Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Kinsey et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Stonecreek Bar & Grille Inc, Vicki Bender Kinsey and Russell Kinsey
Case Number: 5:2018cv01615
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Tuscarawas
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed. Stonecreek Bar & Grille Inc waiver sent on 7/18/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed. Vicki Bender Kinsey waiver sent on 7/18/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed. Russell Kinsey waiver sent on 7/18/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Vicki Bender Kinsey, Russell Kinsey, and Stonecreek Bar & Grille Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,HR)
July 13, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,HR)
July 13, 2018 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,HR)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Russell Kinsey, Vicki Bender Kinsey, and Stonecreek Bar and Grille Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8804075. Filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Russell Kinsey, #3 Summons for Vicki Bender Kinsey, #4 Summons for Stonecreek Bar & Grille Inc) (Koberg, Jeffrey) ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Kinsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonecreek Bar & Grille Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Bender Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?