Functional Products Inc. v. Lubricating Specialties Company

Plaintiff: Functional Products Inc.
Defendant: Lubricating Specialties Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01144
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order dismissing this matter without prejudice upon voluntary notice of the Plaintiff. Judge John R. Adams on 7/17/19. (K,C)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice filed by Functional Products Inc.. (Lockshaw, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lubricating Specialties Company on 6/3/2019, filed on behalf of Functional Products Inc. Related document(s) #6 . (S,HR)
May 28, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lubricating Specialties Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 3560 0000 7486 9068. (O,K)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Lubricating Specialties Company. Related Document : #5 . (T,Je)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of original summons upon all defendants. filed by Functional Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Pleading Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lockshaw, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, or issued. (S,HR)
May 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,HR)
May 20, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (S,HR)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Functional Products Inc. (Lockshaw, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Functional Products Inc.. (Lockshaw, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Functional Products Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9317444. Filed by Functional Products Inc. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A -Invoice dated 10/26/18, #2 Exhibit B - Invoice Statement dated 3/15/19) (Lockshaw, David) Modified to described exhibits. (S,HR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Functional Products Inc. v. Lubricating Specialties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubricating Specialties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Functional Products Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Represented By: David A. Lockshaw, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?