Monea v. Sprint/United Management Company et al
Plaintiff: Allyssa Monea
Defendant: Donnie Hill, Sprint/United Management Company and Kevin Tichon
Case Number: 5:2019cv01154
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulation and Order approving #9 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Because the Court will retain jurisdiction, the parties shall submit a copy of the executed Settlement Agreement to Judy_Guyer@ohnd.uscourts.gov for the Court's future reference, if necessary. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/20/2019. (JLG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Allyssa Monea. (Dubow, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Donnie Hill, Kevin Tichon, Sprint/United Management Company. Service attempted by certified mail on 6/3/2019 filed on behalf of Allyssa Monea. Receiving party signed for 3 envelopes, then returned to Clerk's office as they did not belong to her. See attached letter of transmittal. Envelope for Sprint/United Management was not returned, but contents were. Related document(s) #4 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter and FedEx envelope)(P,WL)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Other Affiliate Sprint Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corporation for Sprint/United Management Company filed by Sprint/United Management Company. (Chyun, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Edward H. Chyun filed by on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. (Chyun, Edward)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Kevin Tichon on 6/10/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Allyssa Monea Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (J,FE)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sprint/United Management Company, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Allyssa Monea. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM) Modified on 6/6/2019 (W,CM).
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Donnie Hill on 6/3/2019; Kevin Tichon on 6/3/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Allyssa Monea Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sprint/United Management Company (Overland Park, KS- 1079 and Topeka, KS-9601) on 6/3/2019, filed on behalf of Allyssa Monea Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM)
May 31, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Donnie Hill # 7018 0040 0000 7903 5008, Sprint/United Management Company (Canton, OH- 1086, Overland Park, KS- 1079 and Topeka, KS-9601), Kevin Tichon (Norton, OH- 4995 and Canton- 4988, OH). placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (W,CM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Donnie Hill, Sprint/United Management Company (Canton, OH, Overland Park, KS and Topeka, KS), Kevin Tichon (Norton, OH and Canton, OH). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
May 20, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9318468, filed by Allyssa Monea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons x6, #3 Right to Sue) (Dubow, Daniel) M

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monea v. Sprint/United Management Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Represented By: Edward H. Chyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Tichon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyssa Monea
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?