Goodyear International Corporation v. Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc.
Petitioner: Goodyear International Corporation
Respondent: Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01317
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Notice [non-document]: Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and its accompanying exhibits (ECF No. #1 ), as well as the Summons (ECF No. #5 ) and the USM-285 forms issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon: Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc., 802 Ave. Campo Rico, San Juan, Puerto Rico 00924; and Victor Caraballo Figueroa, URB Villa Carolina, 93-10 Calle 89, Carolina, PR 00985-4142. (O,K)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petitioner's Motion for order directing the U.S. Marshal Service to effect service of process (Related Doc #6 ). Further, that the United States Marshals Service shall expeditiously serve Goodyear's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and its accompanying exhibits (ECF No. #1 ), as well as the Summons (ECF No. #5 ) and the USM-285 forms provided by Goodyear to the Marshals Service, to the following addresses: Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc., 802 Ave. Campo Rico, San Juan, Puerto Rico 00924; and Victor Caraballo Figueroa, URB Villa Carolina, 93-10 Calle 89, Carolina, PR 00985-4142. Judge John R. Adams on 7/23/19.(K,C)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Order Directing the United States Marshals Service to Effect Service of Process filed by Petitioner Goodyear International Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Marshals Service Correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Wallace, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc. (T,Je)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Goodyear International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wallace, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for Goodyear International Corporation filed by Goodyear International Corporation. (Wallace, David)
June 7, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Goodyear International Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9352283. Filed by Goodyear International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Declaration of Daniel Bryan, #2 Ex B - Affidavit of Paul Cadena, #3 Ex C - Affidavit of Claritza De Leon Marrero, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodyear International Corporation v. Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Goodyear International Corporation
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Represented By: Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel H. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tecnicentros Mundial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?