Darnell v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

Plaintiff: Lawrence Darnell
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00042
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Termination of Case by clerk on 1/11/2019. See plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). (Doc. No. #3 .) (P,J)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Lawrence Darnell. (Wilson, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9083754.. Filed by Lawrence Darnell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Wilson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Darnell
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?