Sworak v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Sworak
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. and Hartville RV Center, Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv02185
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 Reply in support of #9 Motion to Join Non-Diverse Defendant, filed by Peter Sworak. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworak Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Afft Ex A. Pastore Letter 9-21-18, #3 Exhibit Afft Ex. B Sworak Letter 10-4-18, #4 Exhibit Afft Ex. C Sworak email 10-27-18, #5 Exhibit Afft Ex. D Pastore email 10-29-18)(Mendenhall, Warner)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 Opposition to #9 Motion to Join Non-Diverse Defendant filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Camper Care Protest Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Camper Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Shelley Dillen)(Hanna, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: The Court hereby grants defendant Gulf Stream's motion for extension of time (Doc. No. #11 ) and sets the following due dates with respect to plaintiff's motion for joinder (Doc. No. #9 ): Gulf Stream's response is due by November 14, 2018; plaintiff's reply (if any) is due by November 21, 2018.Briefing on Gulf Stream's motion to dismiss or stay (Doc. No. #5 ) is suspended until further order of the Court, thereby mooting plaintiff's motion for extension of time. (Doc. No. #10 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 11/9/2018.(P,J)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time (until 14 days after this Court rules on Camper Care's #9 Motion to Join Non-Diverse Defendant) to answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. Related document(s) #8 . (Hanna, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for extension of time (until the Court rules on Plaintiff's simultaneously filed #9 Motion to Join a Non-Diverse Defendant) to file response/reply to #5 Motion to dismiss Motion to stay pending mediation and/or arbitration filed by Plaintiff Peter Sworak. Related document(s) #5 . (Mendenhall, Warner)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to Join Non-Diverse Defendant, with Memorandum in Support, filed by Plaintiff Peter Sworak. Related document(s) #8 . (Mendenhall, Warner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Amended complaint with Jury Demand against Gulf Stream Coach, Inc., Hartville RV Center, Inc (adding new party defendant(s) Hartville RV Center, Inc.) Filed by Peter Sworak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsigned contract, #2 Exhibit Damage estimate for truck, #3 Exhibit Email ending business relationship, #4 Exhibit Hartville RV website advertising Gulf Stream trailers, #5 Exhibit Official termination letter) (Mendenhall, Warner)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 10/9/2018 from Portage County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing) (Related document #6 ). (O,K)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 State court documents received from Portage County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018cv00673. Original record returned to Portage County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Portage County Court) (O,K)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss or Motion to stay pending mediation and/or arbitration , with brief in support, filed by Defendant Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1(f) Certification)(Cruz, Frederick)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying other affiliate Oakland Enterprises, Inc., for Gulf Stream Coach, Inc., filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Cruz, Frederick)
September 24, 2018 Notice by Clerk that Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (T,Je)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
September 24, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
September 24, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Portage County Common Pleas, case number 2018CV00673 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8922960.. Filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cruz, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sworak v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sworak
Represented By: Logan R. Trombley
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Hanna
Represented By: Frederick D. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartville RV Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?