Burghardt v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Burghardt
Defendant: Ezekiel Ryan and Kristofer London
Case Number: 5:2019cv00325
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kristofer London. (Beck, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Matthew Burghardt. Ezekiel Ryan waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019 filed on behalf of Matthew Burghardt (Greene, Jacqueline)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Matthew Burghardt. Kristofer London waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019 filed on behalf of Matthew Burghardt (Greene, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
February 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
February 12, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9143406.. Filed by Matthew Burghardt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greene, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burghardt v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezekiel Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristofer London
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Burghardt
Represented By: Sarah J. Gelsomino
Represented By: Terry H. Gilbert
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?