue Jorney-Gifford filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 226 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-081.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Max M. Acker and Deborah L. Acker filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 225 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-078.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): David E. Acker filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 224 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-077.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Tate Farms Company, Ltd. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 223 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-074.530 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Patrick C. & Karen A. Goebel filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 222 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-073.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): David E. Acker and Christene L. Acker filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 221 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-068.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Steven P. Starr and Martha L. Starr filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 220 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.538 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roger Dush and Rita Bauer Dush filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 219 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.536 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roger J. Maurer and Dercams, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 218 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.530 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): RRC Investment Group, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 217 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.528 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roger Phillip Smailes, Trustee of the Roger Phillip Smailes Revocable Trust, dated 01/10/2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 216 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.526-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): The Prairie Lane Corporation filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 215 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.526 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): The Prairie Lane Corporation filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 214 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.523-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): RWM&M Development Corporation filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 213 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.523 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): RWM&M Development Corporation filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 212 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.522 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Clayton E. Over and Lisa C. Over filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 211 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.518 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Andrew E. Coblentz and Christina Coblentz filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 210 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.516 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Dawson G. Alsdorf and Judy J. Alsdorf filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 209 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action at to Tract OH-WA-052.514 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Ruth A. Kaplan filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 208 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.512 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gregory and Peggy Tieche filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 207 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action at to Tract OH-WA-052.511 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Lloyd Wayne James filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 206 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.510 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gregory L. Sautter and Dianne L. Sautter filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 205 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action at to Tract OH-WA-052.502 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Glenn M. James and Nellie L. James filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 204 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-052.500 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Keith A. Speelman filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 203 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-049.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Lynn E. Orr and Linda L. Orr filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 202 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-047.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Aden D. Yoder and Martha M. Yoder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 201 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-045.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Aden E. Mast, Aden D. Yoder and Martha M. Yoder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 200 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-041.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roman E. Hostetler and Barbara E. Hostetler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 199 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-040.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Lynn E. Orr filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 198 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-039.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Norman Miller and Rosalyn Miller filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 197 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-038.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): David J. Yoder and Mattie Yoder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 196 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-037.000-SSE with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Stuart N. Swinehart and Theresa Lee Swinehart filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 195 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-037.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Stuart N. Swinehart and Theresa Lee Swinehart filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 194 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-037.000-PAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Stuart N. Swinehart and Theresa Lee Swinehart filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 193 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-027.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Steven M. Yoder & Bena M. Yoder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 192 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-018.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Lori P. Troyer & Raymond L. Troyer filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 191 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-016.530 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Reuben A. Keim and Ruth P. Keim filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 190 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-016.510 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Melvin D. Wengerd and Fannie D. Wengerd filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 189 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-015.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kenneth L. Richards, Trustee of the A. Berdene Richards Irrevocable Trust, dated April 26, 2011 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 188 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-WA-001.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Carol A. Stroh, Trustee of the Carol A. Stroh Trust dated April 8, 2015 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 187 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-039.540 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Eagle Realty, Ltd. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 186 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-037.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kevin C. Lee and Connie L. Lee filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 185 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-034.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Ruth Mae Linder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 184 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-033.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 183 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-033.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kevin C. Lee and Connie L. Lee filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 182 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-030.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kevin C. Lee and Connie L. Lee filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 181 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-029.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): David K. Kennedy filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 180 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-028.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Paul L. and Cathy J. Rennie filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 179 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-027.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Donald A. Pontones and Kathryn S. Pontones, Co-Trustees of the Donald A. and Kathryn S. Pontones Revocable Living Trust, dated July 1, 2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 178 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-026.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Nevin D. Gerber and Noreen S. Leavers filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 177 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-025.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Barkheimer Realty, Ltd. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 176 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-019.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Richard M. McCarty and Randy K. McCarty filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 175 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-018.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Richard M. McCarty filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 174 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-017.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Richard M. McCarty and Randy K. McCarty filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 173 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-015.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Charles C. Phillips, Trustee of the Charles C. Phillips Living Trust dated December 20, 2012, Charles J. Phillips, Marcia Phillips Parkinson, and David E Phillips filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 172 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-014.000-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gerald L. Kendle and Mary Ann Kendle filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 171 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-014.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gerald L. Kendle and Mary Ann Kendle filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 170 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-013.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gerald Kendle, Jr. and Jodi Kendle filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 169 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-012.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Glenn A. Burky, Jr. and Naomi A. Burky filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 168 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-010.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Matthew P. Smith, Tammy S. Smith, Richard A. Romer, Janet B. Romer, Wayne R. Gregory, and Georgia M. Gregory filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 167 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-009.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Paul Tackett, Trustee of the Paul Tackett Trust filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 166 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-008.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Matthew P. Smith, Tammy S. Smith, Richard A. Romer, Janet B. Romer, Wayne R. Gregory and Georgia M. Gregory filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 165 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-007.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John Ryan Dutton, Jr. Trustee, or any successor trustee, of the John R. Dutton and Laura M. Dutton Family Irrevocable Trust dated September 9, 2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 164 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-006.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Laura M. Dutton, Co-Trustees, or any successor Trustee, of the John R. Dutton and Laura M. Dutton Revocable Trust dated September 9, 2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 163 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-005.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Joan A. and Joseph E. Gerber, Trustees of the Joseph E. Gerber Family Trust and Clark B. and June P. Scott, Co-Trustees under a Declaration of Trust dated 2-4-1999 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 162 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-005.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 161 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-002.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Doral P. McCartney and Wanda D. McCartney filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 160 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-TU-001.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John R. Dutton and Laura M. Dutton, Co-Trustees of the John R. Dutton & Laura M. Dutton Revocable Trust dated September 9, 2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 159 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-050.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Carol A. Stroh, Trustee of the Carol A. Stroh Trust dated April 8, 2015 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 158 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-049.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Thomas W. Kimmins & Irene L. Kimmins filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 157 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-048.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael O. Schmuki and Patsy J. Schmuki filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 156 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-046.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gregory Shetler a/k/a Gregory P. Shetler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 155 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-045.000-SSE with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael O. Schmuki filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 154 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-045.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael O. Schmuki filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 153 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-044.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael E. Bucher and Elizabeth A. Bucher filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 152 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-043.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Elizabeth A. Bowers filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 151 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-037.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): R. J. Corman Railroad Company/Cleveland Line filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 150 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-041.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Ralph L. Graybill, III filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 149 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-037.910 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Ohio Central Railroad, Inc. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 148 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-032.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gary L. Habrun and Catherine E. Habrun, as Co-Trustees of the Gary and Catherine Habrun Revocable Trust filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 147 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-031.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Robert R. Lane and Martha E. Lane filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 146 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-029.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): James Donald Kleinhenz and Wilma Faye Kleinhenz filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 145 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-025.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John F. Brainerd and Mildred F. Brainerd filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 144 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-024.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Terrance O. Lahr filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 143 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-021.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): L. Vincent Goff, Jr., Trustee of the L. Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust, dated February 6, 1996 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 142 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-018.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 141 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-000.520 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Eagle Realty, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 140 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-ST-000.510 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kismet Organic Farms, LTD. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 139 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-062.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Keith A. Alt and Nancy A. Alt filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 138 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-061.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Brian J. Alt and Keith A. Alt filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 137 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-059.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Don D. Crum filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 136 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-055.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Mark A. Metzger and Stephanie L. Metzger filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 135 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-053.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Mark A. Metzger and Stephanie L. Metzger filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 134 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-052.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Lawrence H. Biglin, Trustee of the Lawrence H. Biglin and Mary Alice Biglin Revocable Living Trust dated July 27, 1993 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 133 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-050.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): A. & B. Metzger Family Farms, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 132 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-049.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Mark Metzger and Stephanie Metzger filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 131 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-047.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Thomas L. Clabaugh and Janet L. Clabaugh, The Julius H. Clabaugh and Bertha I. Clabaugh Revocable, Inter-Vivos Trust Agreement dated 7/2/96, and Julius H. Clabaugh B Trust FBO Bertha Claubaugh filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 130 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-040.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): The Ashland Railway, Inc. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 129 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-037.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 128 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-035.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Scott E. Harvey and Barbara A. Harvey filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 127 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-034.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Judith A. Ingram filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 126 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-031.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jon C. Foley Living Trust Agreement u/d/t March 10, 2015 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 125 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-026.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Fred A. Ickert filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 124 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-026.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Fred A. Ickert filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 123 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-023.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Danny R. Thompson and Sharon E. Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 122 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-003.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kindred Acres, Ltd. and Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 121 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-002.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 120 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-RI-001.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): James R. Wolfe and Kathy A. Wolfe filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 119 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-064.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): James A. Weisenauer and Cathy M. Weisenauer filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 118 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-061.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jeannine M. Stucky filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 117 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-060.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Karen S. Miller, Trustee of the Young Family Trust dated May 17, 2002 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 116 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-059.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gary P. Schimpf and Allen F. Schimpf filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 115 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-058.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Joe A. Schimpf and Joyce E. Schimpf filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 114 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-057.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John D. Schimpf and Wanda L. Schimpf filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 113 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-056.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jacob R. Ash and Shelly M. Ash filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 112 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-055.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Dwight Charles Harer or Florence Marie Harer, Trustees of the Dwight Charles Harer Revocable Living Trust and the Florence Marie Harer Revocable Trust dated February 22, 1994 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 111 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-052.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Joseph W. Smith and Joyce A. Smith filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 110 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-050.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Joseph W. Smith and Joyce A. Smith filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 109 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-049.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael F. Leuthold and Sandra K. Snyder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 108 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-048.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John D. Schimpf and Wanda L. Schimpf filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 107 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-046.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Edward L. Harer, Trustee of the Edward L. Harer Trust dated September 9, 2010, and Barbara J. Harer, Trustee of the Barbara J. Harer Trust, dated September 9, 2010 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Notice by Clerk that Rover Pipeline LLC failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,TL)
February 8, 2017 Filing 106 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-045.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Philip G. Studer filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 105 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-044.900 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 104 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-044.000-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kenneth E. Studer and Doris E. Studer, Co-Trustees of the Doris E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 103 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-044.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kenneth E. Studer and Doris E. Studer, Co-Trustees of the Doris E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003, and Kenneth E. Studer and Doris E. Studer, Co-Trustees of the Kenneth E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 102 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-041.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Danny S. Tomecko and DeAnna M. Tomecko filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 101 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-039.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gerald T. Stacklin and Rebecca M. Stacklin filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 100 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-038.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jeffrey A. Stacklin and Lyndsey A. Stacklin filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 99 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-037.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Gerald T. Stacklin and Rebecca M. Stacklin filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 8, 2017 Filing 98 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-036.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s):Paul J. Kanney a/k/a Paul Kanney and Nancy Kanney filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 8, 2017 Filing 97 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-035.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Helen M. Rossman and W. Dexter Rossman filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 96 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-034.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Keith R. Loy and Pamela E. Loy filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 95 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-031.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kenneth P. Burger filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 94 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-030.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Stephen R. Harrer, Cynthia M. Harrer and Stephen R. Harrer, Trustee or his Successor(s) as Trustees of The Harrer Keystone Inheritance Trust dated January 9, 2007 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 93 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-029.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Donald L. Phenicie and Jane Phenicie filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 92 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-027.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Marlene J. Ford f/k/a Marlene J. Fike filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 91 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-026.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): James R. Springer, Sole Trustee, or his successors in trust, under the James R. Springer Living Trust, dated February 26, 2001 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 90 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-024.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jason F. Kalb, Trustee. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 89 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-024.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jason F. Kalb, Trustee filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 88 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-023.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kenneth L. Kark and Kathleen A. Kark, Trustees of the Kenneth L. Kark and Kathleen A. Kark Living Trust, dated 9/25/07 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 87 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-022.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): LaVon I. Luidhardt, Larry L. Pfahler and Ray L. Pfahler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 86 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-021.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Rudolph J. Berger or Leona M. Berger, Trustees, or their successors in trust, under the Rudolph J. Berger Living Trust dated February 10, 1999 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 85 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-020.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roger J. Ackerman and Anita L. Ackerman, Trustees of the Roger J. Ackerman and Anita L. Ackerman Revocable Living Trust dated August 18, 1994 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 84 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-019.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): MMJ Farms, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 83 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-018.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Samuel J. Kraft and Margo J. Craft filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 82 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-015.000-SSE with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Herman W. Seibert, Trustee of the Seibert Family Trust, dated April 27, 1999 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 81 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-015.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Herman W. Seibert, Trustee of the Seibert Family Trust filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 80 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-014.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Edward D. Von Stein filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 79 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-012.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): K-SLP Real Estate, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 78 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-011.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): E. Jane Phenicie, Settlor Trustee under the E. Jane Phenicie Family Trust Agreement Dated January 4, 1995 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 77 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-010.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): K-SLP Real Estate, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 76 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-008.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Robert & Lillian Niese Farms, Ltd. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 75 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-007.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Robert K. Waines, Jr. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 74 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-006.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Robert & Lillian Niese Farms, Ltd. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 73 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-005.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): David E. Crum, Trustee of the Donald E. Crum Trust dated 3/18/04 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 72 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-002.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Niese Family Farms, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 71 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CR-001.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Keith A. Alt filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 70 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-081.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Timothy M. Gartrell, Gaila J. Gartrell, Edison J. Gartrell, Jerry J. Gartrell, and William D. Gartrell filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 69 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-080.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): B. Nadine Leggett, Settlor and Trustee, The B. Nadine Leggett Revocable Living Trust dated 11/10/2015 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 68 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-077.920 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 67 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-075.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Harry D. Copeland and Dorothy H. Copeland filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 66 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-074.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Harry D. Copeland and Dorothy H. Copeland filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 65 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-073.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Richard S. Morrison filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 64 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-072.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Richard T. Morrison and Judith J. Morrison filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 63 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-066.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Larry J. and Marie R. Adam filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 62 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-065.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Larry J. Adam and Marie R. Adam filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 61 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-064.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Edison T. Gartrell and Tanya S. Gartrell, Co-Trustees of the Edison T. Gartrell Revocable Trust dated 5/2/2013, and Edison T. Gartrell and Tanya S. Gartrell, Co-Trustees of the Tanya S. Gartrell Revocable Trust dated 5/2/2013 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 60 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-063.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s) Gary R. Caldwell filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 59 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-061.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Murphy Boys, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 58 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-058.540 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Carole M. Scheetz, Trustee of the Carole M. Scheetz Revocable Trust dated October 21, 2008 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 57 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-058.530 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Nancy Garcia, Trustee of the Eduardo Garcia Family Trust dated September 15, 1998 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 56 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-058.520 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Patrick R. Soos and Cynthia K. Soos filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 55 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-052.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Carole M. Scheetz, Trustee of the Carole M. Scheetz Revocable Trust dated October 21, 2008 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 54 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-051.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Nancy Garcia, Trustee of the Eduardo Garcia Family Trust dated September 15, 1998 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 53 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-050.500 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Rolling Ridge Angus Farm, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 52 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-050.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Nancy Garcia, Trustee of the Eduardo Garcia Family Trust dated September 15, 1998 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 51 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to OH-CA-HL-049.000-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Rolling Ridge Angus Farm, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 50 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-049.000 w Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Rolling Ridge Angus Farm, LTD filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 49 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-048.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Monty S. Morrison & Lynn A. Morrison filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/ Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 48 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-047.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Monty Morrison and Lynn Morrison filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 47 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-046.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wayne Fennimore and Caroline K. Fennimore filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-040.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Connie L. Leggett & Vance J. Leggett filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 45 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-039.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Pleasantree Acres, L.L.C. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 44 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-038.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Allen F. Miller filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 43 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-037.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Allen F. Miller filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 42 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-034.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Daniel L. Detwiler and Linda L. Detwiler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 41 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-033.500 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Daniel L. Detwiler and Linda L. Detwiler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 40 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-033.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Daniel L. Detwiler and Linda L. Detwiler filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 39 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-032.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Hill Haven Farms, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-031.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Hill Haven Farms, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 37 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-029.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Burrier Farm, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 36 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-028.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Craig W. Strasser, Trustee of the Carl W. Strasser Revocable Trust dated April 7, 1998 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 35 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-018.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Larry W. Sommers and Michelle M. Sommers filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 34 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-017.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s):Christopher L. Beebe and Andrea L. Michelson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 33 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-016.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Brownlee Land Ventures, LP filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 32 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-015.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Brownlee Land Ventures, LP filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 31 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-013.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John C. Meyer and Sharon L. Meyer filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 30 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-HL-004.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John S. McClaren, Jr. and Sharon R. McClaren filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 29 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-016.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Carl D. Miller, III and Sherry L. Miller filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 28 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-009.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John M. Fiocca filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 27 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-CA-001.500 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Patrick G. Weaver and Renee L. Weaver filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/ Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 26 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-058.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): James R. Wolfe and Kathy A. Wolfe filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 25 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-055.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Roger W. Spellman, Jr. & Ronald J. Spellman filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 24 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-051.920 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): The Ashland Railway, Inc. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 23 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-051.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John C. and Angela M. Kamenik filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 22 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-050.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): John C. and Angela M. Kamenik filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-047.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Keith S. and Karen L. Dohner, Trustees of the Dohner Family Irrevocable Trust filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 20 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-046.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): L & K Rentals of Ashland, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-045.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Kamenik Real Estate, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 18 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-043.000-TAR with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wayne Bright filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 17 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-043.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wayne Bright filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-041.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Earl F. and Cynthia H. Arnholt filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 15 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-039.100 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Denny J. Smith, Trustee of the Denny J. Smith Revocable Trust Dated 03-18-09 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 14 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-026.547 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Jerry D. Cline and Linda K. Cline filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 13 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-026.508 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): McNaull Real Estate, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 12 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-026.505 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC and McNaull Real Estate, LLC filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 11 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-022.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s); Mary Elizabeth Wise filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 10 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-015.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Bryan Bodager, Duane Bodager and Ronnie Bodager, Co-Trustees of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Boadger Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 9 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-014.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Max D. Fulk and Karla S. Fulk, Trustees of the Max and Karla Fulk Revocable Living Trust, dated January 29, 2010 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 8 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-013.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Michael J. Sloan and Donna M. Sloan, Trustees of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust, dated September 30, 2007 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 7 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-011.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Robert E. Farquhar and Cynthia A. Farquhar filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (D,JJ).
February 7, 2017 Filing 6 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to OH-AS-009.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s)William L. Jones and Dixie A. Jones filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (T,Je).
February 7, 2017 Filing 5 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action as to Tract OH-AS-005.000 with Exhibit A, Landowner(s): Wayne Ralph Bartter, Trustee of the Wayne Ralph Bartter Trust dated April 28, 2008 filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Moore, Bruce, s/Gregory D. Brunton) Modified text on 2/10/2017 (P, S).
February 7, 2017 Filing 4 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of the Easements Sought filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 7, 2017 Filing 3 Motion to Appoint a Commission filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 7, 2017 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
February 7, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
February 7, 2017 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
February 6, 2017 Filing 1 Complaint against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8013644, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Landowner Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A-2 Landowner Exhibits, #4 Exhibit B - FERC Certificate, #5 Exhibit C - ProjectRoute Map, #6 Exhibit D - Final Environmental Impact Statement) (Brunton, Gregory) Modified parties and description of attachments on 2/7/2017 (M,TL).
February 6, 2017 Party AT&T Ohio, Christene L. Acker, David E. Acker, Deborah L. Acker, Max M. Acker, Ted E. Acker, Allen Oil LLC, Dawson G. Alsdorf, Judy J. Alsdorf, American Oil and Gas, LLC, Amish Helping Fund, Jim Aslanides, Dawn M. Honigman Bernadine, John R. Bernadine, III, Robert F. Breneman, Buckeye Supply Company, CNB Bank, CSX Transportation, Inc., Andrew E. Coblentz, Christina Coblentz, Dave Shafer and Son, Dean Chance LLC, Derby Operating Corporation, Dercams, LLC, Rita Bauer Dush, Roger Dush, EDC Acquisition Corporation, Eclipse Resources I, LP, Erie Land & Mineral, Ltd., LLC, Farm Credit Services of America, PCA, Farmers National Banc Corp., Farmers National Bank of Canfield, Farmers and Savings Bank, Division of the Park National Bank, First National Bank, First-Knox National Bank, Carla Elaine Geiser, Carl R. Gessell dba Green Energy Company, Mark Allen Gifford, Karen A. Goebel, Patrick C. Goebel, Green Energy, Inc., Carol L. Grindstaff, Melvin R. Grindstaff, HG Energy, LLC, Ervin Hochstetler, Amandea H. Hostetler, Barbara E. Hostetler, Eli Y. Hostetler, Roman E. Hostetler, JD Producing, Inc., Glenn M. James, Lloyd Wayne James, Nellie L. James, Angela J. Jones, Gary Jones, Anita Sue Jorney-Gifford, Ruth A. Kaplan, Reuben A. Keim, Ruth P. Keim, Kenoil, Kenoil, LLC, Knox Energy Cooperative Association, Inc., Ruth Mae Linder, MFC Drilling, Inc., Aden E. Mast, Eli D. Mast, Roger J. Maurer, Christ A. Miller, Esther Miller, Esther A. Miller, Jack K. Miller, John S. Miller, Norman Miller, Paul J. Miller, Roman E. Miller, Rosalyn Miller, Mohican Oil & Gas Company, MorMack Industries, Inc., NiSource Energy Ventures, LLC, Ohio Oil Gathering Corporation IV, Kenneth R. Orr, Linda L. Orr, Lynn E. Orr, Clayton E. Over, Lisa C. Over, PNC Bank, NA, PNC Bank, National Association, Pioneer Resources, Inc., Ponderosa Consulting Services, Inc., Prairie Lane Corporation, RCR Investment Group, LLC, RWM & M Development Corporation, Red Coach Properties, LLC, Rhine Oil Company, LLC, Kenneth L. Richards, Trustee of the A. Berdene Richards Irrevocable Trust dated April 26, 2011, S & S Energy Corp., Dianne L. Sautter, Gregory L. Sautter, Roger Phillip Smailes, Trustee of the Roger Phillip Smailes Revocable Trust, dated 01/10/2013, Adam Joseph Speelman, Keith A. Speelman, Stag Petroleum, Inc., Martha L. Starr, Steven P. Starr, Stuart N. Swinehart, Theresa Lee Swinehart, Tate Farms Company, Ltd., The Apple Creek Banking Company, The Holmes-Wayne Electric Cooperative, Inc., The Park National Bank dba Farmers and Savings Bank, Gregory Tieche, Peggy Tieche, Lori P. Troyer, Raymond L. Troyer, Ura Troyer, Jr., United States Ceramic Tile Company, Unknown Heirs and Assigns of Frank L. Galley and Herteline Galley, Unknown Heirs and Assigns of Simon S. Hershberger and Mattie S. Hershberger, Wayne County National Bank, Wayne Operating Company, Wayne Savings Community Bank, Frannie D. Wengerd, Melvin D. Wengerd, Wenner Petroleum, Wooster Aggregates, LLC, Aden D. Yoder, Alvin D. Yoder, Bena M. Yoder, David J. Yoder, Esther Mae Yoder, Francis A. Yoder, Ivan J. Yoder, James S. Yoder, Jonas M. Yoder, Martha M. Yoder, Mary E. Yoder, Mattie Yoder, Steven M. Yoder and Verba Yoder added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Artex Oil Company, Barkheimer Realty LTD, M. B. Belden, Cynthia Clark Brown, Buckeye Pipeline Company, LP, Glenn A. Burky, Iva C. Burky, Naomi A. Burky, Clarence W. Burton, Francis L. Burton, C. Glen Jenkins Trust, CGas Exploration, Inc., Samuel W. Cooper, Rosemary Crandall, Dart Oil & Gas-Ohio, LLC, Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-A, LP, Estate of Glenn A. Burky, Sr., c/o Executor, Lauren W. Ferris, Robert Ferris, First National Bank of Dennison, Gas Transport, Inc., Nevin D. Gerber, Beverly J. Gorrell, Steven D. Gorrell, Great Lakes Energy, Inc., Blanche S. Haddock, Gail H. Haddock, Svend Hansen, Jr., David Holbrook, Charles Hoyt, James R. Smail, Inc., Carol Johnson, Trustee of the Myrtle O. Williams Living Trust, Gerald L. Kendle, Jodi Kendle, Mary Ann Kendle, Gerald Kendle, Jr., David K. Kennedy, Sandra Klausner, Solomon Klausner, Noreen S. Leavers, Connie L. Lee, Kevin C. Lee, Mary R. Lutz, Scott T. Lutz, MB Oil & Gas, LLC, MB Private Investors - 1997, Limited Partnership, Marbel Trust B, Marshall B. Belden, Jr. and Timothy S. Belden, Co-Trustees, Randy K. McCarty, Richard M. McCarty, Mutual Oil & Gas Co., Maricia Phillips Parkinson, Charles J. Phillips, David E. Phillips, Charles C. Phillips, Trustee of the Charles C. Phillips Living Trust dated December 20, 2012, Christine Pitts, as Successor Trustee under the Kermit L. James Living Trust, John H. Plunkett, Donald A. Pontones, Co-Trustee of the Donald A. and Kathryn S. Pontones Revocable Living Trust, Kathryn S. Pontones, Co-Trustee of the Donald A. and Kathryn S. Pontones Revocable Living Trust, Porter Family Trust - 5/23/91, Margaret Vickers Porter, Trustee, Cathy Jean Rennie, Paul Leslie Rennie, Sr., John J. Rossi, Ruby M. Jenkins Trust, Richard H. Semple, Singer Oil Co., LLC, Spartek, Inc., C. Richard Stafford, The Huntington Trust Company, N.A., Trustee under the Trust of Helen G. Puncheon Smith, Virginia Dreher, Florence E. Puncheon, Helen P. Puncheon Green and Elizabeth Bell dated January 24, 1977, and amended November 18, 1993, George C. Welch, III, Bert Williams, Myrtle O. Williams and Myrtle O. Williams, Trustee of the Myrtle O. Williams Living Trust added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party James F. Allan, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Dominion Natrium Holdings, Inc., John Ryan Dutton, Jr., or any Successor Trustee of the John R. Dutton and Laura M. Dutton Family Irrevocable Trust dated September 9, 2013, Enervest Acquisitions, LLC, Georgia M. Gregory, Wayne R. Gregory, Hartwood Development Company, LTD, J. L. Henning, Interstate Escrow Corporation, North East Natural Gas Corp., O-Tex Pumping, LLC, Janet B. Romer, Richard A. Romer, Matthew P. Smith, Tammy S. Smith and Paul Tackett, Trustee of the Paul Tackett Trust added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party BoCor Holdings, LLC, BoCor Producing, Dominion Resources, Inc. aka Dominion Natrium Holdings, Inc., Dorchester Master Limited Partnership, John R. Dutton, Co-Trustee of the John R. Dutton & Laura M. Dutton Revocable Trust dated September 9, 2013, Laura M. Dutton, Co-Trustee of the John R. Dutton & Laura M. Dutton Revocable Trust dated September 9, 2013, Endeavor Ohio, LLC, Equity Oil & Gas Funds, Inc., Joan A. Gerber, Individually, Joseph E. Gerber, Individually, Joan A. Gerber, Trustee of the Joseph E. Gerber Family Trust, Joseph E. Gerber, Trustee of the Joseph E. Gerber Family Trust, Cordella R. Hutcheson, Trustee of the Robert H. Hutcheson Revocable Trust June 28, 2001, Cordella R. Hutcheson, as Successor Trustee of the Robert H. Hutcheson Revocable Trust, Irene L. Kimmins, Thomas W. Kimmins, Doral P. McCartney, Wanda D. McCartney, North East Natural Gas Company, Otex, Inc., RH Hutcheson Trust, Frieda Schmuki, Michael O. Schmuki, Patsy J. Schmuki, Clark B. Scott, Co-Trustee under a Declaration of Trust dated 2-4-1999, June P. Scott, Co-Trustee under a Declaration of Trust dated 2-4-1999, Clark B. Scott, Individually, June P. Scott, Individually, Gregory Shetler aka Gregory P. and Carol A. Stroh, Trustee of the Carol A. Stroh Trust dated April 8, 2015 added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Ashland Oil, Inc., Bakerwell, Inc., Henry S. Belden, IV, Elizabeth A. Bowers, Broad Street Energy Co., Diana C. Bucher, Elizabeth A. Bucher, Michael E. Bucher, Patrick L. Bucher, Tara Catherine Bucher, Bruce J. Burcaw, Rebecca L. Burcaw, CNX Gas Company, LLC, Columbia Gas Transmission Corporation, Diversified Oil & Gas, LLC, Dominion Field Services, Inc., Dover Atwood Corp., Graig Exploration, Ltd., Ralph L. Graybill, III, Catherine E. Habrun, Co-Trustee of the Gary and Catherine Habrun Revocable Trust, Gary L. Habrun, Co-Trustee of the Gary and Catherine Habrun Revocable Trust, Linda Diane Hall, Jerry Moore, Inc., MGH, Inc., MKE Producing, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Gerald H. Moore, Northwoods Corporation, Bessie L. Schrock, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Daniel J. Wolf, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of John J. Rose, Unknown Heirs of Margaret Weisgarber, Unknown heirs of Bessie L. Schrock, Unknown successors and assigns of Vaught Oil Company, Louis Wohlmuth and Phyllis Wohlmuth added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party H. S. Belden, IV, John F. Brainerd, Mildred F. Brainerd, Franklin Gas & Oil Company, LLC, Frontier North, Inc., James Donald Kleinhenz, Wilma Faye Kleinhenz, Martha E. Lane, Robert R. Lane, Jeannette Numbers, Keith E. Numbers, Michael L. Numbers, Scott A. Numbers, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Dale Cameron, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Geneva Lutz, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of J. Franklin Sterner, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Jack Cameron, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Perry Sterner, Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Rutti Reiger and Unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Walter Sterner added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Brian J. Alt, Nancy A. Alt, Lawrence H. Biglin, Trustee of The Lawrence H. Biglin and Mary Alice Biglin Revocable Living Trust dated July 27, 1993, Buckeye Oil Producing Co., Consumers Gas Cooperative, Don D. Crum, Eagle Realty, Ltd., Energex Corp., Energex Corporation, Enervest Operating, LLC, L. Vincent Goff, Jr., Trustee of the L. Vincent Goff, Jr. Living Trust, dated February 6, 1996, William H. Gruse, II, Kismet Organic Farms, LTD, Terrence O. Lahr, Laufen International, Inc., MCD-MB Drilling Progam - 1991, Limited Partnership, Ohio River Pipe Line, LLC, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Henry Stuck, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Homer Stuck, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Maude Mase, The unknown heirs, successors and assigns of Wanda Maxwell and Western Reserve Land Conservancy added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Janet L. Clabaugh, Thomas L. Clabaugh, Sue L. Donahue, John N. Foley, Jon C. Foley, Patricia A. Foley, Barbara A. Harvey, Scott E. Harvey, Fred A. Ickert, Judith A. Ingram, John C. Foley Living Trust Agreement u/d/t March 10, 2015, Julius H. Clabaugh 'B' Trust FBO Bertha Claubaugh, A. & B. Metzger Family Farms, LLC, Kindred Acres, Ltd., Beverly Kruso, Joseph M. Kruso, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Mechanics Bank, Mark Metzger, Stephanie Metzger, Pavonia Spring Farm, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Sprint Communications Company LP, Connie Jo Swogger, The Julius H. Clabaugh and Bertha I. Clabaugh Revocable, Inter-Vivos Trust Agreement dated 7/2/96, Danny R. Thompson, Sharon E. Thompson, Thousand Oaks Farms, Inc. and Wiltel Communications, LLC added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Jacob R. Ash, Shelly M. Ash, Directions Credit Union, Inc., Dwight Charles Harer, Trustee of the Dwight Charles Harer Revocable Living Trust dated February 22, 1994, Florence Marie Harer, Trustee of the Dwight Charles Harer Revocable Living Trust dated February 22, 1994, Dwight Charles Harer, Trustee of the Florence Marie Harer Revocable Trust dated February 22, 1994, Florence Marie Harer, Trustee of the Florence Marie Harer Revocable Trust dated February 22, 1994, Karen S. Miller, Trustee of the Young Family Trust dated May 17, 2002, NextEra Energy Honey Creek Wind, LLC, NextEra Energy Solutions, LLC, Reserve Energy Exploration Company, Allen F. Schimpf, Gary P. Schimpf, Joe A. Schimpf, Joyce E. Schimpf, John A. Shoup, Linda Shoup, Jeannine M. Stucky, Cathy M. Weisenauer and James A. Weisenauer added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Kenneth E. Studer, Co-Trustee of the Doris E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003, Doris E. Studer, Co-Trustee of the Doris E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003, Kenneth E. Studer, Co-Trustee of the Kenneth E. Studer Revocable Trust dated November 20, 2003, Doris E. Studer, Co-Trustee of the Kenneth E. Studer Revocable Trust Dated November 20, 2003, Phillip G. Studer, Edward L. Harer, Trustee of the Edward L. Harer Trust dated September 9, 2010, Barbara J. Harer, Trustee of the Barbara J. Harer Trust dated September 9, 2010, John D. Schimpf, Wanda L. Schimpf, Michael F. Leuthold, Sandra K. Snyder, Joseph W. Smith, Joyce A. Smith and The Peoples Savings and Loan Company added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Jane Phenicie, Stephen R. Harrer, Cynthia M. Harrer, Stephen R. Harrer, Trustee or his Successor(s) as Trustees of The Harrer Keystone Inheritance Trust dated January 9, 2007, Kenneth R. Burger, Keith R. Loy, Pamela E. Loy, Helen M. Rossman, W. Dexter Rossman, Paul J. Kanney aka Paul Kanney, Nancy Kanney, Gerald T. Stacklin, Rebecca M. Stacklin, Jeffrey A. Stacklin, Lyndsey A. Stacklin, Danny S. Tomecko and DeAnna M. Tomecko added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Rudolph J. Berger, Trustee or their successors in trust, under the Rudolph J. Berger Living Trust dated 2/10/99, Leona M. Berger, Trustee or their succesors in trust, under the Rudolph J. Berger Living Trust dated 2/10/99, LaVon I. Luidhardt, Larry L. Pfahler, Ray L. Pfahler, Kenneth L. Kark, Trustee of the Kenneth L. Kark and Kathlen A. Kark Living Trust, dated 09/25/07, Kathleen A. Kark, Trustee of the Kenneth L. Kark and Kathleen A. Kark Living Trust, dated 9/25/07, Jason F. Kalb, James R. Springer, Sole Trustee, or his successors in trust under the James R. Springer Living Trust dated February 26, 2001, Atlantic Wind, LLC, Marlene J. Ford and Donald L. Phenicie added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Devon Energy Production Company, LP, Tiptop Energy Production US, LLC, David E. Crum, Trustee of the Donald E. Crum dated 3/18/04, United Telephone Company of Ohio, North Central Electric Co-operative, Inc., Robert and Lillian Niese Farms, LTD., Robert K. Waines, Jr., Richland Bank, K-SLP Real Estate, Ltd., E. Jane Phenicie, Settlor Trustee under the E. Jane Phenicie Family Trust Agreement dated January 4, 1995, Edward D. Von Stein, Herman W. Seibert, Trustee of the Seibert Family Trust, Samuel J. Kraft, Margo J. Craft, MMJ Farms, LLC, Roger J. Ackerman, Trustee of the Roger J. Ackerman and Anita L. Ackerman Revocable Living Trust dated August 18, 1994 and Anita L. Ackerman, Trustee of the Roger J. Ackermand and Anita L. Ackerman Revocable Living Trust dated August 18, 1994 added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Richard S. Morrison, George H. Farnsworth, Co-Trustee for the Farnsworth Family Trust, Jacquelyn M. Farnsworth, Co-Trustee for the Farnsworth Family Trust, Huntington Bancshares, Inc., Harry D. Copeland, Dorthy H. Copeland, Letterman Brothers Energy Program 1980-3, B. Nadine Leggett, Settlor and Trustee The B. Nadine Leggett Revocable Living Trust dated 11/10/2015, Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company, AEP Ohio Transmission Company, Inc., Timothy M. Gartrell, Gaila J. Gartrell, Edison J. Gartrell, Jerry J. Gartrell, William D. Gartrell, Bruce Levengood, Tyler Levengood, Nathan B. Levengood, Mark Farnsworth, Carolyn Farnsworth, Keith A. Alt, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Black Fork Wind Energy, LLC, Niese Family Farms, LTD. and Niese Brothers Farms aka Niese Farms, an Ohio General Partnership added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Gary R. Caldwell, Edison T. Gartrell, Co-Trustee of the Edison T. Gartrell Revocable Trust dated 5/2/2013, Tanya S. Gartrell, Co-Trustee of the Edison T. Gartrell Revocable Trust dated 5/2/2013, The First National Bank of Dennison, Larry J. Adam, Marie R. Adam, Richard T. Morrison, Judith J. Morrison, Pennzoil Company and SWEPI, LP added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Utica Royalty Partners II, LP, Rolling Ridge Angus Farms, LTD., Nancy Garcia, Trustee of the Eduardo Garcia Family Trust dated September 15, 1998, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund XI-WI, LP, Carole M. Scheetz, Trustee of the Carole M. Scheetz Revocable Trust dated October 21, 2008, Patrick R. Soos, Cynthia K. Soos, Murphy Boys, LLC and Enervest Ltd. added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party RHDK Oil & Gas, LLC, Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC, Burton L. Jones, Daniel L. Detwiler, Linda L. Detwiler, Allen F. Miller, Pleasantree Acres, Ltd., The Equitable Savings and Loan Company, Connie L. Leggett, Vance J. Leggett, Wayne Fennimore, Caroline K. Fennimore, Marathon Energy Holdings, Inc., Ohio Power Company, Dominion Transmission, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Cavalry Spv. I, LLC, Unifund CCR, LLC, Monty Morrison, Lynn Morrison and Anschutz Exploration Corporation added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Unknown heirs of Dorothy Somers Clarke, Unknown heirs of George E. Frey, Christopher L. Beebe, Andrea I. Michelson, Larry W. Sommers, Michelle M. Sommers, Craig W. Strasser, Trustee of the Carl W. Strasser Revocable Trust dated April 7, 1998, Consol Energy, Inc., Burrier Farm, LLC, Utica East Ohio Midstream, LLC and Hill Haven Farms, LLC added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party John S. McClaren, Jr., Sharon R. McClaren, Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Ronnie Lee Shockley, Bonnie Sue Shockley, Michael A. Bostic, Cindy G. Bostic, Eric Petroleum Corporation, Jamestown Resources, LLC, Pelican Energy, LLC, John C. Meyer, Sharon L. Meyer, Brownlee Land Ventures, LP, Noble Marcellus, LP and Consumers National Bank added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Dover-Atwood 1994 Limited Partnership, E.C.O Production, LLC, Capital C Energy Operations, LP, Artex Energy Group, LLC, L & M Associates, Inc., SOPUS Products, Sierra Buckeye, LLC, Earl C. Sheehan, Trustee, Carl D. Miller, III, Sherry L. Miller, Dominion East Ohio, Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-A, LP, Enterprise Gas and Oil Incorporated, First Federal Community Bank, Dorothy Somers Clarke and George E. Frey added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Roger W. Spellman, Karen Spellman, Gorden L. Hughes, Christina S. Hughes, Lesa L. Harper, Tracy D. Harper, James R. Wolfe, Kathy A. Wolfe, Patrick G. Weaver, Renee L. Weaver, The East Ohio Gas Company, Enterprise Energy Corporation, Belden & Blake, LLC, Petrox, Inc., Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation, Sound Energy Company, Inc., CHK Utica, LLC, Chesapeake AEC Acquisition, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Total E&P USA, Inc., Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX, LP, Enervest Energy Institutional Fund IX-WI, LP, CGas Properties, LP, Leesville Land, LLC, John M. Fiocca, Cravat Coal Company, Blue Racer Midstream, LLC, Carroll Electric Cooperative, Marathon Pipeline, LLC and Quaker State Oil Refining added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party John C. Kamenik, Angela M. Kamenik, Spelman Pipeline Holdings, LLC, Northeast Ohio Natural Gas Corp., AG Credit, Agricultural Credit Association, Teresa A. Young, Searl Dean Allen, Rebecca Sue Allen, David E. Harpster, Anita L. Harpster, Lonnie D. Workman, Lonnie D. Workman (First American RE Tax), Melissa K. Heslep, Melissa Heslep (Wells Fargo RE Tax), First America Re Tax, Wells Fargo Re Tax Serv, Howard D. Miller, Kendra G. Miller, Phillip R. Harlan, Shari A. Harlan, Paul J. Kaufman, AT & T Corp., Roger W. Spellman, Jr. and Ronald J. Spellman added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Kamenik Real Estate, LLC, AT&T Wireless PCS Inc., American Towers, Inc., The Anderson Group of Companies, Inc., L & K Rentals of Ashland, LLC, Jim Pittenger, Angie E. Pittenger, Keith S. Dohner, Trustee of the Dohner Family Irrevocable Trust, Karen L. Dohner, Trustee of Dohner Family Irrevocable Trust, Keith Dohner (First American RE Tax), Debra Dohner (First American RE Tax), Keith Dohner and Debra Dohner added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Earl F. Arnholt, Cynthia H. Arnholt, NiSource Corporate Services Company, Farmers and Savings Bank, Division of the Park National Bank, Wayne Bright, Bucyrus Community Hospital and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Jerry D. Cline, Linda K. Cline, Steven R. Smith, Kelly J. Smith, Park National Bank, The Standard Oil Company, Sohio Gas Pipeline Company, FirstMerit Mortgage Corporation, Denny J. Smith, Trustee of the Denny J. Smith Revocable Trust dated 03-18-09, Jill Galbraith, Successor Trustee of the Stull Family Trust dated April 2, 2010, Sutton Bank and Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc. added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Bryan Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Ronnie Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Duane Bodager, Co-Trustee of the Dale E. Bodager and Clara L. Bodager Revocable Trust Agreements dated February 7, 1997, Aspire Energy of Ohio, LLC, Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc., Columbia Gas of Ohio, Inc., Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Carter M. Hanna, Mary Elizabeth Wise, Stanley W. Wise, Linda M. Kyser, Verizon North, Inc., NiSource Corporate Services Company aka NiSource Energy Ventures, LLC, Greg McNaull Real Estate, LLC, McNaull Real Estate, LLC and Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA aka Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Michael J. Sloan, Trustee of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust dated September 30, 2007, Donna M. Sloan, Trustee of the Sloan Revocable Living Trust dated September 30, 2007, Michael J. Sloan, Individually, Donna M. Sloan, Individually, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Bethel Resources, Inc., The Farmers Savings Bank, The Park National Bank, M & R Investments Ohio, LLC, Herbert L. Gray, AB Resources OH, LLC, Diversified Resources, Inc., Cliff Falk, Geraldine Falk, Max D. Fulk, Trustee of the Max and Karla Fulk Revocable Living Trust dated January 29, 2010 and Karla S. Fulk, Trustee of the Max and Karla Fulk Revocable Living Trust dated January 29, 2010 added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
February 6, 2017 Party Ohio Edison Company, William L. Jones, Dixie A. Jones, Robert E. Farquhar, Cynthia A. Farquhar, Daniel E. Sheaffer, Mandy Lynn Paramore, James C. Sheaffer, Stella Sheaffer, Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Kenoil Producing, LLC and Rimco Operating, Inc. added. filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rover Pipeline LLC v. Bartter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NiSource Corporate Services Company
Represented By: Adam C. Smith
Represented By: Matthew R. Rechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Shetler
Represented By: Clinton P. Stahler
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |