More Than Gourmet, Inc. v. Riverbend Foods, LLC

Plaintiff: More Than Gourmet, Inc.
Defendant: Riverbend Foods, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01176
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case 2:19-cv-00808, filed 07/09/2019. Related document(s) #11 . (M,TL)
July 8, 2019 Case electronically transferred to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania on 7/8/2019. (O,K)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed Judgment Entry: The Court finds and the parties agree that it is in the interest of justice that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the instant matter shall be and hereby is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/8/2019. (O,K)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment Entry filed by More Than Gourmet, Inc.. (Rich, Jonathan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #9 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 defendant's Motion to dismiss for improper venue; under Local Rule 7.1(d), plaintiff's response is not due until 7/12/2019; under Local Rule 7.1(e), defendant's reply will be due 7/26/2019. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/25/2019. (D,S)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until July 2, 2019 to file response/reply to #6 Motion to dismiss for improper venue filed by Plaintiff More Than Gourmet, Inc.. Related document(s) #6 . (Rich, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Riverbend Foods, LLC. (Agosta, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Riverbend Foods, LLC. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certification ) (Agosta, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for improper venue filed by Defendant Riverbend Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Agosta, Anthony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Complaint filed by More Than Gourmet, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Rich, Jonathan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by More Than Gourmet, Inc.. (Rich, Jonathan)
May 21, 2019 Notice by Clerk that More Than Gourmet, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,TL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Riverbend Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
May 21, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Riverbend Foods, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9321237, filed by More Than Gourmet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit B- Invoice, #3 Exhibit C- Sellers Terms and Conditions, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons in Civil Action) (Rich, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: More Than Gourmet, Inc. v. Riverbend Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Foods, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: More Than Gourmet, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?