Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hancox et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Squad Business Ventures LLC and Stephen Hancox
Case Number: 5:2019cv01101
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121). (K,Ca)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: This case, having been settled and compromised by agreement of the parties, is hereby dismissed. Each party shall pay its own costs. Any and all releases, agreements or judgment entries necessary to comply with this settlement shall be executed by the interested parties. A final agreed entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before 7/30/2019. This case is hereby closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/24/2019. (Related document #9 ) (O,K)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated Settlement Notice and Administrative Dismissal filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #7 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; All Defendants shall move or otherwise plead by 6/21/2019. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/11/2019.(D,S)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Squad Business Ventures LLC on 5/23/2019, filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until 06/21/2019 to answer filed by Stephen Hancox, Squad Business Ventures LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Williams, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Stephen Hancox on 5/23/2019, filed on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #3 Corrected Initial Standing Order) (T,Je).
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Stephen Hancox, Squad Business Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Stephen Hancox, Squad Business Ventures LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9312251.. Filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Stephen Hancox, #3 Summons as to Squad Business Ventures LLC) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hancox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie C. Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Squad Business Ventures LLC
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hancox
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?