Matco Tools Corporation v. DeCasien et al

Plaintiff: Matco Tools Corporation
Defendant: Jeramin Holbert, Mark DeCasien and Anthony Bevacqua
Case Number: 5:2019cv01027
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Mark DeCasien on 5/16/2019, filed on behalf of Matco Tools Corporation (McMillan, Ronald)
June 12, 2019 Copy of #14 Order mailed to Anthony Bevacqua 1419 Clearview Street Forked River, NJ 08731, Jeramin Holbert 101 Elmo Avenue Newfield, NJ 08344 and Mark DeCasien 209 Hobart Avenue Absecon, NJ 08201 on 6/12/2019. (D, I)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re #3 . On or before July 3, 2019, each Defendant shall file a notice setting forth his current mailing address, telephone number and email address. Defendants shall have until July 3, 2019, to file a response, if any, to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3 ). Defendants are advised that pro se litigants are required to follow federal and local rules of procedure. Plaintiff shall have 7 days after the filing of Defendants' responses to file a reply in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 6/12/2019. (D, I)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Jeramin Holbert. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Anthony Bevacqua. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Mark DeCasien. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(O,K)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Michael R. Gray for Matco Tools Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/29/2019.(O,K)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order: This action is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a), and LR. 72.1, for a hearing and the preparation of a report and recommendation on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. (Doc. No. #3 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 5/24/2019. (S,He)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Mark DeCasien on 5/13/2019, filed on behalf of Matco Tools Corporation (McMillan, Ronald)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Anthony Bevacqua on 5/17/2019, filed on behalf of Matco Tools Corporation (McMillan, Ronald)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service executed upon Jeramin Holbert on 5/11/2019, by Process Server delivering the Summons, Verified Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Case Information Statement upon Ashil McCleaf, co-habitant of Defendant, at Defendant's residence address, filed on behalf of Matco Tools Corporation (McMillan, Ronald)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Michael R. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9301113, filed by Plaintiff Matco Tools Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Gray, #2 Proposed Order)(McMillan, Ronald)
May 8, 2019 Notice to Attorney Michael R. Gray. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Anthony Bevacqua, Mark DeCasien, Jeramin Holbert. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
May 8, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (M,TL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Matco Tools Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Peter Walk, #3 Exhibit A to Walk Declaration (Bevacqua Facebook Post), #4 Declaration of James Nanos, #5 Declaration of Michael Swanson, #6 Proposed Order)(McMillan, Ronald)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Fortive Corporation for Matco Tools Corporation filed by Matco Tools Corporation. (McMillan, Ronald)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint against Anthony Bevacqua, Mark DeCasien, Jeramin Holbert. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9298541.. Filed by Matco Tools Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (DeCasien), #3 Summons (Bevacqua), #4 Summons (Holbert), #5 Exhibit A (DeCasien Distributorship Agreement), #6 Exhibit B (Bevacqua Distributorship Agreement), #7 Exhibit C (Holbert Distributorship Agreement)) (McMillan, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matco Tools Corporation v. DeCasien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeramin Holbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeCasien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bevacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matco Tools Corporation
Represented By: Michael R. Gray
Represented By: Brandon A. Wojtasik
Represented By: Ronald M. McMillan
Represented By: Richard P. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?