Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Sands et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Sands Holdings Inc and Randy L Sands
Case Number: 5:2018cv02365
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Randy L Sands and Sands Holdings Inc. Service attempted by certified mail on 11/7/2018, 11/12/2018 and 11/22/2018 filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Related document #3 ). (O,K)
November 5, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Randy L Sands, Receipt # 7017 1000 0000 7582 2039. Sands Holdings Inc, Receipt # 7017 1000 0000 7582 2022. Placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Randy L Sands, Sands Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
October 11, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
October 11, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8951876, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons On Randy Sands, #3 Summons On Sands Holdings Inc) (Koberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Sands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sands Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy L Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?