Wingenroth v. Mercy Medical Center, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sarah Wingenroth
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02868
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 12 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Mercy Medical Center, Inc.. (Dingwell, David)
January 16, 2019 11 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (P,J)
January 16, 2019 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 2/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 1/30/2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 2/6/2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(P,J)
January 10, 2019 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Sisters of Charity Health System for Mercy Medical Center, Inc. filed by Mercy Medical Center, Inc.. (Dingwell, David)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mercy Medical Center, Inc. answer due 1/31/2019. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/9/2019.(T,Je)
January 9, 2019 8 Withdrawal of Motion for Extension filed by Defendant Mercy Medical Center, Inc. Related document(s) #6 . (Dingwell, David)
January 9, 2019 7 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Mercy Medical Center, Inc.. (Dingwell, David)
January 8, 2019 6 WITHDRAWN - See Doc. No. #8 -First Motion for extension of time until January 31, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant Mercy Medical Center, Inc. (Dingwell, David) Modified to withdraw on 1/11/2019 (T,Je).
January 8, 2019 5 Attorney Appearance by David L. Dingwell filed by on behalf of Mercy Medical Center, Inc.. (Dingwell, David)
December 27, 2018 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mercy Medical Center, Inc. on 12/20/2018, filed on behalf of Sarah Wingenroth. Related document(s) #2 . (S,HR)
December 18, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Mercy Medical Center, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1830 0002 2212 9044. (P,G)
December 13, 2018 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
December 13, 2018 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Mercy Medical Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
December 13, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
December 13, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
December 13, 2018 1 Complaint with jury demand against Mercy Medical Center, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9052265.. Filed by Sarah Wingenroth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lalak, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingenroth v. Mercy Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wingenroth
Represented By: Christopher J. Lalak
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Dingwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?