Midian v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: William Midian
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2019cv00390
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and to deny petition filed by Alex M. Azar, II, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nancy J. Griswold, #3 Exhibit B - ZPIC Results and Documentation, #4 Exhibit C - Redetermination Decision, #5 Exhibit D - Reconsideration Request, #6 Exhibit E - Reconsideration Decision, #7 Exhibit F - Request for ALJ Hearing, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit H - Amended Notice of Hearing, #10 Exhibit I - Appellant's Response to Sua Sponte Order)(Swanson-Haan, Karen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by William Midian. Related document(s) #1 . (Midian, William)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
February 22, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. (S,SR)
February 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR)
February 22, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (S,SR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Petition for mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9161018. Filed by William Midian. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-appeal, #3 Exhibit 2-reconsideration, #4 Exhibit 3-expert reports, #5 Exhibit 4-articles, #6 Exhibit 5-report) (Midian, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midian v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Midian
Represented By: William M. Midian
Represented By: Kathleen L. Midian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?