Sneed v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Sneed
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01422
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. Related document(s) #12 . (B,R)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/13/2019. (L,Ja)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Buck, Lynne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #9 . (Buck, Lynne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Buck, Lynne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 6/26/2019 via U.S. Attorney; Attorney General via FedEx on 6/28/2019 and Regional Chief Counsel via FedEx on 7/1/2019 filed on behalf of Christopher Lee Sneed Related document(s) #7 . (L,Ja)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285). (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/25/2019. (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/25/2019. (D,JJ)
June 24, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/24/2019. (O,K)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/24/2019. (O,K)
June 24, 2019 Random reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (O,K)
June 24, 2019 Remark by Clerk: Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert was assigned to this case incorrectly. The assignment will be corrected and noted on the docket. (O,K)
June 24, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. Judge Sara Lioi terminated. (O,K)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Clerk's Office has indicated that there was an error in the assignment of this case; therefore, it is being returned to the Clerk's Office for proper assignment. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/24/2019. (O,K)
June 20, 2019 FILING ERROR - see 6/24/2019 entry for assignment correction - Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (O,K) Modified to mark error on 6/24/2019 (O,K).
June 20, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Social Security Number filed by Christopher Lee Sneed. (Osterhout, Karl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Sneed. Related document(s) #1 . (Osterhout, Karl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Christopher Lee Sneed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 USM-285 Attorney General, #6 USM-285 General Counsel, #7 USM-285 US Attorney) (Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sneed v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Sneed
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?