Muhammad v. County of Summit et al
Plaintiff: Natasha Muhammad
Defendant: Sheriff Steve Barry, Deputy Christopher R. Boyd, John/Jane Doe and County of Summit
Case Number: 5:2018cv02010
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Steve Barry, Christopher R. Boyd, County of Summit, John/Jane Doe. (Hannon, Tami)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Steve Barry, Christopher R. Boyd, County of Summit and John/Jane Doe answers due 30 days after 9/7/18. Judge John R. Adams on 9/5/18.(K,C)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for extension of time until October 8, 2018 to answer Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Steve Barry, Christopher R. Boyd, County of Summit, John/Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James A. Climer)(Climer, James)
August 31, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
August 31, 2018 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County, case number CV-2018-08-3286 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8887065.. Filed by Christopher R. Boyd, Steve Barry, County of Summit. (Attachments: #1 Complaint , #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Climer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. County of Summit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Muhammad
Represented By: Billi F. Copeland
Represented By: William M. Sremack
Represented By: Rebecca J. Sremack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Steve Barry
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Represented By: Tami Z. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Christopher R. Boyd
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Represented By: Tami Z. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Represented By: Tami Z. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Summit
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Represented By: Tami Z. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?