B.I., et al v. Board of Education Fairless Local Schools et al
Plaintiff: B. I., Lisa Ivy and Tobias Ivy
Defendant: Denise Meredith, Board of Education of Fairless Local Schools, Dr. Mike Hall, Ken Killian, Dr. Larry Chambliss, Chris Roberts, Kevin Bille, Broc Bidlack and Janice Courtney
Case Number: 5:2019cv01309
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janice Courtney waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Cortney) Modified party name on 7/3/2019 (M,TL).
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Ivy. Mike Hall waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of Lisa Ivy (Morgan, Cortney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Larry Chambliss waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - INCORRECT DOCUMENT FILED - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE - Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janice Courtney waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney) Modified to note filing error on 7/3/2019 (M,TL).
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Denise Meredith waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Chris Roberts waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Broc Bidlack waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by all Plaintiffs. Kevin Bille waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney) Modified to correct party name on 7/3/2019 (M,TL).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Board of Education of Fairless Local Schools waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Cortney)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
June 6, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
June 6, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages with jury demand against Broc Bidlack, Kevin Bille, Board of Education Fairless Local Schools, Larry Chambliss, Janice Courtney, Ken Killian, Denise Meredith, Chris Roberts, Mike Hall. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9350344. Filed by Tobias Ivy, Lisa Ivy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.I., et al v. Board of Education Fairless Local Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Fairless Local Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mike Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Larry Chambliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broc Bidlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. I.
Represented By: James J. Collum
Represented By: Cortney R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ivy
Represented By: James J. Collum
Represented By: Cortney R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobias Ivy
Represented By: James J. Collum
Represented By: Cortney R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?