Copen et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Paul Copen and Kelly A Copen
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Co., Inc., Michael Blanchard, United States Postal Service, Farmers Insurance and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv01346
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until August 22, 2019 to file response/reply to #10 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Kelly A Copen, Paul Copen. Related document(s) #10 . (Pelini, Craig)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Kimberly Herbst Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2-Julie Hammond Declaration)(Asher, Ruchi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Mid-Century Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Bristol West Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Coast National Holding Company, Corporate Parent Coast National Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Bristol West Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Group, Inc., and Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd., for Farmers Insurance filed by Farmers Insurance. (Cobb, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance. (Cobb, Craig)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 6/26/2019 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. (O,K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019cv01069. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Common Pleas Court) (O,K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Government's answer due 7/18/2019. Judge John R. Adams on 6/20/19.(L,J)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until July 18, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant United States of America. (Asher, Ruchi)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Substitution filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of United States Attorney)(Asher, Ruchi)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
June 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
June 11, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CV01069 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stark County Summon and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Asher, Ruchi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copen et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Copen
Represented By: Craig G Pelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly A Copen
Represented By: Craig G Pelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Ruchi V. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Represented By: Craig S. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ruchi V. Asher
Represented By: Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?