United States of America v. $1,117,369.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $13,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Assorted Coin Collection, notes, Gold, Stamp & Jewelry, Women's Rolex Watch, $49,000.00 in U.S. Currency, 2015 Mercedes Benz 5550, VIN: WDDUG8FB5FA103038;, $20,098.00 in U.S. Currency, 2015 Cadillac Escalade, VN: lGYS4BKJ8FRl51391, $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency, $5,715.00 in U.S. Currency, 2012 Mercedes Benz S-Class, VIN: WDDNG9EB6CA449428., $5,272.00 in U.S. Currency, Assorted Silver and Gold Coin Collection and Assorted Silver Bars, $390,316.00 in U.S. Currency, 2017 Mercedes Benz GLC, VIN: WDC0G6EB8HFL52359, Assorted Coin Collection, $98,053.00 in U.S. Currency, Real Property located at 5692 Foxchase Path, Clinton, Ohio, PPN: 24- 13481, Real Property located at 2231 Dunkeith Drive NW, Canton, Ohio, PPN: 18-00171, $239,900.00 in U.S. Currency, Men's Rolex Watch, $114,714.00 in U.S. Currency, $6,108.00 in U.S. Currency, $363,588.00 in U.S. Currency, $1,500.00 in U.S. Currency, $48,850.00 in U.S. Currency, $99,864.00 in U.S. Currency, $8,677.00 in U.S. Currency, $1,777,369.00 in U.S. Currency, Real Property located at 603 Bellflower Avenue, Canton Ohio, PPN: 02- 14109, $4,057.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,027.00 in U.S. Currency, $11,018.00 in U.S. Currency, $14,550.00 in U.S. Currency, 1,117,369.00 in U.S. Currency and 2015 Mercedes Benz S550, VIN: WDDUG8FB5FA103038
Claimant: Christina DiMichele, Rocco Ferruccio, Todd DiMichele and Trisha Ferruccio
Interested Party: Melissa Bragg, Tyra Zwick, Marcelle Audi, Christos Karasarides, Jr., Nicole Shaheen, Thomas Helmick, Joshua Jay, One Dunkeith Company, LLC, Mary Helmick and Ron DiPietro
Case Number: 5:2018cv02927
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Trisha Ferruccio c/o Bradley R. Iams. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,S)
February 12, 2019 Filing 26 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Helmick. (Whitaker, William)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Joshua Jay. (Fedor, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #24 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Nicole Shaheen. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/8/2019.(P,J)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #23 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Melissa Bragg. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/8/2019.(P,J)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #22 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Christos Karasarides, Jr. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/8/2019.(P,J)
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Nicole Shaheen. (Pierce, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Melissa Bragg. (Pierce, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Interested Party Christos Karasarides, Jr. (Pierce, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 Answer to #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, filed by Trisha Ferruccio. (Iams, Bradley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 Answer to #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, filed by Rocco Ferruccio. (Iams, Bradley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 19 Verified Claim filed by Trisha Ferruccio. (Iams, Bradley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 Verified Claim filed by Rocco Ferruccio. (Iams, Bradley)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #17 unopposed motion by interested party Thomas Helmick for extension of time until 2/12/19 to answer complaint in forfeiture and to file a claim. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/30/2019.(P,J)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 2/12/19 to answer Complaint in Forfeiture & to file a Claim filed by Interested Party Thomas Helmick. (Whitaker, Andrea)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Rocco Ferruccio. Service attempted by certified mail on 1/22/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,S)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 Verified Claim filed by Joshua Jay. (Fedor, Robert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Todd DiMichele and Christina DiMichele. Related document(s) #13 .(Ferruccio, Samuel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Todd DiMichele, Christina DiMichele. (Ferruccio, Samuel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon One Dunkeith Company, LLC on 1/14/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 , #4 . (M,S)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi and adding attorney Henry F. DeBaggis filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (T,Je)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Nicole Shaheen on 12/27/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (H,D)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Joshua Jay on 12/27/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (H,D)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Thomas Helmick on 12/27/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (H,D)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Marcelle Audi on 12/26/2018; Christina DiMichele on 12/26/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (M,S)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Melissa Bragg on 12/26/2018; Todd DiMichele on 12/26/2018; Christos Karasarides, Jr on 12/26/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (M,S)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ron DiPietro on 12/24/2018; Mary Helmick on 12/24/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (M,S)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (H,SN)
December 26, 2018 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to One Dunkeith Company, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648301. (S,SR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Notice to One Dunkeith Company, LLC filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
December 21, 2018 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Marcelle Audi Receipt # 70081300000030279570, Melissa Bragg Receipt # 70052570000010250145, Christina DiMichele Receipt # 70081300000030279501, Todd DiMichele Receipt # 70081300000030279448, Ron DiPietro Receipt # 70052570000010250176, Rocco Ferruccio Receipt # 70081300000030279433, Trisha Ferruccio Receipt # 70081300000030279440, Mary Helmick Receipt # 70081300000030279525, Thomas Helmick Receipt # 70052570000010250206, Joshua Jay Receipt # 70081300000030279464, Christos Karasarides, Jr. Receipt # 70052570000010250138, Nicole Shaheen Receipt # 70081300000030279549, Tyra Zwick Receipt # 70052570000010250190 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail.. (B,R)
December 20, 2018 The filer is advised that the U.S. Marshal Service requires a USM Form 285 for each individual, company, or corporation to be served. The USM Form 285 can be found at www.uscourts.gov under# Forms. (M,TL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $1,777,369.00 in U.S. Currency; $390,316.00 in U.S. Currency; $363,588.00 in U.S. Currency; $99,864.00 in U.S. Currency; $48,850.00 in U.S. Currency; $15,027.00 in U.S. Currency; Assorted Coin Collection, notes, Gold, Stamp & Jewelry; $114,714.00 in U.S. Currency; $239,900.00 in U.S. Currency; $98,053.00 in U.S. Currency; $49,000.00 in U.S. Currency; $5,715.00 in U.S. Currency; Assorted Silver and Gold Coin Collection and Assorted Silver Bars; Men's Rolex Watch; Women's Rolex Watch; $11,018.00 in U.S. Currency; $20,098.00 in U.S. Currency; $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency; Assorted Coin Collection; $8,677.00 in U.S. Currency; $14,550.00 in U.S. Currency; $1,500.00 in U.S. Currency; $13,000.00 in U.S. Currency; $5,272.00 in U.S. Currency; $4,057.00 in U.S. Currency; and, $6,108.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/20/2018. (M,TL)
December 20, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
December 20, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:18CV2286. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Process Receipt and Return, #5 Notice of Complaint Against Real Property Re: 603 Bellflower Ave., Canton, Ohio, #6 Notice of Complaint Against Real Property Re: 5692 Foxchase Path, Clinton, Ohio, #7 Notice of Complaint Against Real Property Re: 2231 Dunkeith Drive, Canton, Ohio, #8 Notice to Potential Claimant Rocco Ferruccio, #9 Notice to Potential Claimant Trisha Ferruccio, #10 Notice to Potential Claimant Joshua Jay, #11 Notice to Potential Claimant Todd DiMichele, #12 Notice to Potential Claimant Christina DiMichele, #13 Notice to Potential Claimant Christos Karasarides, Jr., #14 Notice to Potential Claimant Melissa Bragg, #15 Notice to Potential Claimant Ron DiPietro, #16 Notice to Potential Claimant Tyra Zwick, #17 Notice to Potential Claimant Thomas Helmick, #18 Notice to Potential Claimant Mary Helmick, #19 Notice to Potential Claimant Nicole Shaheen, #20 Notice to Potential Claimant Marcelle Audi) (Tripi, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,117,369.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection, notes, Gold, Stamp & Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women's Rolex Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Mercedes Benz 5550, VIN: WDDUG8FB5FA103038;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,098.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Cadillac Escalade, VN: lGYS4BKJ8FRl51391
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,715.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Mercedes Benz S-Class, VIN: WDDNG9EB6CA449428.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,272.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Silver and Gold Coin Collection and Assorted Silver Bars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $390,316.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2017 Mercedes Benz GLC, VIN: WDC0G6EB8HFL52359
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $98,053.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 5692 Foxchase Path, Clinton, Ohio, PPN: 24- 13481
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2231 Dunkeith Drive NW, Canton, Ohio, PPN: 18-00171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $239,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Men's Rolex Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $114,714.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,108.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $363,588.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $48,850.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $99,864.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,677.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,777,369.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 603 Bellflower Avenue, Canton Ohio, PPN: 02- 14109
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,057.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,027.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,018.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,550.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1,117,369.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Mercedes Benz S550, VIN: WDDUG8FB5FA103038
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christina DiMichele
Represented By: Samuel J. Ferruccio, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rocco Ferruccio
Represented By: Bradley R. Iams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Todd DiMichele
Represented By: Samuel J. Ferruccio, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Trisha Ferruccio
Represented By: Bradley R. Iams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Melissa Bragg
Represented By: Brian M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyra Zwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marcelle Audi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christos Karasarides, Jr.
Represented By: Brian M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nicole Shaheen
Represented By: Brian M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Thomas Helmick
Represented By: Andrea L. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joshua Jay
Represented By: Benjamin C. Heidinger
Represented By: Robert J. Fedor
Represented By: Michael T. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: One Dunkeith Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Helmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ron DiPietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?