Kim v. Tremcar USA, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Clara Kim and Clara H. Kim
Defendant: Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc., Tremcar Technologies, Inc. and Does 1-5
Case Number: 5:2019cv01482
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Donald J. Richardson filed by on behalf of Tremcar Technologies, Inc., Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc.. (Richardson, Donald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Tremcar Technologies, Inc. on 7/26/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim Related document(s) #2 . (Akbari, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Tremcar, Inc. on 7/26/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim Related document(s) #2 . (Akbari, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service by personal service by Quebec bailiff of justice under Hague Service Convention and Quebec Code of Civil Procedure R.S.Q. C-25, Sec. 130 executed upon Tremcar Technologies, Inc. on 7/25/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim Related document(s) #2 . (Akbari, A.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service by personal service by Quebec bailiff of justice under Hague Service Convention and Quebec Code of Civil Procedure R.S.Q. C-25, Sec. 130 executed upon Tremcar, Inc. on 7/25/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim Related document(s) #2 . (Akbari, A.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tremcar Technologies, Inc., Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc.. (Wakefield, Ashley)
August 6, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Tremcar USA, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (O,K)
August 6, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Tremcar, Inc. and Tremcar Technologies, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (O,K)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order approving the parties' stipulation for extension of time to answer ( re #9 ). Defendants, Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc., and Tremcar Technologies, Inc. answers due 9/23/19. All future extensions shall be sought through motion practice. Judge John R. Adams on 7/23/19. (K,C)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Ashley C. Wakefield filed by on behalf of Tremcar Technologies, Inc., Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc.. (Wakefield, Ashley)
July 20, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Tremcar Technologies, Inc., Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc.. (Menuez, Jonathan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon Tremcar, Inc. on 7/2/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim (Lebovitz, Jordan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon Tremcar USA, Inc. on 7/1/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim (Lebovitz, Jordan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon Tremcar Technologies, Inc. on 7/2/2019, filed on behalf of Clara H. Kim (Lebovitz, Jordan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney A. Ilyas Akbari, attorney Ronald L.M. Goldman, and attorney Clay Robbins, III for Clara H. Kim. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ),(Related Doc #4 ), (Related Doc #5 ). Judge John R. Adams on 6/28/19.(K,C)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Clay Robbins III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9388304, filed by Plaintiff Clara Kim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lebovitz, Jordan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Ronald L. M. Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9388289, filed by Plaintiff Clara Kim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lebovitz, Jordan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for attorney A. Ilyas Akbari to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9388247, filed by Plaintiff Clara Kim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lebovitz, Jordan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Tremcar Technologies, Inc., Tremcar USA, Inc., Tremcar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 27, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9386989. Filed by Clara Kim. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Lebovitz, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Tremcar USA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremcar USA, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Daniel L. Bray
Represented By: Ashley C. Wakefield
Represented By: Jonathan M. Menuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremcar, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Daniel L. Bray
Represented By: Ashley C. Wakefield
Represented By: Jonathan M. Menuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremcar Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Daniel L. Bray
Represented By: Ashley C. Wakefield
Represented By: Jonathan M. Menuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Kim
Represented By: Jordan D. Lebovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara H. Kim
Represented By: Jordan D. Lebovitz
Represented By: Ronald L.M. Goldman
Represented By: Diane Marger Moore
Represented By: A. Ilyas Akbari
Represented By: Clay Robbins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?